Hone v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hone
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2024 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR SELINA RENAE VALDEZ, RECEIPT 2-2738. (Court Staff, smek)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2024 at 9:30 AM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***(Court Staff, ssw)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
February 19, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Kimberly Hone by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #5 MOTION for Selina Valdez to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Hone (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
February 12, 2024 Filing 11 DECLARATION OF SELINA VALDEZ in support of #5 MOTION for Selina Valdez to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiff Kimberly Hone (Court Staff, sal)
February 12, 2024 DISREGARD. Filing Error. FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid (Receipt 2-2682) On Behalf of Selina Valdez (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 2/22/2024 (Court Staff, stmo).
February 12, 2024 FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid (Receipt 2-2683) On Behalf of Iwana Rademaekers (Court Staff, stmo)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Rademaekers, Iwana)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #7 MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Skeen, Nathan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Iwana Rademaekers, #2 Proposed Order) (Skeen, Nathan) Modified text on 2/2/2024 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Skeen on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Skeen, Nathan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Selina Valdez to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Hone. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Domonkos, Donna)
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of List of Entities That Are Financially Interested In The Outcome Of This Litigation by Plaintiff Kimberly Hone (Court Staff, sbh)
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Hone, 1 issued (Court Staff, sbh)
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donna D Domonkos on behalf of Kimberly Hone (Court Staff, sbh)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kimberly Hone (one summons(es) issued) (Filing fee $405 receipt #2-2511) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2024: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hone v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hone
Represented By: Donna D Domonkos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Represented By: Nathan Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?