United States of America v. Alabama, State of et al Featured Case

The U.S. Department of Justice sues the State of Alabama, challenging the constitutionality of HB56, the state's immigration law for usurping federal authority of immigration-related matters.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc. and American Unity Legal Defense Fund
Amicus: United Mexican States, Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, Uruguay, Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU), National Education Association, Alabama Education Association, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, South Alabama Center for Fair Housing, Anti-Defamation League, Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence, NAACP Alabama Conference, ACHR, Alabama NOW, AALDEF, Birmingham Peace Project, Dominican American National Roundtable, Equality Alabama, Federation of Southern Cooperatives/Land Assistance Fund, Hispanic Federation, Immigration Equality, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Montgomery Improvement Association, National Asian-Pacific Bar Association, National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials, National Council of La Raza, National Employment Law Project, National Guestworker Alliance, National Immigration Law Project of the National Lawyers Guild, New Orleans Workers Center for Racial Justice, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Society of American Law Teachers, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, Southern Coalition for Social Justice, United States Hispanic Leadership Institute, National Lawyers Guild and Alabama Legislators
Case Number: 2:2011cv02746
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 118 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, United States of America. filed by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, United States of America (Simpson, W)
December 13, 2012 117 NOTICE of Appearance by W Scott Simpson on behalf of United States of America (Simpson, W)
December 10, 2012 116 Featured Case ORDER granting 115 Status Report filed by United States of America, denying as moot 114 Status Report filed by United States of America ; the parties shall inform the court whether either party has filed a petition for certiorari or the recommendations for further proceedings by 1/29/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 12/7/2012. (KAM, )
November 27, 2012 115 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. filed by United States of America (Reeves, C)
November 27, 2012 114 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. filed by United States of America (Reeves, C)
November 21, 2012 113 MANDATE of USCA as to Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Robert J Bentley, Alabama, State of, Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America, before Wilson, Martin,and Voorhees, AFFIRMING IN PART, REVERSING IN PART, DISMISSING IN PART AND REMANDING as set out, with opinion attached; issued as mandate 11/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(KAM, )
October 22, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William H Orrick, III terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/22/2012. (SDB, )
October 22, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney R Cooper Shattuck terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/22/2012. (SDB, )
October 18, 2012 112 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert J Bentley. (Shattuck, R)
August 23, 2012 111 STATUS REPORT in Response to Court Order by United States of America. filed by United States of America (Reeves, C)
August 13, 2012 110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney William H. Orrick, III by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
August 13, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 109 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua Kerry Payne terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 08/13/2012. (SDB, )
August 13, 2012 109 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Payne, Joshua)
June 5, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Prim Formby Escalona terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 06/05/2012. (SDB, )
June 1, 2012 108 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Prim F. Escalona by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Escalona, Prim)
May 23, 2012 107 STIPULATION of United States, HICA Plaintiffs, and State Defendants by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama,. filed by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brooke, Samuel)
March 12, 2012 106 Featured Case ORDER of USCA before Wilson, Martin, USCJ and Voorhees, USDJ, expanding the 10/14/11 order and hereby ENJOIN the State of Alabama's enforcement of Section 27 and 30 of H.B. 56 pending complete resolution of these appeals (KAM, )
January 12, 2012 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: Notice of Cross Appeal, Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 11-14532. The entire record on appeal is available electronically, (KAM, )
January 12, 2012 105 STATUS REPORT In Response to Court Order and Requesting that the Court Further Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss and Rule 26(f) Obligations by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
December 30, 2011 104 NOTICE of Appearance by R Cooper Shattuck on behalf of Robert J Bentley (Shattuck, R)
October 14, 2011 103 Featured Case ORDER of USCA, before Carnes, Barkett and Hull, USCJ, the motion for injunction pending appeal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; The State of Alabama is Enjoined from enforcement of HB 56 - Section 10 and Section 28 pending appeal and until further order by the merits panel; Motion is denied as to Sections 12, 18, 27 and 30. (KAM, )
October 13, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 102 Joint Motion to Stay Further Briefing on Motion to Dismiss and Rule 26(f) Obligations. By January 12, 2012, the parties will provide the court with a report on the status of the pending cross appeals and with an update on their respective positions regarding a briefing schedule on the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10-13-11. (Blackburn, Sharon)
October 12, 2011 102 Joint MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion to Stay, 83 MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint (Doc. 1 in Case No. 11-cv-2746) Further Briefing on Motion to Dismiss and Rule 26(F) Obligations by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
October 11, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number B4601027425 re Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Robert J Bentley, Alabama, State of (KAM, )
October 7, 2011 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 93 Memorandum Opinion, 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. SEE DOCUMENT 101 (KAM, )
October 7, 2011 101 NOTICE by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley Alabama and Governor Bentley's Notice of Cross-Appeal (Davis, James)
October 6, 2011 100 USCA Case Number 11-14532-CC for Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America. (KAM, )
October 5, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 97 Motion To Incorporate Filing By Reference Into United States' Motion For An Injunction Pending Appeal re 96 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 95 Notice (Other), 93 Memorandum Opinion, 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Enjoin Portions of H.B. 56 Pending Appeal by United States of America.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/5/2011. (KAM, )
October 5, 2011 99 Featured Case ORDER denying 96 United Statess Motion for an Injunction Pending Appeal or, Alternatively, a Temporary Injunction Pending Adjudication of an Emergency Motion to the Court of Appeals for an Injunction Pending Appeal as further set out in this order. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/5/2011. (KAM, )
October 4, 2011 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re 96 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 95 Notice (Other), 93 Memorandum Opinion, 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Enjoin Portions of H.B. 56 Pending Appeal filed by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, James)
October 3, 2011 97 MOTION To Incorporate Filing By Reference Into United States' Motion For An Injunction Pending Appeal re 96 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 95 Notice (Other), 93 Memorandum Opinion, 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Enjoin Portions of H.B. 56 Pending Appeal by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
October 1, 2011 Featured Case ORDER that any opposition to plaintiff's motion for an injunction pending appeal, or alternatively, a temporary injunction pending adjudication of an emergency motion to the court of appeals for an injunction pending appeal(doc. 96) shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 4, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/1/11. (SMH)
September 30, 2011 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by United States of America. see document 95 (KAM, )
September 30, 2011 96 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 95 Notice (Other), 93 Memorandum Opinion, 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Enjoin Portions of H.B. 56 Pending Appeal by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
September 30, 2011 95 NOTICE by United States of America re 93 Memorandum Opinion, 94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Reeves, C)
September 28, 2011 94 Featured Case ORDER in accordance with the memo opn entered contemporaneously, granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; the motion is GRANTED as to Sections 11(a), 13, 16, and 17 of H.B. 56 and dfts are ENJOINED from executing or enforcing these sections ; motion is denied as to Sections 10, 12(a), 18, 27, 28, and 30. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/28/2011. (KAM, )
September 28, 2011 93 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/28/2011. (KAM, )
September 27, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Further Briefing on Motion to Dismiss. Within two weeks of the court's ruling on the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the parties should file their proposed briefing schedule with regard to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/27/11. (Blackburn, Sharon)
September 20, 2011 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Kerry Payne on behalf of Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley (Payne, Joshua)
September 19, 2011 91 MOTION to Stay re 83 MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint (Doc. 1 in Case No. 11-cv-2746) by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
September 8, 2011 90 Evidentiary Material re:(70 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB) Evidentiary Material,, Supplemental Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
September 1, 2011 89 Featured Case ORDER for case management purposes and ease of appellate review; the 8/3/2011 order of consolidation is vacated; the parties shall file all future pleadings in the individual cases as appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/1/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 30, 2011 88 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/24/2011, before Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Martin. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 29, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER that Act 2011-535 [H.B. 56] is TEMPORARILY ENJOINED, and may not be executed or enforced. In entering this order the court specifically notes that it is in no way addressing the merits of the motions. The court will issue detailed Memorandum Opinions and Orders ruling on the merits of the pending Motions for Preliminary Injunction no later than September 28, 2011. This temporary injunction shall remain in effect until September 29, 2011, or until the court enters its rulings, whichever comes first. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/29/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 25, 2011 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R Brown on behalf of Henry N. Parsley, Jr Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Brown, Katherine)
August 25, 2011 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C Allen on behalf of Henry N. Parsley, Jr Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Allen, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 84 NOTICE of Appearance by J Mark White on behalf of Henry N. Parsley, Jr Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(White, J)
August 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2011 re Pltfs' MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(SMH)
August 23, 2011 83 MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint (Doc. 1 in Case No. 11-cv-2746) by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Davis, James)
August 23, 2011 82 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Parsley, et al. (Doc. 50 in Case No. 11-cv-2736) by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Davis, James)
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (102) Motion for Leave Appear PHV by Michael D. Simpson in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (61) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (53) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1465176. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (105) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (64) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (56) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 81 UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by United States of America. (Deemed filed 8/22/2011 in 5:11cv2746) Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (71) Motion to correct cover page reflecting consolidated case numbers in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (119) Motion to correct cover page in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/11. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(SMH)
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (101) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (60) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (52) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 80 MOTION Leave to File Corrected Cover Page of Reply Brief by United States of America. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Reeves, C)
August 22, 2011 79 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: 69 Response in Opposition to Motion, 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
August 22, 2011 78 NOTICE by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama Notice of Supplemental Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Turner, Andrew)
August 22, 2011 77 Opposition to (Surreply to) Church Leaders' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 99) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Parker, William)
August 21, 2011 76 Brief HICA Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing on Section 28 Equal Protection Challenge. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Brooke, Samuel)
August 20, 2011 75 Brief (State Defendants' Supplemental Briefing Addressing Equal Protection Challenge) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Fleming, Margaret)
August 20, 2011 74 NOTICE by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange re (82 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Response in Opposition to Motion,, (110 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Response in Opposition to Motion, Correction Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Neiman, John)
August 19, 2011 73 NOTICE by Robert J. Baker, Benedictine Sisters of Cullman, Alabama, Inc, Benedictine Society of Alabama, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon, United States of America, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora re (37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Napolitano Memo)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Tumlin, Karen)
August 19, 2011 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re (47 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert J. Baker, Benedictine Sisters of Cullman, Alabama, Inc, Benedictine Society of Alabama, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 18, 2011 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison E Neal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Neal, Allison)
August 17, 2011 70 Evidentiary Material re:(47 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 15, 2011 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re (2 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Neiman, John)
August 15, 2011 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re (37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Wang, Cecillia)
August 15, 2011 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Alabama Legislators. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed amicus brief, # 2 Exhibit list of individual amici, # 3 Exhibit 1996 OLC opinion, # 4 Exhibit 2002 Bybee memo)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Williams, Stephen)
August 15, 2011 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re (57 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB, 47 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 99 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (State Defendants' Response to Church Leaders' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Fairbanks, Misty)
August 15, 2011 PHV Fee paid for Carla Gorniak, Henry Solano and Christopher Clark, receipt number B4601025753, $150 (for Motion 101 in lead case). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(CVA)
August 15, 2011 65 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by American Unity Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Park, John)
August 15, 2011 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Barnaby Zall by American Unity Legal Defense Fund. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Park, John) Modified on 8/15/2011 (CVA).
August 12, 2011 63 Opposition to re (36 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 36 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement and To Strike filed by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic College Fund, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration with Exhibits)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Viramontes, Victor)
August 12, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (88) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (89) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (100) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (44) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (45) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (59) Motion for Leave to Appear PHVin case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (35) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (36) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (51) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/12/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 12, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER granting (2) Motion for leave to proceed under pseudonyms in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/12/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 12, 2011 61 MOTION for Leave to File Pro Hac Vice by Alabama Education Association, National Education Association. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 12, 2011 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by United Mexican States for Carla Gorniak, Henry Solano and Christopher Clark. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Still, Edward) Modified on 8/15/2011 (CVA).
August 12, 2011 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dale M. Schwartz, Esquire by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 12, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1458556. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Schoen, David) ALND rec# B4601025745 Modified on 8/12/2011 (KAM, ).
August 11, 2011 58 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Robert J. Baker, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 10, 2011 57 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert J. Baker, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 10, 2011 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct (95 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Trial Brief, (amicus) by United Mexican States. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Still, Edward)
August 10, 2011 55 NOTICE by Alabama Education Association, National Education Association Certification of Service of Motion for Leave, Brief and Corporate Disclosure Statement Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 10, 2011 54 Brief re(66 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 22 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB, 13 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) MOTION for Leave to File As Amici Curiae. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 10, 2011 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Praveen Krishna on behalf of United States of America (Krishna, Praveen)
August 10, 2011 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Praveen Krishna on behalf of United States of America (Krishna, Praveen)
August 10, 2011 51 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, United Mexican States, Uruguay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Still, Edward)
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number 4601025632 re: Flores. (doc 89 in lead; doc 36 in 2736 and doc 45 in 2746). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(FNC)
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number 4601025631 re: Garcia (doc 88 in lead, doc 35 in 2736 and doc 44 in 2746) Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(FNC)
August 9, 2011 50 MOTION Certify Question to the Supreme Court of Alabama re (15 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, (1 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) Complaint by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB(Fairbanks, Misty)
August 9, 2011 49 Amicus Curiae Brief re(37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence in Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 9, 2011 48 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Neiman, Jr on behalf of Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange, Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Neiman, John)
August 9, 2011 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Prim Formby Escalona on behalf of Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange, Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Escalona, Prim)
August 9, 2011 46 Featured Case ORDER the court will not hear oral argument on motion for more definite statement and to strike - hearing set for 8/24/2011 is cancelled; any opposition to the motion remains due by 8/12/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/9/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 9, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (66) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (69) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (73) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae; granting (75) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (78) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (79) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae; granting (87) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (22) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (25) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (29) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae; granting (31) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (34) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (35) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (43) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (13) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (16) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (20) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae; granting (22) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (25) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (26) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (34) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiaein case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB ; Amici are DIRECTED to electronically file their briefs FORTHWITH. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/9/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM)
August 9, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (65) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (72) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (80) Motion Appear PHV; granting (81) Motion Appear PHV; granting (84) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (85) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (86) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (20) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (28) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (36) Motion Appear PHV; granting (37) Motion Appear PHV; granting (40) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (41) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (42) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (19) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (27) Motion Appear PHV; granting (28) Motion Appear PHV; granting (31) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (33) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (11) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB ; Counsel are reminded that they must register for electronic filing through this court's website www.alnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/9/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Stephen P. Rice and Thy B. Bui $100, receipt number B4601025575 Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1455697. (Zall, Barnaby)
August 8, 2011 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Gaela K. Gehring Flores by NAACP Alabama Conference. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 8, 2011 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by Bonard I. Molina Garcia by NAACP Alabama Conference. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 8, 2011 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - ADL Amicus Brief [DE 71])Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 8, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Stephen Dane $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454707. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James) ALND rec# B4601025583 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 8, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Katherine Gillaspie $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454704. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)ALND rec # B4601025584 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 8, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Jamie L. Crook $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454701. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James) ALND rec # B4601025582 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 8, 2011 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., South Alabama Center for Fair Housing. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 8, 2011 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., South Alabama Center for Fair Housing, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 8, 2011 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., South Alabama Center for Fair Housing. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 6, 2011 39 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by David Gespass on behalf of NAACP Alabama Conference. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gespass, David)
August 5, 2011 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re (37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Haran Lowe), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Declaration of Jerry Bassett), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Letter from Superintendent Morton), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Letter from Chancellor Hill))Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Davis, James)
August 5, 2011 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Thy B. Bui by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 5, 2011 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Steven P. Rice by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 5, 2011 35 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by NAACP Alabama Conference, ACHR, Alabama NOW, AALDEF, Birmingham Peace Project, Dominican American National Roundtable, Equality Alabama, Federation of Southern Cooperatives/Land Assistance Fund, Hispanic Federation, Immigration Equality, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Montgomery Improvement Association, National Asian-Pacific Bar Association, National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials, National Council of La Raza, National Employment Law Project, National Guestworker Alliance, National Immigration Law Project of the National Lawyers Guild, New Orleans Workers Center for Racial Justice, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Society of American Law Teachers, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, Southern Coalition for Social Justice, United States Hispanic Leadership Institute, National Lawyers Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae & Appendix)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gespass, David)
August 5, 2011 34 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 5, 2011 33 NOTICE of Appearance by David I Schoen on behalf of Anti-Defamation League Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 5, 2011 32 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (15 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Oral argument set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn; dfts shall file their opposition by 8/15/2011; plas' reply is due by 8/22/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/5/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 5, 2011 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, South Alabama Center for Fair Housing, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Amicus Brief, # 3 Disclosure Statement)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 5, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454047. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 30 Brief of Amicus Curiae (AILA). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear As Amicus Curiae by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 27 Brief of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 5, 2011 26 Amicus Curiae brief on behalf of Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU), Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dear Colleage Letter 1997, # 2 Exhibit B-Delaration MPV, # 3 Exhibit C-Declaration M. Fix, # 4 Exhibit D-Declaration Dr. Castro)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel)
August 5, 2011 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Spina, Thomas)
August 5, 2011 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Henry N. Parsley, Jr. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 5, 2011 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama Education Association, National Education Association. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 5, 2011 22 MOTION for Leave to File As Amici Curiae by National Education Association, Alabama Education Association. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 5, 2011 21 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Miguel A Perez-Vargas on behalf of Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU), Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. SEE DOCUMENT 26 FOR COMPLETE BRIEF
August 4, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1453466. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Brooke, Samuel)
August 4, 2011 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by - Jessica Karp obo all pltfs in 5:11-2484-SLB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Brooke, Samuel)
August 4, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (60) Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae brief by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc; granting (62) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae by United Mexican States; granting (63) Motion for Leave to join Amicus Curiae by Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Comombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, Uraguay; granting (64) Motion for Leave to join brief of Amici Curiae by HACU in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (19) Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae brief; granting (13) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (6) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae; granting (10) Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/4/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 4, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (57) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Roger Rice; granting (61) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Miguel Perez-Vargas in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (14) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (7) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/4/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM)
August 4, 2011 19 MOTION for Leave to File to Join Brief of Amici Curiae by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc., Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel)
August 4, 2011 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Robert J Bentley served on 8/3/2011, answer due 8/24/2011. (Krishna, Praveen)
August 4, 2011 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Alabama, State of served on 8/3/2011, answer due 8/24/2011. (Krishna, Praveen)
August 3, 2011 16 MOTION for leave to file Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Edward Still on behalf of Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, Uruguay. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Still, Edward) Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1452513. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel) NDAL rec# B4601025475 Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 15 MOTION for leave to file Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Edward Still on behalf of United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Still, Edward) Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2011: # 1 Exhibit) (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 13 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. (Attachments: # Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Rice, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2011: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 12 Case reassigned to Judge Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn for consolidation with 5:11cv2484 SLB. Judge Judge L Scott Coogler no longer assigned to the case. (KAM, )
August 3, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER granting motions to consolidate; motions for additional time are denied; PARTIES SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS IN LEAD CASE 5:11CV2484 SLB; Oral argument on the pending motions for preliminary injunction is set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn. Dfts shall file their opposition to USA's motion for preliminary injunction by 8/15/2011; USA shall reply by 8/22/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/3/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-LSC, 5:11-cv-02736-CLS(KAM, )
August 3, 2011 10 RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Davis, James)
August 3, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William M Acker, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge L Scott Coogler for all further proceedings. PLEASE USE CASE NUMBER CV 11-CO-2746-S ON ALL FURTHER PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 8/3/11. (KGE, )
August 3, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER re 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by United States of America; the parties shall file any opposition to the motion by 8/8/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/3/2011. (KAM, )
August 3, 2011 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Additional Time by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Davis, James)
August 2, 2011 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
August 1, 2011 5 Summons Issued as to Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, returned to pla for service (KGE, )
August 1, 2011 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Praveen Krishna on behalf of United States of America (Krishna, Praveen)
August 1, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Inge P Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Judge William M Acker, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/1/11. (ASL)
August 1, 2011 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Reeves, C)
August 1, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, filed by United States of America.(ASL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Alabama, State of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joshua Wilkenfeld
Represented By: Joyce White Vance
Represented By: C Lee Reeves, II
Represented By: William H Orrick, III
Represented By: Praveen Krishna
Represented By: Varu Chilakamarri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: John C Neiman, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: Prim Formby Escalona
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Bentley
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: John C Neiman, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: Prim Formby Escalona
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Unity Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: John J Park, Jr
Represented By: Barnaby White Zall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United Mexican States
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Argentina
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Bolivia
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Brazil
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Chile
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Colombia
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Costa Rica
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Dominican Republic
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ecuador
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: El Salvador
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Guatemala
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Honduras
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Nicaragua
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Paraguay
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Peru
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Uruguay
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU)
Represented By: Miguel A Perez-Vargas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Education Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama Education Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Central Alabama Fair Housing Center
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: South Alabama Center for Fair Housing
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: David I Schoen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NAACP Alabama Conference
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: ACHR
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama NOW
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AALDEF
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Birmingham Peace Project
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Dominican American National Roundtable
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Equality Alabama
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Federation of Southern Cooperatives/Land Assistance Fund
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic Federation
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Immigration Equality
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Montgomery Improvement Association
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Asian-Pacific Bar Association
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Council of La Raza
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Employment Law Project
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Guestworker Alliance
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Immigration Law Project of the National Lawyers Guild
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New Orleans Workers Center for Racial Justice
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Society of American Law Teachers
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Christian Leadership Conference
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Coalition for Social Justice
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United States Hispanic Leadership Institute
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Lawyers Guild
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama Legislators
Represented By: Stephen W Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]