Synovus Bank v. Summerford

Counter_defendant: Synovus Bank
Counter_claimant: Ralph Q. Summerford
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Ralph Q. Summerford
Case Number: 2:2012cv03598
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/10/2013. (JLC)
July 2, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION to Amend 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/2/2014. (JLC)
November 20, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 11/20/2014. (AVC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Summerford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Stewart M Cox
Represented By: Jennifer Harris Henderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ralph Q. Summerford
Represented By: John G Dana
Represented By: Bruce L Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Jennifer Harris Henderson
Represented By: Stewart M Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Q. Summerford
Represented By: Bruce L Gordon
Represented By: John G Dana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]