Huntsville Golf Development, Inc. v. Whitney Bank

Appellant: Huntsville Golf Development, Inc.
Appellee: Whitney Bank
Debtor: Nelson J Chatelain and Charlene L Chatelain
Miscellaneous: Bankruptcy Clerk
Trustee: Stuart M Maples
Case Number: 5:2013cv00671
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 15 MOTION to Stay Bankruptcy Court's Order Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 9/6/2013. (JLC)
March 19, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/14/14. (ASL)
June 27, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION Rehearing. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/27/2014. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntsville Golf Development, Inc. v. Whitney Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Huntsville Golf Development, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D Heard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Whitney Bank
Represented By: Kevin C Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Nelson J Chatelain
Represented By: Michael E Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Charlene L Chatelain
Represented By: Michael E Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Bankruptcy Clerk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Stuart M Maples
Represented By: Stuart M Maples
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]