Bauerlein, et al v. Equity Residtl Corp, et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv01904
Filed: September 13, 2004
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehic
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2008 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Plaintiff's 293 Motion/Application for Damages against Co-Defendant Jumbo Surplus Corporation. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on 10/9/08 at 1:30 p.m. to determine the proper amount of damages owed to Plaintiffs by Co-Defendant Jumbo Surplus Corporation, Ltd. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/25/08.(SAT) Modified on 10/17/2008 (SAT). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO INCLUDE RULING (DENYING) ON MOTION.
October 7, 2008 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 300 Motion to Continue the Damages Hearing. Evidentiary Hearing re-set for 11/5/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/7/08.(LSP)
January 14, 2009 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plas are awarded $1,250,000 in damages, to be split equally between Michael and Shannon Bauerlein. Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b). FURTHER ORDERED granting 305 Motion to Strike 302 Statement. FURTHER ORDERED STRIKING statement of responsibility 302 . FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/12/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauerlein, et al v. Equity Residtl Corp, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]