Campbell, et al v. Fernand-Sholes, et al

 
Case Number: 2:2005cv00880
Filed: March 23, 2005
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2009 100 Featured Case ORDER denying Dfts' 94 Motion for Correction of Mistake or Clerical Error in Default Judgment. The Court will await the Ninth Circuit's Order restoring jurisdiction for the purpose of correcting any mistake or clerical error in the default judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/27/09.(ESL)
December 21, 2009 108 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct Clerical Error in November 4, 2009 Amended Default Judgment (Doc. 105). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter an amended default judgment in the present case. The first sentence of the November 4, 2009 Amended Default Judgment shall be amended to read as follows: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Orders of November 4, 2009 and December 21, 2009, default judgment is entered against Defendant Law Offices of Bruce A. Sholes, and in favor of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/21/2009.(TCA, )
September 23, 2008 80 Featured Case ORDER - Pursuant to the parties' 79 Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dft Bruce A. Sholes ("Sholes") shall not be required to file a reply brief in support of his Motion to Set Aside or Amend Default Jgm until five (5) days afte r either (I) the Court denies Sholes's pending Motion to Strike Plas' Opposition to Dft Sholes's Motion to Set Aside or Amend Default Jgm ("Motion to Strike") or (ii) upon the granting of the Motion to Strike, Pla file a revi sed Opposition to Dft Sholes's Motion to Set Aside or Amend Default Jgm in accordance with the Court's ruling. FURTHER ORDERED that Plas shall have until 10/2/08 to file a response to Sholes's Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING as MOOT Dft's 78 Motion to Expedite Ruling on Dft's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/23/08. (SAT)
January 21, 2009 87 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Defendant Sholes' Motion to Strike 76 Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Set Aside or Amend Default Judgment; striking Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Sholes' Motion to Set Aside or Amend Default Judgment without prejudice with leave to refile. Plaintiff shall refile their Opposition by 2/20/09. Plaintiffs' request for excess pages is GRANTED. The Court will allow Plaintiffs to file an Opposition no more than 30 pages. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/21/09.(LSP)
July 9, 2009 93 Featured Case ORDER denying 75 Defendant Law Offices of Bruce A. Sholes' Motion to Set Aside or Amend Default Judgment. Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/8/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Campbell, et al v. Fernand-Sholes, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]