Cygnus Systems, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation, et al Featured Case

Defendant: Apple Inc., Microsoft Corporation and Google Inc.
Plaintiff: Cygnus Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02337
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1338 Patent Infringement

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 53 Featured Case ORDER The Court, having considered the parties' request, is of the opinion that their request for dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims should be granted; That all Counterclaims by Defendants against Cygnus Systems, Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 07/31/09. (ESL)
July 31, 2009 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counterclaims by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Grossman, Lee)
July 28, 2009 51 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the 50 Stipulation of the parties: all claims for relief asserted against Apple Inc. by Cygnus Systems, Inc. and against Cygnus Systems, Inc. by Apple Inc. herein are dismissed, with prejudice. It is further ordered that all attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 07/27/09. (ESL)
July 16, 2009 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Apple Inc. by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Grossman, Lee)
July 7, 2009 49 Featured Case ORDER pursuant 48 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims for relief asserted against Microsoft Corp. by Cygnus Systems, Inc. and against Cygnus Systems, Inc. by Microsoft Corp. herein are dismissed, with prejudice. ORDER that all attorneys' fees, costs of court, and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/7/09. (TLJ)
July 6, 2009 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Microsoft Corporation by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Grossman, Lee)
May 29, 2009 47 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the 46 Stipulation of Dismissal: that dft Google Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/28/09. (KMG)
May 28, 2009 46 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Al-Salam, Ramsey)
April 23, 2009 45 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/15/2010. Dispositive motions due by 1/15/2010 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/23/09. (REW, )
April 16, 2009 44 TEXT-ONLY Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Scheduling Conference held on 4/16/2009. Appearances: Lee Grossman, Matthew McAndrews, and Peter Warner are present for Plaintiff. Garland Stephens and David Healey are present for Defendants Microsoft Corporation and Apple, Inc. and Ramsey Al-Salam and Jonathan James are present for Defendant Google, Inc. Status of the case is discussed. The Court will adopt the schedule counsel set forth in their case management report. Counsel are directed to email to chambers the schedule in word or word perfect so that the Court can prepare a scheduling order. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
April 10, 2009 43 REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting; Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Cygnus Systems, Inc., Defendants Microsoft Corporation, Apple Inc., Google Inc.. (Al-Salam, Ramsey) Modified on 4/15/2009, INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. (LSP).
April 8, 2009 42 Notice re Service by Microsoft Corporation, Apple Inc., Google Inc. of Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production (Healey, David)
March 30, 2009 41 Notice re of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Google Inc. (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
March 27, 2009 40 Notice re Notice of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation re Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Healey, David)
March 27, 2009 39 Notice re Notice of Disclosure by Apple Inc. re Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Healey, David)
March 27, 2009 38 Notice re Notice of Service re Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Cygnus Systems, Inc. (Grossman, Lee)
March 24, 2009 37 ANSWER to 28 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Grossman, Lee) Modified on 3/25/2009 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "RESPONSE" TO "ANSWER".
March 24, 2009 36 ANSWER to 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Grossman, Lee) Modified on 3/25/2009 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "RESPONSE" TO "ANSWER".
March 24, 2009 35 ANSWER to 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Grossman, Lee) Modified on 3/25/2009 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "RESPONSE" TO "ANSWER".
March 20, 2009 34 TEXT-ONLY Minute Order: Due to a scheduling conflict, Scheduling Conference is reset from 4/17/09 to 4/16/2009 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
March 4, 2009 33 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 4, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX081784 as to Ramsey M Al-Salam. (BAS, )
March 4, 2009 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam on behalf of Google Inc. (BAS, )
March 4, 2009 31 Featured Case ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. See text of attached order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/4/09. (SJF)
March 2, 2009 30 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cygnus Systems, Inc. by Google Inc..(James, Jonathan)
March 2, 2009 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation. (Healey, David)
March 2, 2009 28 ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cygnus Systems, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation.(Healey, David)
March 2, 2009 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Healey, David)
March 2, 2009 26 ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cygnus Systems, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Healey, David)
February 17, 2009 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google Inc.. (Strickland, Mark)
February 17, 2009 24 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Google, Inc. shall have through and until March 2, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to Cygnus' First Amended Complaint. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
February 17, 2009 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strickland, Mark) Modified on 2/18/2009 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME" TO "MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER".
February 3, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 3, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX080469 as to James Nicholas Bunch. (BAS, )
February 2, 2009 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James Nicholas Bunch on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, and Apple Inc. (BAS, )
February 2, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 2, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 200, receipt number PHX080444 as to Benjamin C Elacqua, David J Healey, John R Lane, Garland T Stephens. (BAS, )
February 2, 2009 15 TEXT-ONLY ORDER pursuant to Stipulations [docs. 13 and 14]: THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that Defendant Microsoft Corporation and Defendant Apple, Inc. shall have through and until 3/2/09 to answer or otherwise respond to Cygnus' First Amended Complaint [doc. 6]. No further extensions will be granted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
January 30, 2009 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David J Healey on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, and Apple Inc. (BAS, )
January 30, 2009 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Garland T Stephens on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, and Apple Inc. (BAS, )
January 30, 2009 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John R Lane on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, and Apple Inc. (BAS, )
January 30, 2009 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Benjamin C Elacqua on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, and Apple Inc. (BAS, )
January 30, 2009 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pla's First re 6 Amended Complaint by Cygnus Systems, Inc., and Microsoft Corporation. (KMG)
January 30, 2009 13 STIPULATION for Extension for Time to Respond to Pla's First re 6 Amended Complaint by Cygnus Systems, Inc., and Apple Inc. (KMG)
January 27, 2009 12 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 27, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 200, receipt number PHX080238 as to Anna B Folgers, Lee F Grossman, Matthew G McAndrews, Raymond Pardo Niro. (BAS, )
January 26, 2009 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anna B Folgers on behalf of Cygnus Systems, Inc. (BAS, )
January 26, 2009 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Raymond P Niro on behalf of Cygnus Systems, Inc. (BAS, )
January 26, 2009 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew G McAndrews on behalf of Cygnus Systems, Inc. (BAS, )
January 26, 2009 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lee F Grossman on behalf of Cygnus Systems, Inc. (BAS, )
January 7, 2009 7 Notice re Alias Summonses for Defendants by Cygnus Systems, Inc. Summons Alias - Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Summons Alias - Apple Inc., # 2 Summons Alias - Google Inc.)(Warner, Peter)
December 26, 2008 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants;Jury Demand, filed by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Warner, Peter)
December 24, 2008 5 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation, Apple Inc., Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Apple Inc., # 2 Google Inc.)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
December 23, 2008 4 Notice re Magistrate Consent Form (REK)
December 23, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 08-2337-PHX-NVW. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered by REK)
December 23, 2008 3 SUPPLEMENT of Civil Cover Sheet & Summonses re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Microsoft, # 2 Summons Google, # 3 Summons Apple)(Warner, Peter)
December 23, 2008 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Warner, Peter)
December 23, 2008 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002456298, filed by Cygnus Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Warner, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cygnus Systems, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cygnus Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C Warner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]