National Federation of the Blind, et al v. Arizona Board of Regents, et al Featured Case

Defendant: Arizona Board of Regents and Arizona State University
Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind and Darrell Shandrow
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv01359
Filed: June 25, 2009
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 75 Featured Case ORDER - Pursuant to the parties' 74 Stipulation of Dismissal, IT IS ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys fees. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/21/10. (SAT)
January 20, 2010 74 STIPULATION of Dismissal by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Goldstein, Daniel)
January 8, 2010 73 NOTICE of Settlement by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
November 30, 2009 72 Notice re of Service of Discovery (Second Supp. Disclosure Statement) by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind (Goldstein, Daniel)
November 30, 2009 71 Notice re Service of Defendants' Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
November 24, 2009 70 Notice re Service of Discovery by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
November 17, 2009 69 Notice re Service of Discovery by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind (Goldstein, Daniel)
November 17, 2009 68 Notice re Re: Service of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Request for Admissions by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind (Goldstein, Daniel)
November 4, 2009 67 Notice re Service of Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
October 29, 2009 66 Notice re Service of Discovery Responses by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Blandford, Alisa)
October 27, 2009 65 NOTICE of Deposition of Marc Maurer, filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
October 27, 2009 64 NOTICE of Deposition of Mitch Pomerantz, filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
October 21, 2009 63 Notice re Service of Discovery by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
October 16, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Shandrow for Lack of Standing. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/16/09.(DMT, )
October 16, 2009 61 Notice re Discovery Requests by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Blandford, Alisa)
October 9, 2009 60 Featured Case ORDER The Court had a telephonic conference with the parties this morning to resolve an impasse regarding the depositions of Plaintiffs' experts to be taken by the Defendants. The Department of Justice asked to be in telephonic attendance at the depositions and the Defendants object. Without ruling on the question of whether the Department of Justice may obtain transcripts of the depositions once complete, the Court orders that Defendant is not required to accomodate the Department of Justice's request to be telephonically present at the deposition itself. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on October 9, 2009. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, )
October 8, 2009 59 Notice re Service by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
October 6, 2009 58 NOTICE of Deposition of James Barbour, filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
October 1, 2009 57 NOTICE of Deposition of James Marks, filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
October 1, 2009 56 NOTICE of Deposition of George Kerscher, filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
October 1, 2009 55 NOTICE of Deposition of Albert Greco, filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
September 28, 2009 54 Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
September 25, 2009 53 Notice re Corrected Notice of Service of Discovery Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
September 24, 2009 52 Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery for Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
September 16, 2009 51 Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiffs' Supplemental and Amended Disclosures by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
September 15, 2009 50 Notice re Notice of Service of Expert Reports by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
September 14, 2009 49 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION re 48 Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/09. (TLJ)
September 11, 2009 48 Notice re Notice of Lodgment & Stipulation to Entry of [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B.)(Friedman, Andrew)
September 10, 2009 47 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice the 46 Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/9/09. (REW, )
September 8, 2009 46 STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by American Council of the Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew)
September 4, 2009 45 REPLY in Support re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Plaintiff Shandrow) filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Blandford, Alisa)
September 4, 2009 44 Notice re of Service of Discovery by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Robertson, Amy)
August 26, 2009 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Plaintiff Shandrow) for Lack of Standing filed by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Darrell Shandrow, # 2 Declaration of Amy F. Robertson)(Robertson, Amy)
August 21, 2009 42 Notice re Service by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Hudson, Lisa)
August 19, 2009 41 Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
August 17, 2009 40 Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery by American Council of the Blind, National Federation of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 30, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER granting Pla's Unopposed 38 Motion to Withdraw and directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate the following: 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 3 Motion for Expedited Discovery and 32 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Plas' Reply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/30/09. (ESL)
July 30, 2009 38 MOTION to Withdraw re Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Motion For Expedited Discovery, And Joint Stipulation To Extend Time by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew)
July 30, 2009 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Federation of the Blind. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 30, 2009 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Council of the Blind. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 28, 2009 35 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/12/2009 as to National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind. (KFZ)
July 28, 2009 34 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/30/2009. Dispositive motions due by 1/8/2010. See Order for full details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/28/09. (KFZ)
July 28, 2009 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Andrew Friedman and Daniel Goldstein for plaintiffs; Lisa Hudson and Alisa Blandford for defendants. Scheduling Conference held on 7/28/2009. Status of the case is discussed and case management deadlines are established. The Court signs the Case Management Order this date. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
July 27, 2009 32 STIPULATION re 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, 28 Response to Motion, Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Reply in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew)
July 27, 2009 31 Notice re Service by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement (Hudson, Lisa)
July 24, 2009 30 REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 24, 2009 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Plaintiff Shandrow) by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Blandford, Alisa)
July 24, 2009 28 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1, 2, 3)(Hudson, Lisa)
July 24, 2009 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
July 24, 2009 26 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University.(Hudson, Lisa)
July 23, 2009 25 Notice re of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 15, 2009 24 Featured Case ORDER SETTING EXPEDITED RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pending before the Court are Plas' Request 4 for Pretrial Conference and Unopposed Motion 21 for Expedited Scheduling Conference. The Court grants the motions. Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set as follows: Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk no later than 1:00 p.m. on July 27, 2009. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Motions (Dkt. ## 4, 21) according to this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/15/09. (Note: See Order for full details)(KMG, )
July 15, 2009 23 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 15, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX086479 as to Eve Hill. (BAS, )
July 15, 2009 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Eve Hill on behalf of plaintiffs National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, and Darrell Shandrow. (BAS, )
July 15, 2009 21 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Conference Unopposed Motion for Expedited Scheduling Conference by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew)
July 13, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend Time. ORDERED extending the deadline in which Defendants may respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to and including, 7/24/09. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/13/09. (MAP)
July 13, 2009 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alisa Ann Blandford on behalf of Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University (Blandford, Alisa)
July 10, 2009 18 MOTION to Continue Time to Respond to Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Hudson, Lisa)
July 7, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 7, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX086031 as to Timothy P Fox. (BAS, )
July 7, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX086032 as to Amy F Robertson. (BAS, )
July 6, 2009 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Timothy P Fox on behalf of National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, and Darrell Shandrow. (BAS, )
July 6, 2009 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Amy F Robertson on behalf of National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, and Darrell Shandrow. (BAS, )
July 2, 2009 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of Complaint served on Arizona State University on 6/26/2009, filed by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow., SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Friedman, Andrew)
July 2, 2009 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of Complaint served on Arizona State University on 6/26/2009, filed by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow., SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. Arizona State University served on 6/26/2009. (Friedman, Andrew)
July 2, 2009 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. Arizona Board of Regents served on 6/26/2009. (Friedman, Andrew)
June 29, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 29, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX085792 as to Daniel F Goldstein. (BAS, )
June 29, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX085791 as to Mehgan Sidhu. (BAS, )
June 26, 2009 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mehgan Sidhu on behalf of plaintiffs National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, and Darrell Shandrow. (BAS, )
June 26, 2009 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel F Goldstein on behalf of plaintiffs National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, and Darrell Shandrow. (BAS, )
June 25, 2009 8 Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents, Arizona State University. (Attachments: # 1 Arizona State University)(AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
June 25, 2009 7 Notice re Magistrate consent notice. (AMB)
June 25, 2009 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-09-1359-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AMB)
June 25, 2009 6 Notice re Order by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow re 4 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Pre Trial Conference Order Setting Pretrial Conference (Friedman, Andrew)
June 25, 2009 5 Notice re Order Granting Expedited Discovery by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow re 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Order for Expedited Discovery (Friedman, Andrew)
June 25, 2009 4 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Pre Trial Conference by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Friedman, Andrew)
June 25, 2009 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B.)(Friedman, Andrew)
June 25, 2009 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew)
June 25, 2009 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002942601 (TRO Requested), filed by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, Darrell Shandrow. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons Arizona Board of Regents, # 3 Summons Arizona State University)(Friedman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: National Federation of the Blind, et al v. Arizona Board of Regents, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Board of Regents
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona State University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Mehgan Sidhu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Council of the Blind
Represented By: Mehgan Sidhu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Shandrow
Represented By: Mehgan Sidhu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]