Plaza 75 Shopping Center, LLC v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Plaza 75 Shopping Center, LLC
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00592
Filed: March 16, 2010
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion for Relief from Settlement Conference Order Regarding Physical Appearance. ORDERED that the settlement conference currently scheduled for 8/6/10 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby VACATED. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/30/10.(LAD)
September 28, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 16(f), doc. 24, is GRANTED in part. Pla is awarded the sum of $875.00 in attorneys' fees, all of which were incurred after Friday, July 23, 2010. The Court finds the sum of $8 75.00 in attorneys' fees for the work performed related to the settlement conference and the hourly rate of $250.00 per hour are reasonable. Pla's request for reimbursement of the cost of the airfare in the sum of $179.40, incurre d on June 28, 2010, is DENIED because it was incurred before Friday, July 23, 2010 and there has been no showing that this Southwest Airlines' ticket may not be reused or credited to a later flight. FURTHER ORDERED that, unless otherwise ordered by Judge Campbell, the fees awarded herein shall not be paid until the prevailing party is determined at the conclusion of this case and the fees awarded herein shall then be added to, or reduced from, the prevailing party's attorneys' fees without duplication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/27/10.(KMG)
January 7, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 35) is granted. Pla's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied as moot. The Clerk shall enter jgm in favor of Dft and terminate this action. If Dft seeks to recover attys' fees in light of this ruling, it shall file a memorandum and supporting factual material by 1/28/2011, rather than following the briefing schedule set forth in LRCiv 54.2. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/11. (SAT)
March 7, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 49 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/7/2011.(NVO)
November 21, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's motion for attorneys' fees and costs (Doc. 56 ) is granted in part. Defendants are awarded attorneys' fees and costs of $26,114.00. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Plaza 75 Shopping Center, LLC v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaza 75 Shopping Center, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]