Baca v. Ewing et al

Plaintiff: Tobias I Baca
Defendant: Robert N Ewing and Fremont, Industrial Indemnity, and Cambridge
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00883
Filed: May 3, 2011
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's application for default judgment (Doc. 18 ) is denied. The claims against Defendants Ewing are dismissed for lack of service. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/13/2012. (KMG)
July 12, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff shall file a memorandum on or before July 27, 2012, explaining the basis for this Court's subject matter jurisdiction over this action. If Plaintiff fails to file a memorandum by that date, or fails to establish this Court's subject matter jurisdiction, this action will be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter without further order if Plaintiff fails to file a memorandum by July 27, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/2012. (KMG)
July 12, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc. 7) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/2011.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baca v. Ewing et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobias I Baca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert N Ewing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont, Industrial Indemnity, and Cambridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]