Travelers Indemnity Company v. Crown Corr Incorporated

Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Crown Corr Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv00965
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 27 Motion for Summary Disposition of the Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint with Supporting Affidavit; granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting Defendant's 23 Motion to Strike Affidavit Attached to Third Amended Complaint; granting Defendant's 22 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendant. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/27/11. (ESL)
June 29, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses in the amount of $105,284.10. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/29/12.(LAD)
July 9, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUNE 29, 2012 ORDER granting 39 Crown Corr's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses in the amount of $105,284.10. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/9/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company v. Crown Corr Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard G Potts
Represented By: James Keller LaRoe, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Corr Incorporated
Represented By: James Lawrence Blair
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: Denise J Wachholz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]