AIRFX.com et al v. AirFX LLC

Plaintiff: AIRFX.com and Marc Lurie
Defendant: AirFX LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01064
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING defendant's 93 motion to seal. Pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(e), the lodged deposition excerpts will not be filed. Defendant shall resubmit the document for filing within five (5) days of the entry of this order. See LRCiv 5.6(e). DE NYING defendant's 92 motion for summary judgment. GRANTING plaintiffs' 87 motion for summary judgment. The Clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of plaintiffs/counterdefendants and against defendant/counterclaimant on (1) plainti ffs' claim for reverse domain name hijacking; (2) defendant's counterclaim for trademark infringement; and (3) defendant's counterclaim for cybersquatting in violation of the ACPA. That the domain name www.airfx.com not be transferred to defendant, but instead, must remain registered with plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/23/12.(DMT)
March 7, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses. We award attorneys' fees to the plaintiffs in the amount of $103,972.50 and deny non-taxable costs. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/7/13. (LAD)
June 6, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Motion to Stay of execution on attorneys' fees pending appeal. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/6/13.(SJF)
October 20, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer; granting 12 plaintiffs' Motion for fees and costs in the amount of $2,313.00. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/20/11.(TLJ)
December 29, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs'/counterclaimants' AIRFX.com and Marc Lurie's partial 33 motion to dismiss. AirFX LLC's counterclaims for intentional interference with prospective economic/contractual advantage (count three) and abuse of process (count four) against plaintiffs/counterclaimants AIRFX.com and Marc Lurie are dismissed. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/28/11.(ESL) Modified on 12/29/2011 to include the motion was granted (ESL).
January 17, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Amend. Plaintiffs shall comply with the filing and service requirements of LRCiv 15.1. ORDERED denying 56 Motion to Strike. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/17/12.(LAD)
March 9, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pedal Logic LP and Juno Holdings Inc.'s 55 motion to dismiss. Defendant's counterclaim for trademark infringement (count one) against Pedal Logic LP is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Defendan t's counterclaim for trademark infringement (count one) against Juno Holdings Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Defendant's counterclaims for intentional interference with prospective economic/contractual advantage (count three) and abuse of process (count four) against Pedal Logic LP and Juno Holdings are DISMISSED pursuant to defendant's request. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 03/08/12. (ESL)
March 29, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying counterdefendants AIRFX.com and Marc Lurie's 71 motion to strike; granting counterclaimant AirFX LLC's 64 motion to withdraw nunc pro tunc; denying counterdefendants AIRFX.com and Marc Lurie's 57 motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 03/29/12. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIRFX.com et al v. AirFX LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIRFX.com
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Lurie
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AirFX LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]