Felix v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Bobbi Lee Felix
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01203
Filed: June 17, 2011
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties Stipulated Protective Order Re: Nondisclosure of Confidential Information (Doc. 16) is rejected without prejudice to the filing of a revised stipulation and proposed form of protective order that complies with this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/4/2011.(TCA)
August 29, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 73 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/29/12.(MAP)
January 23, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the United States' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert (Doc. 58 ) is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 75 ) is denied. The parties shall file their Joint Pretri al Statement no later than March 25, 2013. FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference shall be held on Monday, April 22, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 601. The parties shall file their trial briefs and initial proposed findings of fact and concl usions of law no later than April 29, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the bench trial of this action shall commence on Tuesday, May 14, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 601 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse in Phoenix, AZ. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/22/2013. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Felix v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Lee Felix
Represented By: Daniel R Ortega, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]