Seychelles Organics Incorporated v. Rose

Plaintiff: Seychelles Organics Incorporated
Defendant: John R Rose
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01746
Filed: September 6, 2011
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Protective Order. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/20/13. (LAD)
October 2, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Accordingly, it is ORDERED GRANTING Schneider & Onofry's Motion to Withdraw as counsel to Rose. (Doc. 33 ). All further notice to Rose shall be at the address in the motion. It is further ORDERED GRANTING Rose's Motion for an ext ension of time within which to file a Response to the Motion for Contempt and Sanctions. (Doc. 34 ). Rose shall have to and including October 18, 2013 within which to file a Response to the Motion for Contempt and Sanctions (doc. 31 ). No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/2/13. (LAD)
November 5, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 MOTION for a Finding of Contempt Against Defendant John Rose. Contempt Hearing set for 12/11/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Frederick J Martone. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/4/13. (LAD)
July 8, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/8/2014.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Seychelles Organics Incorporated v. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seychelles Organics Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Ann Marcus
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Rose
Represented By: Jonathan B Frutkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]