United States of America v. Rolls Royce Phantom Sedan 2004, VIN #SCA1S68444UX07410

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Rolls Royce Phantom Sedan 2004, VIN #SCA1S68444UX07410
Case Number: 2:2012cv02337
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Search and forfeiture of monetary instruments
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Blooms's 16 Motion to Set Aside Default, Re-Open Cases and Unseal Documents in the Forfeiture Action. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/19/2013.(LFIG)
December 9, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff or his legal guardian must file a Notice of Appeal on or before January 20, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/9/2013.(LFIG)
January 15, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the motion to seal (#7 in CV 12-1999); granting the motion to transfer (#9 in CV 12-1999); the Clerk is instructed to transfer CV 12-2337-PHX-BSB to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/14/13. (NOTE: new case number is CV 12-2337-PHX-FJM)(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rolls Royce Phantom Sedan 2004, VIN #SCA1S68444UX07410
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reid Charles Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls Royce Phantom Sedan 2004, VIN #SCA1S68444UX07410
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.