Equity Solutions LLC v. Fowler et al

Defendant: Unknown Fowler, Reginald D Fowler and Spiral Incorporated
Plaintiff: Equity Solutions LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02646
Filed: December 11, 2012
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING defendants' motion to set aside the default (doc. 16 ) and DENYING plaintiff's application for entry of default judgment (doc. 15 ). Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss (doc. 14 ) on or before March 15, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/5/2013.(KMG)
January 27, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment against Fowler in Count 1 is denied. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Equity and against Spiral on Count 3 in the amount of $4,042,165 .00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted on Equity's alter ego claim in Count 4 of the Complaint. Summary judgment is denied with respect to Defendants' condition precedent claim. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/27/13.(LAD)
March 4, 2014 91 Featured Case STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to 90 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff Equity Solutions, LLC shall have Judgment in its favor and against Defendants Reginald D. Fowler and Spiral, Inc., jointly and severally , for the principal sum of $4,042,165.00 with interest accruing thereon from the date of this Judgment until paid at the statutory rate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs incurred up to and until the date of this Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all pending Court dates in this matter are hereby vacated. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/4/14. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Equity Solutions LLC v. Fowler et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald D Fowler
Represented By: Brian David Myers
Represented By: Robert Patrick Rutila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiral Incorporated
Represented By: Brian David Myers
Represented By: Robert Patrick Rutila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Solutions LLC
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Sornsin
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]