Mitchell et al v. Flagstaff, City of et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Christopher Mitchell and Ruth Bradburn Mitchell
Defendant: Flagstaff, City of, Roy Taylor and Unknown Taylor
Case Number: 3:2011cv08140
Filed: September 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 plaintiffs' request for clarification or alternatively request for extension. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/13/2012.(KAR)
July 26, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' motion to exclude expert opinions of Ronald Scott 107 ; Defendants may have up to and including 8/6/12 to file an amended version of their expert report(s), limited to amendments that address Ronald Scott's opinio ns; Defendants may have up to and including 8/6/12 to disclose any rebuttal experts, limited to experts who will rebut Ronald Scott's opinions; after judgment has been entered in this case, Defendants may file a motion for attorneys' fees a nd costs related to obtaining an amended version of their expert report(s) in accordance with LRCiv 54.2; this order shall not be construed to affect any other deadline set forth in the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/25/12. (REW)
October 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER plaintiffs shall have to and including 11/03/11 to file their response to the motion to dismiss. The clerk shall update the docket to indicate that Lee Brooke Phillips is no longer counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/13/11. (ESL)
September 14, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting plaintiffs' motion to compel production of FTO and OIT documents 118 , Defendants shall produce the requested documents within 5 days; granting plaintiffs' motion to compel documents in privilege log 119 , Defendants shall produce the e-mails, limited to those for which only workproduct protection was asserted within 5 days; denying plaintiffs' motion to compel medical vision recordsof Roy Taylor 120 ; denying defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' exhibits and expert addendum reports 134 , this denial is without prejudice to defendants making an appropriate objection during trial, should this action proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/12. (REW)
November 2, 2012 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages 178 ; denying plaintiffs' motion for sanctions due to spoliation of evidence 173 ; denying plaintiffs' motion for sanctions for intentional misrepresentations to the court 175 , and awarding defendants' fees and costs incurred in responding to the motion. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/31/12.(REW)
November 18, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 4 motion to dismis state law claims. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/18/11.(ESL)
December 13, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Motion to Seal. (See attached PDF for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/12/12.(JAMA)
March 23, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 27 Motion to Amend; Plaintiffs shall comply with the filing and service reqeuirements of LRCiv 15.1. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/22/12.(REW)
June 20, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 52 Motion to substitute expert witness; denying Plaintiffs' 67 Motion for order to release and transfer custody of evidence for inspection and non-destructive testing. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/19/12.(REW)
June 21, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Roy Taylor's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment on qualified immunity. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/20/12.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Flagstaff, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Christopher Mitchell
Represented By: Michael William Pearson
Represented By: Lee Brooke Phillips
Represented By: Daniel Seth Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Bradburn Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel Seth Riley
Represented By: Lee Brooke Phillips
Represented By: Michael William Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstaff, City of
Represented By: Amy Lynn Nguyen
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Taylor
Represented By: Amy Lynn Nguyen
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Taylor
Represented By: Amy Lynn Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.