Meadow Valley Contractors Incorporated v. C&S Engineers Incorporated et al

Counter_defendant: Meadow Valley Contractors Incorporated
Plaintiff: Meadow Valley Contractors Incorporated
Defendant: C&S Engineers Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Counter_claimant: C&S Engineers Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2011cv08154
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Remand and/or for Abstention. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/14/12.(LAD)
May 31, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline to file Stipulation; and extending the time in which the parties may submit their stipulation to and including June 11, 2012. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/30/12.(DMT)
June 22, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Meadow Valley's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/22/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadow Valley Contractors Incorporated v. C&S Engineers Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Meadow Valley Contractors Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Represented By: John Randall Jefferies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meadow Valley Contractors Incorporated
Represented By: John Randall Jefferies
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Engineers Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Rose Friedman
Represented By: E Scott Dosek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: C&S Engineers Incorporated
Represented By: E Scott Dosek
Represented By: Jennifer Rose Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]