Candrian et al v. RS Industries Incorporated

Plaintiff: Scott Candrian and Beverly Candrian
Defendant: RS Industries Incorporated, Tim Hintze, Kevin Conklin, Todd Hintze, Perry Hintze, Stanley Hintze, Jeffrey Hintze and Greg Hester
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00088
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2013 105 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot 76 Motion for Hearing; granting 78 Motion to Amend/Correct; Denying as moot 79 Motion to Expedite. The Clerk of Court shall not docket, pursuant to § II .H. of the CM-ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, the proposed Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 78-1). The Candrians shall file a verified/signed copy of the proposed TAC within 10 days of the dateof this Order. Defendants Conklin and Hester are Dismissed for lacfk of personal jurisdiction. All claims are Dismissed pursuant to the agreement to arbitrate. The Clerk of Court shall close its file in this matter.. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 11/21/2013.(JKM)
March 8, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER : Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice, Preliminary Injunction, Appointment of Receiver, and Request for Court-Directed Mediation (Doc.7) is GRANTED IN PART. The Court will issue the Temporary Restraining Order as a separate Order. Denying 13 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/26/2013, @10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson.. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/7/2013.(JKM)
May 21, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER the March 8, 2013 29 Temporary Restraining Order is DISSOLVED 7 Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED filed by Scott Candrian, Beverly Candrian.. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/21/2013. (JKM)
October 3, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER denying 84 Motion for TRO; denying 84 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 85 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction.. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/3/2013.(JKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Candrian et al v. RS Industries Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Candrian
Represented By: Cassandra Blythe Meynard
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Candrian
Represented By: Cassandra Blythe Meynard
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Gerald S Maltz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hintze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Conklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Hintze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Hintze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Hintze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hintze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]