Joanne Siegel et al v. Warner Bros Entertainment Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Joanne Siegel and Laura Siegel Larson
Defendant: Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics and Does
Counter Claimant: DC Comics, Time Warner Inc and Warner Bros Entertainment Inc
Counter Defendant: Laura Siegel Larson and Joanne Siegel
Intervenor: Bad Hat Harry Productions, Inc and Bryan Singer
 
Case Number: 2:2004cv08400
Filed: October 8, 2004
 
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Stephen G. Larson
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2007 100 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson : Discovery cut-off 3/30/2007. Motions due by 4/23/2007. Jury Trial continued to 1/22/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. Pretrial Conference continued to 12/3/2007 at 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson.(mrgo, )
April 2, 2007 101 Featured Case
ORDER VACATING 4/16/07 HEARING ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Absent leave of a court order from Judge Larson to conduct discovery beyond the cut-off, the following motions, filed 3/26/07, are off calendar: 1) Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Whistle-Blower Documents; 2) Defendants Motion to Compel 3rd Party Kevin Marks and Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson to Answer Questions at Deposition; 3) Defendants Motion to Compel 3rd Parties Kevin Marks and Gang, Tyre, Ramer & Brown, Inc. To Produce Documents Relating to Authority; and4) Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs Special Interrogatories.(ib, )
April 3, 2007 117 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the expert Discovery cut-off shall be extended from 3/30/07 to 4/10/2007.(mrgo, )
April 10, 2007 119 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE SCHEUDLING ORDER AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson: ORDERED that a non-expert discovery cutoff in these Matters will be extended to the extend necessary to allow either party to comply with a discovery order resulting from any discovery motion brought within the Motion Filing Cutoff [All Motions] of 4/23/07 but not otherwise.(am, )
April 20, 2007 122 Featured Case
ORDER granting plaintiff's ex parte application [lodged 4-17-07] by Judge Stephen G. Larson: summary judgment filing cutoff 4/30/07, opposition brief due 5/28/07, and reply brief due 6/18/07. [Deadlines/Hearings, 100, Set Deadlines: Motions due by 4/30/2007.(jh, )
April 30, 2007 158
MINUTES of Motion Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs Special Interrogatories [102] is denied. Both requests for sanctions are denied. No further order will issue.Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Whistle-Blower Documents [107] is granted in part. Plaintiff shall submit a declaration re already produced and privileged escrow documents as directed by the court to Defendant no later than 5/21/07, and documents may be released by the escrow, or returned to Plaintiffs, as stated on the record. No further order will issue. Defendants Motion to Compel 3rd Parties Kevin Marks and Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson to Answer Questions at Deposition [104] is submitted. Defendants Motion to Compel 3rd Parties Kevin Marks and Gang Tyre, Ramer and Brown, Inc. To Produce Documents Relating to Authority [110] is submitted. Court Smart: 04/30/07. (ib, )
May 2, 2007 159 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Defendants Motion to Compel 3rd Parties Kevin Marks and Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson to Answer Questions at Deposition [104] is denied. Defendants Motion to Compel 3rd Parties Kevin Marks and Gang Tyre, Ramer and Brown, Inc. To Produce Documents Relating to Authority [110] is denied. The Court strikes the 37th affirmative defense from replies to counterclaims.(ib, )
May 8, 2007 165
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen G. Larson:NOTICE RESETTING HEARING ON NOTICED MOTIONS. (1)Plaintiffs Joanne Siegel and Laura Siegel Larson's Motion for partial Summary Judgment filed April 30, 2007(2)Defendants and Counter-claimant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed April 30, 2007. Counsel and/or parties are hereby notified that due to the unavailability of the Judicial Officer, the above-referenced noticed motions are reset for hearing from July 16, 2007, to July 23, 2007, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom One of the above-referenced court. IT IS SO ORDERED.[RE: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment[160], Set Deadlines/Hearings:Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson]Court Reporter: None. (jh, )
May 14, 2007 178
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of DC Comics [127] is denied. No further order shall issue. MOTION to Compel Defendant DC Comics production of documents [137] is submitted. MOTION to Compel production of documents from defendants Time Warner Inc., etc. [133] is submitted. Re MOTION to Compel 3rd party Bryan Singer to attend deposition and produce documents [130]: The Court stays its ruling until May 18, 2007 to allow counsel to file a joint report as to any possible resolution of the matter. Court Smart: 5/14/07.(ib, )
December 29, 2004 18 Featured Case
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson : Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2004 04:00 PM before Honorable Dean D. Pregerson. The Conference will be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan no later than twenty-one (21) days. (See Order for further details)(yl, )
June 12, 2007 193 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' summary judgment briefing schedule be modified as follows: Summary Judgment Reply Briefs due 6/25/07.(mrgo)
July 11, 2007 205 Featured Case
MINUTES: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION [201] TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS defendants ex parte application to continue the 7/23/07, hearing date. However, the hearing on the parties cross-motions is continued to 8/13/07 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, a date well after when the state court trial should be concluded. The continuance of the hearing date on the parties cross-motions for partial summary judgment does not affect the previously set dates in this case (See document for details.) IT IS SO ORDERED, by Judge Stephen G. Larson. (de)
July 25, 2007 207 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson RE: SEALED DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO 4/5/06 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND LOCAL RULE 79-5. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED the the exhibits (exhibits P, BB, CC and DD to the Toberoff declaration) shall be removed from the public file in this action. The Clerk shall replace such exhibits with copies of the Exhibits in sealed envelopes, submitted concurrently herewith, pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mrgo)
July 31, 2007 208
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER VACATING REFERENCE OF CERTAIN UNRESOLVED DISCOVERY MATTERS; ORDER SETTING HEARING ON UNRESOLVED DISCOVERY MATTERS held before Judge Stephen G. Larson re: MOTION to Compel[137], MOTION to Compel[130], and MOTION to Compel[133]. Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Zarefsky: MOTION to Compel[137], MOTION to Compel[130], MOTION to Compel[133]. Motions set for hearing on 8/13/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson.(mrgo)
August 9, 2007 223 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S 7/27/07 by Judge Stephen G. Larson re MOTION to Compel[137], MOTION to Compel[130], MOTION to Compel[133]. Motion hearing continued to 9/17/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson.(mrgo)
August 8, 2007 224
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen G. Larson. The Joint Stipulation to continue the hearing date on plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel[133] and plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel[137] is DENIED. The hearing on those 2 discovery motions remains calendared for 8/13/07, at 10:00am. The Joint Stipulation to continue the hearing date on plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel[130] is also DENIED; however, in lieu of hearing the matter on 8/13/07, the hearing on this motion is VACATED and the Court will decide the motion based on the papers submitted and the transcript of the hearing before Judge Zarefsky.(mrgo)
August 13, 2007 226
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen G. Larson RE: (1) MOTION to Compel[137], (2) MOTION to Compel[130], and (3) MOTION to Compel[133]. The 1st and 2nd motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties are ORDERED to make arrangements for plaintiffs' auditor(s) to conduct a damages-related audit of defendants Time Warner Inc, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Warner Bros Television Production Inc, and DC Comics to be completed by or before 9/17/07. Furthermore, counsel for the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer in person on or before 8/24/07. (See document for further specifics). The 3rd motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Brian Singer is ORDERED to sit for his deposition within 30 days of the date of this order at a date, time, and place to be mutually-agreed to by counsel. (See document for further specifics)Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza.(mrgo)
August 22, 2007 233
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen G. Larson DENYING defendant's 8/15/07, Application to modify scheduling order. However, counsel for the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer in person on or before 8/31/07. Counsel are thereafter afforded leave to file with this Court a Joint Stipulation consistent with the requirements of Local Rule 37-2. Said stipulation is to be filed before this Court, not Magistrate Judge Zarefsky on or before 9/21/07. Plaintiff's EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File opposition [228] is DENIED as moot.(mrgo)
September 11, 2007 235 Featured Case
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING COURTS AUGUST 13, 2007 SCHEDULING ORDER. Good cause appearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the Courts 8/13/07 Minute Order is modified as follows: 1. Bryan Singer is ORDERED to sit for his deposition no later than 11/30/07; 2. Counsel are ORDERED to telephonically arrange for Mr. Singer's deposition to occur at a date, time and place that is convenient for all parties and their counsel; and 3. Counsel are afforded leave to file a Joint Stipulation consistent with the requirements of Local Rule 37-2 identifying any outstanding discovery dispute related to Mr Singer's deposition on or before the 15th day after Mr Singer's deposition. It is further ORDERED that the Ex Parte Application of Non-Party Bryan Singer for Order Modifying Courts 8/13/07 Scheduling Order is moot. IT IS SO ORDERED, by Judge Stephen G. Larson. (de)
September 17, 2007 236
MINUTES RE OUTSTANDING Discovery Matters held before Stephen G. Larson : Except as set forth below, discovery in these matters is ORDERED closed: 1) Bryan Singer is ORDERED to sit for a deposition by no later than 11/30/07; plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson is ORDERED to sit for a deposition by no later than 10/9/07; defendant DC Comics is ORDERED to produce the "reserve account document" to plaintiffs on or before 9/21/07; defendants are ORDERED to produce to plaintiffs all requested "ultimates" by 9/21/07; plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying Court's 8/13/07 Scheduling Order[234] is GRANTED in part in that plaintiffs are afforded until 10/9/07, to complete their damages-related audit of defendants Time Warner Inc, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Warner Bros Television Production Ind and DC Comics. (See document for further specifics) Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza.(mrgo)
September 20, 2007 245 Featured Case
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Per Judge Larson's minute order of 9/17/07, Defendants' Motion to Compel and for Sanctions [240] is denied as moot. The hearing date of 10/15/07 is vacated. (ib)
September 24, 2007 253 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson : Mediation deadline is 10/26/07; Jury instructions due by 11/8/07; objections to jury instructions due 11/15/07; Local Rule 16 conference due 11/20/07; Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/3/2007; motion in limine oppositions due 12/21/07; in limine replies due 1/4/08; memo of contentions, witness and exhibits lists, proposed vire dire and proposed pretrial conference order due 12/28/07; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. Trial briefs due 1/14/08. Trial dates will remain as currently scheduled.(mrgo)
October 23, 2007 272 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following pre-trial date shall be applicable to these matter: Mediation deadline-30 days after the Court enters an order on all of the parties' cross-motions for partial summary judgment.(mrgo)
October 23, 2007 273
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen G. Larson DENYING plaintiffs' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendants' Compliance With the Court's 9/17/07 Discovery Order[258]. (See document for specifics)(mrgo)
October 30, 2007 274 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following pre-trial date shall be applicable to these matters: Jury Instructions due 30 days after the Court enters an order on all of the parties' cross-motions fo partial summary judgment. Ojections to jury instructios due 7 days after jury instructions are due. (mrgo)
November 15, 2007 275
STIPULATION for Order Re Scheduling Order filed by defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics, Does. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re: Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Order)(Mandavia, Anjani)
November 16, 2007 276
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE SCHEDULING OF CASE NO. CV 04-8400 SGL (RZx) held before Judge Stephen G. Larson : The Court has received and reviewed the parties' stipulation re: scheduling order, filed on November 15, 2007. The parties stipulate and agree to continue certain scheduling dates in Case No. CV 04-8400-SGL (RZx), the "Superman" case. The Court declines to adopt the proposed dates provided by the parties. On its own motion, the Court hereby sets the following dates in CV 04-8400-SGL (RZx):Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/11/2008. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/16/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. (mrgo)
November 29, 2007 277
STIPULATION to Reschedule the Deposition of Third Party Bryan Singer filed by Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Toberoff, Marc)
December 5, 2007 278 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson re Stipulation to Reschedule Deposition of 3rd party Bryan Singer 277. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deposition of Bryan Singer shall be held on 12/6/07, commencing promptly at 12:30 pm. (mrgo)
December 6, 2007 279
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Michael Bergman's Declaration)(Mandavia, Anjani)
March 8, 2005 27
MINUTES: Counsel are notified that on the court's own motion defendants/counter-claimant's motion to consolidate related cases (filed on 2/9/05) and the scheduling conference shall be heard on the original date of 3/14/05 at the new time of 3:30 p.m. Judge Dean D. Pregerson.Court Reporter: None present. (bp, )
December 10, 2007 280
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman279 filed by Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson. (Toberoff, Marc)
December 10, 2007 281
DECLARATION of Marc Toberoff, Esq. in opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman279 filed by Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-P# 2 Exhibit Exhibits Q-DD)(Toberoff, Marc)
December 11, 2007 282
REPLY In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman279 and Declaration of Michael Bergman filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics, Counter Claimants DC Comics, Time Warner Inc, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. (Mandavia, Anjani)
December 11, 2007 283
OBJECTIONS in Support of Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman279 and Declaration of Nicholas Williamson in support thereof filed by Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson. (Toberoff, Marc)
December 11, 2007 284
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER BY Judge Stephen G. Larson: the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to electronically file their proposed stipulation continuing the pre-trial and trial dates by 4 p.m. December 12, 2007, and to fax a courtesy copy of the same to the Court (fax number: (951) 328-4418) by 4 p.m. December 12, 2007. See Minute Order for complete text of this notice.IT IS SO ORDERED. [re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman279 (jh)
December 12, 2007 285
STIPULATION for Order Re Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Order)(Mandavia, Anjani)
December 12, 2007 286
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER BY Judge Stephen G. Larson: the Court hereby GRANTS defendants ex parte request affording Mr. Johnson leave to submit a rebuttal report beyond the December 13, 2007, date as required by Rule 26(a)(2)(C), and further to allow a round of depositions to be taken of both sides financial experts. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that Mr. Sills submit such a second supplemental report to defendants by January 28, 2008. Court-ordered Mediation: March 28, 2008; Jury Instructions: March 31, 2008; Objections to Jury Instructions: April 7, 2008; Hearing on Motions in Limine: April 14, 2008, at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pre-Trial Conference: April 28, 2008, at 11:00 a.m. Trial Briefs: May 5, 2008; Trial of Case No. CV 04-8400: May 13, 2008, at 9:30 a.m.; Trial of Case No. CV 04-8776: Thereafter, as set by Court. see Minute Order for complete text and requirements. [re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Rebuttal Expert Report Date for January 14, 2008; Declaration of Franklin Johnson; Declaration of Anjani Mandavia; Declaration of Michael Bergman279., Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2008 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson.,Jury Trial set for 5/13/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. (jh)
December 13, 2007 287
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: David L Burg is no longer attorney of record in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics (ak) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2008 (gg, ).
January 30, 2008 288
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney James D Weinberger counsel for Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics, Counter Claimants DC Comics, Time Warner Inc, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. Justin Deabler will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Justin Deabler is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and counterclaimant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. et al. (Weinberger, James)
February 21, 2008 289
STIPULATION for Order Re Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation Re Scheduling Order)(Mandavia, Anjani)
February 21, 2008 290
STIPULATION for Order Requesting Status Conference and Briefing Schedule Regarding Certain Trial and Pre-Trial Matters filed by Defendant Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Requesting Status Conference)(Mandavia, Anjani)
February 22, 2008 291 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson Re Stipulation Requesting Status Conference and Briefing Schedule Regarding Certain Trial and Pre-Trial Matters 290: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties appear for a Status Conference before this Court on 3/3/2008 at 10:00AM. Previously entered Scheduling Order is VACATED. (ad)
February 29, 2008 292 Featured Case
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER issued by Judge Stephen G. Larson: Due to the Courts congested docket, the status conference set for this matter on March 3, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby re-scheduled for March 10, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. [re: Order,, Set Hearings, 291, Stipulation for Order, 290, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:Status Conference set for 3/10/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. (jh)
March 26, 2008 293 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTre MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment[160] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit) (jh)
March 31, 2008 294
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN CV-04-8776 CASE; ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO ENGAGE IN MEANINGFUL SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS; ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; ORDER STAYING RULING ON OUTSTANDING ISSUES CONTAINED IN JULY 27, 2007, ORDER PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS held before Judge Stephen G. Larson re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment[160].Jury Trial set in the Superman case for 11/4/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. Pretrial Conference set in the Superman case for 10/6/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. (See document for further specifics) (mrgo)
April 9, 2008 295
NOTICE of New Evidence Re: Defendants' Declaration Filed Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2007 Order Re "Escrow Documents" filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wayne M. Smith In Support of Defendants' Declaration Filed Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2007 Order Re "Escrow Documents"# 2 Declaration of JAmes D. Weinberger In Support of Defendants' Declaration Filed Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2007 Order Re "Escrow Documents"# 3 Exhibit to James D. Weinberger Declaration In Support of Defendants' Declaration Filed Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2007 Order Re "Escrow Documents")(Hagen, Adam)
April 10, 2008 296
OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other)295 of New Evidence filed by Defendants filed by Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc Toberoff)(Toberoff, Marc)
April 10, 2008 297
NOTICE of Non-Objection to Plaintiffs' Request For Time To Respond To Defendants' Notice of New Evidence Re: Defendants' Declaration Filed Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2007 Order Re "Escrow Documents" filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics. (Mandavia, Anjani)
March 16, 2005 31 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson SP3 the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3) requiring the parties to appear before a retired judicial officer or other private or non-profit dispute resolution body.(bp, )
April 29, 2005 34 Featured Case
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Last day to join other parties and Amended Pleadings 9/15/2005. Discovery cut-off 5/17/2006. Motions due by 6/19/2006. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2006 09:00 AM before Honorable Dean D. Pregerson. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2006 09:00 AM before Honorable Dean D. Pregerson.(bp, )
September 26, 2008 374 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER REGARDING ESCROW DOCUMENTS held before Judge Stephen G. Larson: (see document image for details). Accordingly, pursuant to the terms of Magistrate Judge Zarefskys Order, the escrow agent is ORDERED to produce to defendant s counsel forthwith any escrow document not previouslylisted in a privilege log or as having been previously been produced. That is to say, the escrow agent is to match up the escrow documents with the privilege log entries and production documents l isted in Mr. Toberoffs May 21, 2007, declaration. Thus, the nine documents produced by the escrow agent to the Court for in camera review are to be produced to defendants counselas those documents were not previously identified in a privilege log provided by plaintiffs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ad)
October 6, 2008 379 Featured Case MINUTES OF Status Conference REGARDING RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL FOR REMAINING ISSUES held before Judge Stephen G. Larson: The Court GRANTS defendants request to file objections to plaintiffs September 23, 2008, filings and also GRANTS plaintiffs request t o file a response to defendants September 26, 2008, objections. As noted in its previous order, no further pleadings are to be filed with the Court in connection with the issues presented in the parties brief of additional issues without leave of the Court. As far as scheduling of the trial in this matter, the Court will stagger trial of the alter ego and accounting claims. The alter ego claim shall be tried to this Court on January 20, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom One. The Court will conduc t a final pre-trial conference in connection with the alter ego claim on January 12, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom One. The accounting claims shall be tried to this Court on March 24, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom One. The Court will conduct a final pre-trial conference in connection with the accounting claim on March 16, 2009, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom One.Court Reporter: Don Hilland. (mrgo)
September 21, 2005 37 Featured Case
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.2 of General Order 224 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 04-8400 RSWL (RZx).(rn, ) Modified on 10/4/2005 (rn, ).
September 21, 2005 38 Featured Case
ORDER: The time during which the parties may amend their pleadings is hereby extended to 10/17/05 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson : granting [35] Ex Parte Application for Order (bp, )
September 30, 2005 39 Featured Case
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: This action has been reassigned. Please substitute the initials RSWL in place of the initials DDP. It is imperative that the initials RSWL be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 08/28/06, 11 am. The Jury Trial is set for 09/05/06, 9 am. This Court is located at: 312 N. Spring Street, Fifth Floor, Courtroom 21, Los Angeles, California, 90012. Court Reporter: Not Present. (kd)
October 13, 2004 3
MINUTES: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. Judge Dean D. Pregerson:Court Reporter: None present. (bp, )
October 4, 2005 40
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, Incorrect judge's initials were indicated in document number 37. The correct judge's initials are RSWL and the cas ereads as CV 04-8400 RSWL (RZx) Re: 224 Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - pursuant to GO 224, 3.2 (CV-52) (rn, )
October 18, 2005 43
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Time Warner Inc, DC Comics, Does 1-10 amending Complaint - (Discovery)[1] with JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiffs Joanne Siegel, Laura Siegel Larson. (jp, )
February 15, 2006 48
PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order. DENIED. No good cause shown, Fed.R.Civ.P.26(c), and inadequate specification of documents to be protected by Judge Ralph Zarefsky,(bp, )
April 5, 2006 50 Featured Case
STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew (see document for details)(bp, )
April 26, 2006 51 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the 4/29/05 scheduling order be modified as follows: Non-Expert discovery cut-off 11/17/06; Expert discovery cut-off 2/16/07; Motion filing cut-off 3/19/07; Pre-trial Conference 5/21/07, at 11:00 a.m. Trial 6/26/07 at 9:00 a.m. by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew.(bp, )
July 6, 2006 52 Featured Case
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: All parties shall refrain from writing letters to the Magistrate Judge or members of his staff. Letters will not be considered and will be stricken from the record. Local Rule 83-2.11. Any matter a party wishes to bring to the attention of the Court must be filed and served on opposing counsel in strict accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. (ib, )
July 8, 2009 554 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW FOLLOWING TRIAL held before Judge Stephen G. Larson: (see document for specifics). (mrgo)
August 14, 2006 57
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents [53]. Plaintiff shall produce all privilege logs, including any revisions, by 9/29/06. The remainder of the motion is submitted. (ib, )
August 18, 2006 58 Featured Case
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [53] by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: With the exception of the 9/21/02 letter, Defendants Motion to Compel is denied.(ib, )
August 30, 2006 59 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER that defendants' motion for reconsideration shall be filed and served on 9/1/06, for hearing on 9/25/06; plaintiffs' opposition to the motion for reconsideration shall be filed and served on 9/13/06; and defendants' reply in support of the motion for reconsideration shall be filed and served on 9/18/06 by Judge Ralph Zarefsky :(bp, )
September 20, 2006 64 Featured Case
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 224. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 04-8400 PA (RZx).(rn, )
March 15, 2011 660 Featured Case JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 54(b) on the First Claim of the Third Amended Complaint, and the First, Second, Third and Fourth Counterclaims of the Second Amended Counterclaims by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (see document for detailed specifics). (lc)
September 27, 2006 67 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Order[60] is denied.(ib, )
September 25, 2006 68
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Order[60] is taken under submission.Tape #: CV 06-19. (ib, )
March 12, 2013 714 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Plaintiff is therefore granted leave to file a sur-reply no longer than 5 pages in length to respond to any arguments addressed in Defendants' Reply. Should she choose to file a sur-reply, Plaintiff must do so no later than Monday, March 18, 2013., (bp)
March 20, 2013 717 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 702 AND ORDERING FURTHER BRIEFING by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The parties are therefore ORDERED to file supplemental briefs addressing how the Courts holding that the October 19 agre ement remains binding and enforceable today affects the parties respective rights to Superboy and the Superman ad works. The briefs should not exceed 15 pages in length and should devote particular attention to the relevant factual and procedural his tory with respect to these works, including the continued effect various earlier rulings by the Court have on these claims today. The briefs must also include a brief proposal for swift resolution of the Superboy and Superman ad issues should the Cou rt find that the October 19 agreement does not extend to these works. The parties shall submit all documents on which they rely as exhibits. The parties supplemental briefs are due no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, March 28, 2013. (lc). Modified on 3/20/2013. (lc).
April 18, 2013 723 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: SUPERBOY AND THE SUPERMAN ADS 702 . A judgment will issue by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 4/18/2013 (lc).
April 18, 2013 724 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT IN THE SIEGEL SUPERMAN CASE by Judge Otis D. Wright : Consistent with this Courts March 20 and April 18, 2013 Orders collectively granting DCs February 7, 2013 Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 717, 723), this Court may now enter f inal judgment. A. LARSON'S CLAIMS: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Larsons First Claim for Relief, for Declaratory Relief re: Termination, is DENIED, and judgment is hereby entered in DCs favor and against Larson on this claim. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED AND ADJUDGED that Larsons Second Claim for Relief, for Declaratory Relief re: Profits from Recaptured Copyrights, is DENIED, and judgment is hereby entered in DCs favor and against Larson on this claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Larsons Third Claim for Relief, for Declaratory Relief re: Use of the Superman Crest, is DENIED, and judgment is hereby entered in DCs favor and against Larson on this claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Larsons Fourth Claim for Relief, f or Accounting for Profits, is DENIED, and judgment is hereby entered in DCs favor and against Larson on this claim. B. DCs COUNTERCLAIMS: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that DCs Fourth Counterclaim, for Declaratory Relief Regarding the [2001 Settlement] Agreement, is GRANTED, and judgment is hereby entered in DCs favor and against Larson on this counterclaim. The Court declares that, under the parties October 19, 2001 settlement agreement, Larson and her family transferred to DC, worldwide and in pe rpetuity, any and all rights, title, and interest, including all copyright interests, that they may have in Superman, Superboy, and Spectre. IT IS ACCORDINGLY FURTHER ORDERED that DCs First, Second, Third, Fifth, and Sixth Counterclaims are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS MOOT. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
June 18, 2013 735 Featured Case AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This Court now enters an amended final judgment based on DCs Fourth Counterclaim in two of three long-running Superman cases presently before this Court: (1) the Superman case; and (2) the Superboy case. In the parties October 19, 2001 settlement agreement, Larson (and her family) transfer[red] all of [their] rights to DC, resulting in 100% ownership to D.C. Comics, effective October 19, 2001. Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli (Petrocelli Decl .) Ex. B, at 21; Larson, 2013 WL 1113259, at *1. This complete transfer on October 19, 2001, bars certain of Larsons remaining claims in this case and entitles DC to judgment on its Fourth Counterclaim, which seeks a declaration confirming the Octobe r 19, 2001 settlement agreement against Larson. The remaining claims are granted, denied, or dismissed as set forth below. Therefore: RE: Plaintiffs Claims (Superman, Case No. CV-04-8400) IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs First Claim for Rel ief in the Superman case, for Declaratory Relief re: Termination, is GRANTED, but only to the extent that it sought a declaration that on April 16, 1999, the Siegels validly terminated under the Copyright Act all prior grants, assignments, or transfe rs by Jerome Siegel to any of the Defendants, or their predecessors-in-interest, of the renewal copyrights in and to Action Comics, No. 1, as well as Action Comics, No. 4, Superman, No. 1 (pages 36), and the first two weeks of the Superman newspaper strips, and judgment is hereby entered in Plaintiffs favor on this claim as set forth herein. See Superman case, ECF Nos. 293, 560. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs Second Claim for Declaratory Relief re: Profits from Recaptured Cop yrights, Third Claim for Declaratory Relief re: Use of the Superman Crest, and Fourth Claim for Accounting for Profits in the Superman case are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS MOOT. RE:Plaintiffs Claims (Superboy Case, Case No. CV-04-8776) IT IS OR DERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs First Claim for Copyright Infringement, Second Claim for Declaratory Relief re: Termination,Third Claim for Violation of the Lanham Act § 43(a)(1)(B), Fourth Claim for Violation of California Business and Profe ssions Code, §§ 17200 et seq., and Fifth Claim for Injunctive Relief in the Superboy case are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS MOOT. RE: DCs Counterclaims (Superman and Superboy Cases) IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that DCs First Counterclaim , For Declaration That The Superman Notices And The Superboy Notice Are Ineffective,is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety in the Superman case and as to Parts(1), (2), and (5) in the Superboy case. See Superman case, ECF Nos. 293, 664(striking par ts (3) and (4) from the First Counterclaim in the Superman case).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that DCs Second Counterclaim, For Declaration That Any Claim By The Siegels For Co-Ownership Of Superman (Including Its Derivative Superboy) Is Barred By The Statute Of Limitations, is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. See Superman case, ECF No. 293.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that DCs Fourth Counterclaim, for Declaratory Relief Regarding the [2001 Settlement] Agreement, is GRANTED in part as follows. The Court declares that the parties October 19, 2001 settlement agreement (embodied in Kevin Markss letter of the same date)remains binding and enforceable solely under the terms contained in that agreement. Under that agreement, Larson and her fami ly transferred to DC, worldwide and in perpetuity, any and all rights, title, and interest, including all copyright interests, that they had in Superman and Superboy, effective October 19, 2001. Petrocelli Decl. Ex. B, at 19, 21; Larson, 2013 WL 1113259, at *12. Judgment is hereby entered in DCs favor and against Larson on this counterclaim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DCs Third, Fifth, and Sixth Counterclaims are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS MOOT. (lc) Modified on 6/18/2013 (lc).
October 16, 2006 76 Featured Case
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.2 of General Order 224 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 04-8400 SJO (RZx).(rn, )
October 18, 2006 83 Featured Case
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.2 of General Order 224 by Judge S. James Otero. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 04-8400 MMM (RZx).(rn, )
October 23, 2006 84
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with the Court's 6/29/06 Order and Motion for Sanctions [69] is submitted. Tape #: CV06-21. (ib, )
October 27, 2006 87 Featured Case
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S 6/29/06 ORDERS AND FOR SANCTIONS [69] by Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Motion to compel is granted. Plaintiffs shall serve further supplemental answers with 14 days. Motion for sanctions is denied.(ib, )
October 30, 2006 88 Featured Case
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.2 of General Order 224 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Stephen G. Larson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 04-8400 SGL (RZx).(rn, )
November 7, 2006 89 Featured Case
STANDING ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson. (See document for details.)(la, )
November 6, 2006 90
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Ralph Zarefsky re Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Reappear for Deposition [77]: Matter is taken under submission. Tape #CV06-22 and #CV06-23. (ib, )
November 8, 2006 91 Featured Case
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO REAPPEAR FOR DEPOSITION [77] by Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (ib, )
November 13, 2006 92 Featured Case
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson: Counsel and/or parties are hereby notified that a Status Conference requiring mandatory appearances is hereby set down on calendar on November 27, 2006, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom #1 of the above-referenced court. IT IS SO ORDERED. [Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/27/2006 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson. Court Reporter: none. (jh, )
November 15, 2006 94 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE by Judge Stephen G. Larson: The parties moving expert report are due on 1/12/07; The parties rebuttal expert reports are due on 2/9/07; and The expert discovery cutoff is 3/9/07 (am, )
November 16, 2006 95 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER that: Plaintiffs shall have until 11/22/06 to submit supplemental answers to defendants' interrogatories 3(c) and 3(d) pursuant to the court's 10/27/06 order; and plaintiffs shall not seek further extension of the court's October 27, 2006 order or otherwise delay their compliance therewith respectfully submitted by Judge Stephen G. Larson :(bp, )
November 28, 2006 96
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Stephen G. Larson : A status conference was held on 11/27/06. The defendants requested relief from the Courts rule regarding the filing of multiple summary judgment motions. The Court denied this request, but granted a waiver of the page limitation on such motions. The page limitation is waived as to plaintiffs as well. (See document for specifics)Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza. (mrgo, )
December 12, 2006 99
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen G. Larson: The Court's Minute Order of 11/28/06 is hereby modified as follows: The reference to the dates setting the Non-expert discovery cutoff and Expert cutoff are vacated, as the Court prevously approved and will maintain such dates as set forth in the Stipulation and Order filed 11/15/06 in both cases referenced above. All other dates referenced in the 11/28/06 order remain as stated therein. (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Joanne Siegel et al v. Warner Bros Entertainment Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Siegel
Represented By: Nicholas Calvin Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Siegel Larson
Represented By: Nicholas Calvin Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Roger L Zissu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Inc
Represented By: Roger L Zissu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Comics
Represented By: Roger L Zissu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Anjani Mandavia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DC Comics
Represented By: Roger L Zissu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Time Warner Inc
Represented By: Roger L Zissu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Warner Bros Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Roger L Zissu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Laura Siegel Larson
Represented By: Nicholas Calvin Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Joanne Siegel
Represented By: Nicholas Calvin Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bad Hat Harry Productions, Inc
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bryan Singer
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]