Perfect 10 Inc v. Google Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Perfect 10 sued defendant Google Inc. for displaying thumbnails of photographs copyrighted by the plaintiff. Consolidated with Perfect 10 Inc. v. Amazon.com Inc. et al. See also Perfect 10 v Microsoft..

Additional Resources

Defendant: Google Inc and Does
Counter Claimant: Google Inc
Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Counter Defendant: Perfect 10 Inc
Case Number: 2:2004cv09484
Filed: November 19, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Presiding Judge: A Howard Matz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2010 987 Featured Case DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT AS MOOT by Judge A. Howard Matz re Ex Parte Application to Strike Perfect 10 Inc's Notice Submitting Google's Responses and Objections to Perfect 10's Fourteenth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents 969 . (jp)
September 2, 2010 986 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz. ACCORDINGLY, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES' Stipulation 983 as follows: (1) The 10/4/2010 hearing on Google's Objections 976 is taken off the Court's calendar (vacated), and (2) Google is granted leave to re-file a motion for review of Magistrate Hillman's August 10, 2010 Order fourteen (14) days after the lifting of the current stay following the conclusion of Perfect 10's appeal, consistent with this Court's August 25, 2010 Order. (jp)
September 1, 2010 985 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 971 filed by Perfect 10 Inc, CCA # 10-56316. The appeal filed on August 24, 2010 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. Pursuant to the notice received from appellant on August 31, 2010, it appears that the parties have made the required arrangement to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than September 21, 2010; the answering brief is due October 19, 2010 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier, and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). If appellant fails to file timely the opening brief, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Order received in this district on 9/01/2010. (lr)
August 30, 2010 984 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: PLAINTIFF/APPELLANT PERFECT 10, INC.'S NOTICE THAT ALL TRANSCRIPTS OF DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS REQUIRED FOR APPEAL HAVE ALREADY BEEN PREPARED; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56316; Re: 971 (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2010 983 STIPULATION to Reschedule the October 4, 2010 hearing on Google's Objections, by removing the hearing from the calendar and allowing Google to re-file the Objections after the current stay is lifted, consistent with the Court's August 25, 2010 Order (Dkt. No. 978); filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret)
August 25, 2010 982 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Memorandum in support of Its Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Hillman's Order of August 10, 2010 on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to shantal Rands Poovala 980 . (jp)
August 25, 2010 981 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal 980 , Memorandum in suport of its Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order, Proposed Order, served on 8/25/2010. (jp)
August 25, 2010 980 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Memorandum in support of Its Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Hillman's Order of August 10, 2010 on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to shantal Rands Poovala filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
August 25, 2010 979 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Hillman's Order of August 10,2010 on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Shantal Rands Poovala. (mat)
August 25, 2010 978 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: ACCORDINGLY, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES Stipulation 970 , IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: (1) Discovery and all other proceedings in the District Court in the above-captioned action between Perfect 10 and Google, except for those matters directly related to the appeal, are stayed until the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issues a decision on Perfect 10's appeal of the Court's 7/30/2010 Order, which incorporates by reference the Court's 7/26/2010 Order, and (2) The deadline for Google to file objections to and a motion for review of Magistrate Judge Hillmans 8/10/2010 Order is extended until fourteen (14) days after the lifting of that stay following the conclusion of Perfect 10's appeal. (jp)
August 24, 2010 977 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Hillman's Order of August 10, 2010 on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Shantal Rands Poovala; Google's Application and [Proposed] Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Caruso, Margret)
August 24, 2010 976 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Magistrate Hillman's Order of August 10, 2010 On Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Shantal Rands Poovala re Order on Motion to Quash Subpoena, Telephone Conference,, 964 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Hillman's Order of August 10, 2010 on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Shantal Rands Poovala [Public Redacted], # 2 Declaration of Margret Caruso in Support of Google's Motion, # 3 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret)
August 24, 2010 975 PERFECT 10, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE PERFECT 10'S NOTICE SUBMITTING GOOGLE'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PERFECT 10'S FOURTEENTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objectio EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objectio EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objectio 969 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2010 974 Featured Case MINUTES ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: Before the Court is Perfect 10, Inc's Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hilman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and other Sanctions against defendant Google Inc. Perfect 10 contends that portions of the Order are clearly erroneous and contrary to law. Perfect 10's Memorandum of Points and Authorities p. 1:6. For the reasons set forth below, the Court DENIES Perfect 10's Motion 923 . (See attached Minute Order for further information). (jp)
August 24, 2010 973 Google's [Proposed] Order Granting re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objectio EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objectio EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objectio 969 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Caruso, Margret)
August 24, 2010 972 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56316, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 971 as to Plantiff Perfect 10 Inc. (lr)
August 24, 2010 971 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 953 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, 948 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, 937 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7419440 paid.) (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2010 970 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Ruling by Court of Appeals filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret)
August 23, 2010 969 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s purported Notice re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 966 Submitting Google's Responses and Objections to P10's Fourteenth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents, Submitted in Connection with P10's Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillmans June 16, 2010 Order filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc.(Caruso, Margret)
August 20, 2010 968 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8-9-10 3:08 p.m. (ha)
August 20, 2010 967 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8-9-10 3:08 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2010. (ha)
August 18, 2010 966 STATEMENT of NOTICE SUBMITTING TO THE COURT GOOGLE'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PERFECT 10'S FOURTEENTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SUBMITTED IN CONNECTION WITH PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF, AND OBJECTIONS TO, MAGISTRATE JUDGE HILLMAN'S JUNE 16, 2010 ORDER re: MOTION for Review of and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary And Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 923 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support of Notice Submitting to the Court Google's Responses and Objections to Perfect 10's Fourteenth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2010 965 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz. On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR and UNDER SUBMISSION Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Hillman's 6/16/10 Order 923 . The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (kbr)
August 10, 2010 964 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, For the reasons set forth in this order, defendants Motion to Quash the Subpoenas Directed to Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order (the Motion) is DENIED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) 904 Motion to Quash Subpoena; Court Recorder: CS 8-9-10. (lmh)
August 5, 2010 963 STATEMENT of Impact of Judge Matz's July 26 and 30, 2010 Orders on MOTION to Quash Subpoena served by Perfect 10, Inc. on Ms. Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order 904 Google Inc.'s Supplemental Statement Regarding the Impact of Judge Matz's July 26 and 30, 2010 Orders on Google's Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley R. Love in Support of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Statement and Exhibits thereto)(Caruso, Margret)
August 5, 2010 962 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Telephonic Hearing set for August 9, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. on the Defendants Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order. The call-in information for the telephone conference is listed below: Call-In Number: (213) 894-0800 User Access: 7002# User Password: 6051# re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings 911 (lmh)
August 2, 2010 961 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
August 2, 2010 960 SEALED DOCUMENT- Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities, in Support of Plaintiff perfect 10, Inc's Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other and Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. (mat)
August 2, 2010 959 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 957 Application to Seal the Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Review; and the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Review, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (kbr)
August 2, 2010 958 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, served on 8/2/10. (se)
August 2, 2010 957 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Review; and the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Review, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (kbr)
August 2, 2010 956 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of (1) Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion For Review Of, And Objections To, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary And Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google, Inc.; (2) Declaration Of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support Of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion For Review Of, And Objections To, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary And Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc.; (3) Application To File Under Seal; (4) [Proposed] Order To File Under Seal; And (5) Proof Of Service. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2010 955 PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. §512(b) FOR ITS CACHING FEATURE - PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION Opposition to re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2010 954 STATUS REPORT Re Google's Supplemental Production in Response to the Court's June 16, 2010 Order filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Caruso, Margret)
July 30, 2010 953 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: denying 772 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See order for further details. (kbr)
July 30, 2010 952 PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT RE: SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. §512(d) FOR WEB AND IMAGE SEARCH - PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION Opposition to re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2010 949 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Review of and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary And Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 923 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2010 948 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant Google Inc's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment as to Safe Harbor under 17 USC section 512 (document 937 ). The Court issues this order to correct the paragraph that begins at the bottom of page 27 of the Order with "As discussed above in the section of this Order...." The reference in that paragraph to Exh. 45 was incorrect. (See attached Minute Order for further details). (jp)
July 28, 2010 947 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz re: MOTION for Leave to Take Additional Depositions 471 , the Court DENIES without prejudice Googles Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions. (se)
July 28, 2010 946 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: denying 471 Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions. (kbr)
July 26, 2010 951 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum on its Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order.(mat)
July 26, 2010 950 SEALED DOCUMENT- Supplemental Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas. (mat)
July 26, 2010 945 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1, the Procedures and Schedules of the Honorable Stephen J. Hillman at paragraph 17, and the Protective Order entered by the Court in this action (Docket No. 94), Google Inc.'s application to file under seal the following documents (the "Confidential Materials") is hereby GRANTED: Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum on its Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order; Supplemental Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas. The Confidential Materials include materials that Google Inc. and/or Perfect 10, Inc. has designated "Confidential" and/or "Highly Confidential' pursuant to the Protective Order. Accordingly, the Court orders that the Confidential Materials be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. 941 Application to Seal (lmh)
July 26, 2010 944 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary Sanctions. (mat)
July 26, 2010 943 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 939 Application to Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order Denying Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and Supporting documents. (kbr)
July 26, 2010 942 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Bradley R. Love in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc's Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order Denying Perfect 10 Inc.'s Motionf or Evidentiary Sanctions. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8)(mat)
July 26, 2010 941 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google Inc's Supplemental Memorandum on its Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order, and Google's Supporting Documents filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof Of Service)(lmh)
July 26, 2010 940 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google Inc's Opposition to Perfect 10 inc.'s Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order Denying Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and supporting Documents 939 (see attached document for further information), served on 7/26/2010. (jp)
July 26, 2010 939 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google Inc's Opposition to Perfect 10 inc.'s Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order Denying Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and supporting Documents, filed by Defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
July 26, 2010 938 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS DIRECTED TO SHANTAL RANDS POOVALA AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER re: MOTION to Quash Subpoena served by Perfect 10, Inc. on Ms. Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order 904 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David N. Schultz in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas Directed to Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2010 937 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Google's motion for partial summary judgment of entitlement to safe harbor for its Web and Image Search 456 . The Court GRANTS Google's motion for partial summary judgment for its caching feature 458 . The Court GRANTS Google's motion for partial summary judgment of entitlement to safe harbor for its Blogger feature 459 . (kbr)
July 26, 2010 936 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum on its Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order; Supp. Decl. of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google's Motion and Exhibits thereto; Google's Application and [Proposed] Order to Seal; Proof of Service.. (Zeller, Michael)
July 26, 2010 935 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order Denying Perfect 10, Inc.'s; Decl. of B. Love in Support of Google's Opposition and Exhibits thereto; Google's Application and [Proposed] Order to Seal; Proof of Service.. (Zeller, Michael)
July 22, 2010 934 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Margret M Caruso counsel for Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. Adding Margret M. Caruso as attorney as counsel of record for Google Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Google Inc. (Caruso, Margret)
July 22, 2010 933 RESPONSE filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Incto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 931 Google Inc.'s Statement re Whether Perfect 10, Inc.'s Group B Notices Identified Alleged Infringing Material in Google's Cache in Response to the Court's July 21, 2010 Order (Zeller, Michael)
July 22, 2010 932 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Incto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 931 - PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S RESPONSE TO MINUTE ORDER DATED JULY 21, 2010 REGARDING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2010 931 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court ORDERS the parties by noon tomorrow, 7/22/2010, to identify where in the existing briefs on Google's motion for safe harbor under 17 USC 512(b) (458) there is any reference in any of the "Group B spreadsheet" notices sent between May 31, 2004 and April 24, 2007 (Poovala Decl. Paragraph 41, Exhibits. L1-L48) identifying any specific material on Google's cache as infringing. (jp)
July 20, 2010 930 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt (the Motion) is GRANTED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) 866 Motion for Protective Order (lmh)
July 15, 2010 929 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/28/10 (Lopez, Margarita)
July 15, 2010 928 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/28/10. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2010. (Lopez, Margarita) .
July 13, 2010 924 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, served on 7/12/10: 1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.'s Motion for Review of and Objections to JJ Hillman's 6/16/10 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendent Google, 2)Application to File Under Seal, 3) Proposed Order to File Under Seal, and 4) Proof of Service. (se)
July 12, 2010 927 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 926 Application to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc., filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (kbr)
July 12, 2010 926 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc., filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (kbr)
July 12, 2010 925 SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of, and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. (mat)
July 12, 2010 923 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of and Objections to, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary And Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 896 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. For Review of, and Objections To, Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order On Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc.)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2010 922 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Review of and Objections to Magistrate Judge Hillman's June 16, 2010 Order on Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google; Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal; and Proof of Service. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2010 921 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Googles Ex Parte Application for a Stay of the June 16, 2010 Order is Denied. However, the court recognizes that complete production cannot be accomplished for some time. Google shall continue to diligently collect and prepare the documents for production. For documents which do not need to await a format decision, they should be produced as soon as practicable, in a rolling fashion, as they become identified and available for production.Google shall file a detailed status report on July 31, 2010 as to its production of all documents ordered produced in the June 16th Order. The court agrees with Perfect 10 that there is no valid reason for Perfect 10 to be required to wait interminably for documents ordered produced, since they will not be the subject of a Rule 72 Motion for Review.: (sbu)
July 1, 2010 919 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1 ) Relief from the Ten-Day Requirement of Local Rule 7-3; And (2) a Stay of the Court's June 16, 2010 Order EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1 ) Relief from the Ten-Day Requirement of Local Rule 7-3; And (2) a Stay of the Court's June 16, 2010 Order 917 Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice Of Errata Regarding The Declaration Of Andrea Pallios Roberts In Support Of Google's Ex Parte Application (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google's Ex Parte Application)(Kassabian, Rachel)
July 1, 2010 918 PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THIS COURT'S JUNE 16, 2010 ORDER re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1 ) Relief from the Ten-Day Requirement of Local Rule 7-3; And (2) a Stay of the Court's June 16, 2010 Order EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1 ) Relief from the Ten-Day Requirement of Local Rule 7-3; And (2) a Stay of the Court's June 16, 2010 Order 917 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Opposition To Defendant Google Inc.'s Ex Parte Application To Stay This Court's June 16, 2010 Order)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2010 917 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1 ) Relief from the Ten-Day Requirement of Local Rule 7-3; And (2) a Stay of the Court's June 16, 2010 Order filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google's Ex Parte Application, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Google's Ex Parte Application)(Kassabian, Rachel)
June 29, 2010 916 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: ACCORDINGLY, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES' Stipulation 915 AS FOLLOWS: (1) Perfect 10's objections to and motion for review of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order shall be filed and served on or before 7/12/2010; (2) Google's opposition shall be filed and served on or before 7/26/201; (3) Perfect 10's reply shall be filed and served on or before 8/2/2010; (4) The hearing on Perfect 10's objections and motion for review ofMagistrate Judge Hillman's Order shall be set for 8/16/2010 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
June 28, 2010 920 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman:Telephonic Conference on Defendant Motion for Protective Order for relieffrom P10's Deposition Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. Case called. Counsel enter there appearances. Court and Counsel confer.Tape #: 6/28./2010. (sbu)
June 28, 2010 915 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Objections to and Motion for Review of Nondispositive Ruling of Magistrate Judge Hillman filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Kassabian, Rachel)
June 25, 2010 911 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER filed by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Google Incs Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order set for hearing on Monday, August 16, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. shall be reset for hearing on Monday, August 9, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. re: MOTION to Quash Subpoena served by Perfect 10, Inc. on Ms. Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order 904 (lmh)
June 24, 2010 914 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas Direct to Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
June 24, 2010 913 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
June 24, 2010 912 SEALED DOCUMENT- Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order. (mat)
June 24, 2010 910 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1, the Procedures and Schedules of the Hon. Stephen J. Hillman at paragraph 17, and the Protective Order entered by the Court in this action (Docket No. 94), Google Inc.'s application to file under seal the following documents (the "Confidential Materials") is hereby GRANTED: Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas Directed to Shatal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order. The Confidential Materials include materials that Google Inc. and/or Perfect 10, Inc. has designated "Confidential" and/or "Highly Confidential" pursuant to the Protective Order. Accordingly, the Court orders that the Confidential Materials be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. 908 Application to Seal (lmh)
June 24, 2010 909 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1, the Procedures and Schedules of the Hon. Stephen J. Hillman at paragraph 17, and the Protective Order entered by the Court in this action (Docket No. 94), Google Inc.'s application to file under seal the following documents (the "Confidential Materials") is hereby GRANTED: Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order, Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order. The Confidential Materials include materials that Google Inc. and/or Perfect 10, Inc. has designated "Confidential" and/or "Highly Confidential" pursuant to the Protective Order. Accordingly, the Court orders that the Confidential Materials be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. 907 Application to Seal (lmh)
June 24, 2010 908 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Declaration of Jeffery N. Mausner in Oppoosition to Defendant Google, Inc.s Motion to Quash Subpoenas directed to Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order filed by Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(lmh)
June 24, 2010 906 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Declaration Of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Opposition To Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion To Quash Subpoenas Directed To Shantal Rands Poovala And For A Protective Order; Application To File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order To File Under Seal; and Proof of Service. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2010 907 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Joint Stipulation on Google's Motion to Quash The Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order, and Google's Supporting Documents filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(lmh)
June 23, 2010 905 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion to Quash the Poovala Subpoenas and for a Protective Order; Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts In Support thereof and Exhibits thereto; Google's Application and [Proposed] Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Zeller, Michael)
June 23, 2010 904 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Subpoena served by Perfect 10, Inc. on Ms. Shantal Rands Poovala and for a Protective Order filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zeller, Michael)
June 22, 2010 903 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Protective Order in this matter, Docket No. 94, the following document, which has been lodged with this Court, shall be filed under seal: 1) SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S STATEMENT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DMCA-RELATED DISCOVERY ISSUES IN PERFECT 10S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS. The above document includes materials that Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc., Defendant Google Inc., and/or third parties designate as Confidential pursuant to the Protective Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. 891 Application to Seal (lmh)
June 22, 2010 902 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/27/10 3:07pm (Lopez, Margarita)
June 22, 2010 901 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/27/10 3:07pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2010. (Lopez, Margarita)
June 16, 2010 896 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER filed by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, After extensive oral argument on January 15, 2010, and supplemental briefing thereafter, Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions Against Google and/or for a Special Master is DENIED. Alternative relief is partially granted, as set forth herein. All attempts to negotiate a resolution of this Motion have failed, and the parties have requested a ruling on the Motion. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
June 15, 2010 900 SEALED DOCUMENT- PROOF OF SERVICE (mat)
June 15, 2010 899 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum on its Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. (mat)
June 15, 2010 898 SEALED DOCUMENT- Supplemental Declaration of Bradley R. Love in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. (Attachments: Part #2)(mat)
June 15, 2010 895 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE INC'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDINGS P10'S DEPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, re Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 894 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 893 (dam)
June 14, 2010 897 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal the Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt, and Google's Supporting Documents.(mat)
June 14, 2010 894 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for relief from P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt 866 - Supplemental Memorandum of Law of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Re the Deposition of Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2010 893 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum on its Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt; Supplemental Decl. of B. Love in Support of Google's Motion and Exhibits thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
June 9, 2010 892 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER filed by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Telephonic Hearing set for June 28, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. on the Defendant Motion for Protective Order for relief from P10's Deposition Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. The call-in information for the telephonic conference is listed below: Call-In Number : 213-894-0800 User access: 7002# User password: 1224#. (lmh)
June 8, 2010 891 APPLICATION to Seal the Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Statement Regarding the Status of DMCA-Related Discovery Issues in Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and other Sanctions filed by Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(lmh)
June 8, 2010 890 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Supplemental Declaration Of Dr. Norman Zada In Support Of Perfect 10's Response To Google Inc.'s Statement Regarding The Status Of DMCA-Related Discovery Issues In Perfect 10's Motion For Evidentiary & Other Sanctions; Application & [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal; Proof of Service. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2010 889 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Incto Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 885 - PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S STATEMENT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DMCA-RELATED DISCOVERY ISSUES IN PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF DAVID N. SCHULTZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S STATEMENT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DMCA-RELATED DISCOVERY ISSUES IN PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2010 887 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: This court is in receipt of plaintiffs Perfect 10 Incs Request to Strike and Brief Response to Defendant Google Incs Statement Regarding the Status of DMCA related Discovery, filed on June 2, 2010. The Request to Strike is DENIED. Plaintiff may file a Response no later than June 8, 2010. (sbu)
June 2, 2010 886 REQUEST to Strike AND BRIEF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S STATEMENT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DMCA-RELATED DISCOVERY ISSUES IN PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS; Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 885 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2010 885 STATEMENT of Status of DMCA-Related Discovery Issues in P10's MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Google Inc.'s Statement Regarding the Status of DMCA-Related Discovery Issues in P10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions in Response to the Court's Request at the May 27, 2010 Hearing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley R. Love in Support of Google Inc.'s Statement Regarding the Status of DMCA-Related Discovery Issues in P10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions)(Kassabian, Rachel)
May 27, 2010 888 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Case called. Counsel enter there appearances. Also present is Dr. Norman Zada, President ofPlaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. Court and Counsel confer.Tape #: CS05/27/2010. (sbu)
May 26, 2010 884 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey N Mausner counsel for Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Adding David N. Schultz as attorney as counsel of record for Perfect 10, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2010 883 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER filed by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Court sets a Telephonic Conference for May 27, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. (lmh)
May 14, 2010 882 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/10/10 10:00 am (Nirenberg, Cindy)
May 14, 2010 881 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10:00 am. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg, www.cindynirenberg.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2010. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
May 11, 2010 880 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits L, M and N to Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. (mat)
May 11, 2010 879 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Protective Order in this matter, Docket No. 94, the following document, which has been lodged with this Court, shall be filed under seal: Exhibits L, M, and N to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Opposition to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt, filed Under Seal pursuant to Protective Order. The document includes materials that Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc., Defendant Google Inc., and/or third parties designate as Confidential pursuant to the Protective Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. 877 Application to Seal (lmh)
May 10, 2010 878 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re APPLICATION to File documents Under Seal in support of Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice directed to Eric Schmidt 877 , Exhibits L, M and N to Declaration Jeffrey N. Mausner, Proposed Order, served on 5/10/2010. (jp)
May 10, 2010 877 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (kbr)
May 10, 2010 876 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz re: Google's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment 456 , 457 and 458 . Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (kbr)
May 9, 2010 875 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PERFECT 10'S DEPOSITION NOTICE DIRECTED TO ERIC SCHMIDT; and [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2010 874 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of EXHIBITS L, M AND N TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PERFECT 10'S DEPOSITION NOTICE DIRECTED TO DR. ERIC SCHMIDT, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2010 870 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz. The Court sets a hearing date of Monday, May 10, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. for Google's motions for partial summary judgment 456 , 457 , and 458 . (kbr)
May 5, 2010 873 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Bradley R. Love in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
May 5, 2010 872 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt.(mat)
May 5, 2010 871 SEALED DOCUMENT- Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. (mat)
May 5, 2010 869 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1, the Procedures and Schedules of the Honorable Stephen J. Hillman at paragraph 17, and the Protective Order entered by the Court in this acting (Docket No. 94), Google In's application to file under seal the following documents (the "Confidential Materials") is hereby GRANTED: Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt, Declaration of Bradley R. Love in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt and Exhibits thereto, Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt. The Confidential Materials include materials that Google Inc. and/or Perfect 10, Inc. has designated "Confidential" and/or "Highly Confidential" pursuant to the Protective Order. Accordingly, the Court orders that the Confidential Materials be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. 868 Application to Seal (lmh)
May 4, 2010 868 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt and Google's supporting documents filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(lmh)
May 4, 2010 867 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Perfect 10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt [Exhibits L, M and N Filed Separately Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order]; re MOTION for Protective Order for relief from P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt 866 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K-R)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2010 866 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for relief from P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
May 4, 2010 865 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Regarding P10's Deposition Notice Directed to Dr. Eric Schmidt; Decl. of B. Love in Support of Google's Motion and Exhibits thereto; Decl. Of K. Brewer in Support of Google's Motion; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
April 30, 2010 864 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/5/10 10:15 am (Nirenberg, Cindy)
April 30, 2010 863 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/5/10 10:15 am. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg, www.cindynirenberg.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or the Court Reporter or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/21/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2010. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
April 28, 2010 862 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Protective Order in this matter, Docket No. 94, the following document, which has been lodged with this Court, shall be filed under seal: EXHIBIT C TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S RESPONSE TO PERFECT 10S STATEMENT REGARDING THE STATUS OF ITS MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRIKE RESPONSE. The above document includes materials that Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc., Defendant Google Inc., and/or third parties designate as Confidential or Highly Confidential pursuant to the Protective Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. 861 Application to Seal (lmh)
April 27, 2010 861 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Perfect 10's Exhibit C to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Reply to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10's Statement regarding the status of its Motion for Evidentiary and other Sanctions and Request to Strike Response filed by Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(lmh)
April 27, 2010 860 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Exhibit C To The Declaration Of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support Of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Reply To Defendant Google Inc.'s Response To Perfect 10's Statement Regarding The Status Of Its Motion For Evidentiary And Other Sanctions And Request To Strike Response. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2010 859 REPLY to Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10's Statement Regarding the Status of its Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions; Request to Strike Response, re: REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Reply to Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10's Statement Regarding the Status of its Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2010 853 REPLY - PERFECT 10'S REPLY RE SECOND STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT-ORDERED MEET AND CONFER; REQUEST FOR FURTHER HEARING REGARDING DOCUMENTS THAT GOOGLE HAS NOT PRODUCED re: REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2010 852 STATEMENT of RESPONSE re: Perfect 10's REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Status Report Regarding Court-Ordered Meet and Confer filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Status Report Regarding Court-Ordered Meet and Confer and Exhibit A Thereto)(Kassabian, Rachel)
April 7, 2010 851 STATEMENT of STATUS - SECOND STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT-ORDERED MEET AND CONFER; REQUEST FOR FURTHER HEARING REGARDING DOCUMENTS THAT GOOGLE HAS NOT PRODUCED, re: REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER FOR SECOND STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT-ORDERED MEET AND CONFER AND REQUEST FOR FURTHER HEARING REGARDING DOCUMENTS THAT GOOGLE HAS NOT PRODUCED, # 2 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER, # 3 Exhibit 2 TO DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER, # 4 Exhibit 3 TO DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2010 850 MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 772 (non-evidentiary) before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court circulates its Memorandum to Parties containing questions to counsel, a copy of which is attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Court takes plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction under submission. The parties are to order a transcript of this hearing and to split the costs incurred. (See attached Minute Order for further information). Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp)
April 2, 2010 846 STATEMENT of Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Statement of Clarification re: MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Statement of Clarification of Perfect 10's Position Regarding Applicability Of Rule 56(f) to Pending Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
April 1, 2010 849 SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second MOTION for A Preliminary Injunction 772 (mg)
April 1, 2010 848 SEALED DOCUMENT-GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt Submitted in Support of Perfect 10's Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google, Inc. 772 (mg)
April 1, 2010 847 SEALED DOCUMENT-GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Reply Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google, Inc. 772 (mg)
April 1, 2010 844 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 843 Application to File Under Seal Supplemental Documents re Perfect 10's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction(G-92) 841 . (se)
March 31, 2010 845 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, served on 3/31/10. See Proof of Service for documents served. (se)
March 31, 2010 843 Google Inc.'s APPLICATION to File Under Seal Supplemental Documents re Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged proposed order. (se)
March 31, 2010 842 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 31, 2010 841 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada; Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt; Supplemental Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, and Exhibit A Thereto; Google's Application to Seal; [Proposed] Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 28, 2010 840 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 - RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2010 839 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 - RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MELANIE POBLETE RE: PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2010 838 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 - RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER RE: PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2010 837 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 - RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHEENA CHOU IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2010 836 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS REGARDING EDEN, HOFFMAN, NEWTON, SCHWARTZ CHUMURA, MCPHATTER, AND O'CONNOR, RE PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, for MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2010 835 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 - RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF SEAN CHUMURA, BENNETT MCPHATTER AND DAVID O'CONNOR RE: PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2010 834 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 - RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF MARGARET JANE EDEN, DEAN HOFFMAN, C.J. NEWTON, AND LES SCHWARTZ RE: PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2010 832 REPLY - PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2010 829 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Mark McDevitt. (mat)
March 22, 2010 828 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS S & T to the Reply Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. (mat)
March 22, 2010 827 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT R (A Disk) to the Reply Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc.(mat)
March 22, 2010 826 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc.(mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2010: Part 2, Part 3) (mat). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2010: Part 4) (mat).
March 22, 2010 825 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. (mat)
March 22, 2010 824 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING Application to File Reply documents Under Seal in support of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Preliminary Injunction against defendant Google Inc 821 . (jp)
March 22, 2010 823 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Reply Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada, Exhibit 86, Exhibit R, Exhibits S & T to the Reply Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner, Declaration of Mark McDevitt, Notice of Lodging 822 , and APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal 821 served on 3/22/2010. (jp)
March 22, 2010 822 NOTICE OF LODGING of External Hard Drive and disk in support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Google, Inc filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp)
March 22, 2010 821 APPLICATION to File Reply documents Under Seal in support of Plaintiff Perfect 10 inc's Motion for Preliminary Injunction against defendant Google Inc filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
March 22, 2010 820 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER - REPLY DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE Re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2010 819 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC., FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 2) REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 3) EXHIBIT 86 (A HARD DRIVE) TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 4) EXHIBIT R (A DISK) TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER [DISK ATTACHED]; 5) EXHIBITS S & T TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 6) DECLARATION OF MARK MCDEVITT; 7) NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXTERNAL HARD DRIVE AND DISK IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.; 8) APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.; 9) [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.; and 10) PROOF OF SERVICE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2010 833 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Perfect 10 Inc.'s Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Documents 830 . (jp)
March 16, 2010 817 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit A (A Disk) to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google's Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
March 16, 2010 816 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada In Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
March 16, 2010 815 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction.(mat)
March 16, 2010 814 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10,Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
March 16, 2010 813 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of David O'Connor in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 16, 2010 812 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Bennett McPhatter in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 16, 2010 811 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Sean Chumura in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 16, 2010 810 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Sheena Chou in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 831 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Google Inc, served on 3/15/10 on documents listed in POS document. (se)
March 15, 2010 830 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Perfect 10 inc.'s MSecond Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Documents(Motion related) 815 filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged proposed order. (se)
March 15, 2010 818 NOTICE OF LODGING of Exhibit A (A Disk) to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support of Google's Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 772 filed by defendant Google Inc. (jp)
March 15, 2010 809 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Les Schwartz in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 808 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Melanie Poblete in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 807 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of C.J. Newton in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 806 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Jeffrey Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 805 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dean Hoffman in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 804 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Margaret Jane Eden in Support of Perfect 10's Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 803 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, and Exhibits A-U Thereto [PUBLIC REDACTED], # 2 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 802 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Google Inc. Of Google's Previously Filed Motions For Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement To Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512, And Supporting Documents re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 801 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Notice of Lodging of Exhibit A (a Disk) to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google's Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Exhibit A (a Disk) to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 15, 2010 800 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Norman Zada; Google's Application to Seal; (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
March 11, 2010 799 NOTICE of Change of Counsel's Firm Name filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Zeller, Michael)
March 10, 2010 798 DENIED BY ORDER OF Judge A. Howard Matz re Ex Parte Application to Strike Perfect 10 Inc's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Sanctions 789 . (jp)
March 9, 2010 793 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Striking of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Sanctions 789 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2010 792 OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10. INC. TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Striking of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Sanctions 789 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2010 789 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Striking of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Sanctions filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian, and Exhibits A-N Thereto (Part 1), # 2 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian, and Exhibits A-N Thereto (Part 2), # 3 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
March 7, 2010 787 STATEMENT of CLARIFICATION OF PERFECT 10'S POSITION REGARDING APPLICABILITY OF RULE 56(f) TO PENDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS re: MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2010 797 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments:Part 2 of Declaration)(mat)
March 5, 2010 796 SEALED DOCUMENT- Volume II of Exhibits to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motions for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Google, Inc. [Exhibits 36-73]. (Attachments: Part 2 of Vol II, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13)(mat)
March 5, 2010 795 SEALED DOCUMENT- Volume 1 of Exhibits to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motions for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Google, Inc. [Exhibits 1-35] (Attachments: Part 2 of Vol 1, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11)(mat)
March 5, 2010 794 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits G, H, J and L to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner Submitted in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Google. (Attachments: Part 2 of Exhibits)(mat)
March 5, 2010 791 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Google Inc.(mat)
March 5, 2010 790 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 9(A Disk) to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Google. (mat)
March 5, 2010 788 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 785 Application to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. (se)
March 4, 2010 786 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, served on 3/4/10. (se)
March 4, 2010 785 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Google re: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), 783 filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged proposed order. (se)
March 4, 2010 784 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 783 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC., FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 2) DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 3) VOLUME 1 [EXHIBITS 1-35] TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 4) VOLUME 2 [EXHIBITS 36-73] TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 5) EXHIBIT 9 (A DISK) TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER [DISK ATTACHED]; 6) EXHIBITS G, H, J AND L TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 7) APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.; 8) [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.; and 9) PROOF OF SERVICE.. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 782 DECLARATION of Bennett McPhatter SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 781 DECLARATION of David O'Connor SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 780 DECLARATION of Sean Chumura SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 779 DECLARATION of Les Schwartz SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 778 DECLARATION of Margaret Jane Eden SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 777 DECLARATION of CJ Newton SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 776 DECLARATION of Dean Hoffman SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 775 DECLARATION of Melanie Poblete SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 774 DECLARATION of Sheena Chou SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 773 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST GOOGLE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. 772 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-J, # 3 Exhibit K-P)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2010 772 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Google Inc. filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2010 771 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/15/10 10:08 a.m. & 1:08 p.m. (bem)
February 23, 2010 770 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/15/10 10:08 a.m. & 1:08p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin CourtHouse Services, phone number 626- 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (bem)
February 22, 2010 769 REPLY of Google Inc. to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to Google's Joinder in the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement (Docket No. 763) filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
February 18, 2010 768 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE INC'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PERFECT 10, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S JOINDER IN THE AMAZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF THE MICROSOFT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Reply shall be filed no later than February 24, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. (pcl)
February 17, 2010 767 REQUEST for Leave to File a Reply to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to Google Inc.'s Joinder in the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Google Inc.'s Reply to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to Google's Joinder in the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
February 16, 2010 766 PERFECT 10'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S JOINDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF MICROSOFT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re: REQUEST for Order for Service of the Under Seal Version of the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement (and All Supporting Under Seal Documents) REQUEST for Order for Service of the Under Seal Version of the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement (and All Supporting Under Seal Documents) 758 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S JOINDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF MICROSOFT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2010 765 RESPONSE TO STATUS REPORT re REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 Google Inc.'s Response To Perfect 10, Inc.'s Status Report Regarding Court-Ordered Meet And Confer Regarding Documents Not Produced By Google filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
February 8, 2010 764 STATEMENT of STATUS - STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT-ORDERED MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED BY GOOGLE - re REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER FOR STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT-ORDERED MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED BY GOOGLE)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2010 763 NOTICE OF JOINDER filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Google Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Nolan in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-C Thereto)(Kassabian, Rachel)
February 4, 2010 762 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used RE: Reply in Support of Request for Telephonic Conference with Judge Hillman 756 is "Reply (Motion related)" found under the category of Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pcl)
January 28, 2010 761 Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Order re Discovery Matter, 758 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 27, 2010 759 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: A telephonic conference at this juncture would be useless. Counsel shall meet and confer regarding Perfect 10's Sanctions Motion as soon as practicable for all counsel, and then each side shall file a two page statement setting forth the status of the matter. See attached order for further details. (es)
January 27, 2010 758 REQUEST for Order for Service of the Under Seal Version of the Amazon Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of the Microsoft Settlement Agreement (and All Supporting Under Seal Documents) filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Nolan in Support Thereof, and Exhibit A Thereto, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
January 27, 2010 756 REQUEST for Hearing - PERFECT 10'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN, re REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 , filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2010 760 SEALED DOCUMENT- AMENDED Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Response to Preservation Order. (mat)
January 26, 2010 757 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Perfect 10, Inc.'s Application to file under seal 752 the following document is hereby GRANTED: AMENDED DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN RESPONSE TO PRESERVATION ORDER. (pcl)
January 26, 2010 755 OPPOSITION re: REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Request For a Telephonic Conference with Magistrate Judge Hillman filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 26, 2010 753 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re Amended Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Resonse to Preservation Order; APPLICATION to File Document Under Seal 752 ; Proposed Order, served on 1/26/2010. (jp)
January 26, 2010 752 APPLICATION to File Under Seal: Amended Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Response to Preservation Order, filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp) Modified on 1/26/2010 (jp).
January 26, 2010 750 REQUEST for Hearing - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN, re REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN 749 , filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2010 749 REQUEST for Hearing - REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HILLMAN filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2010 754 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada in Response to Preservation Order.(mat)
January 25, 2010 751 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL 746 by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: (es)
January 25, 2010 748 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of AMENDED DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN RESPONSE TO PRESERVATION ORDER; APPLICATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE THEREON.. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2010 747 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in response to preservation order, served on 1/25/2010. (jp)
January 25, 2010 746 APPLICATION to File Document Under Seal: Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Response to Preservation Order filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
January 25, 2010 745 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN RESPONSE TO PRESERVATION ORDER. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2010 744 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 .Having reviewed the partiessubmissions and considered the parties arguments thereon, and finding good cause therefor, Section IX of Googles Motion is hereby GRANTED IN PART as follows: Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. is ordered to sufficiently identify the file path and production date for any Perfect 10 non-Bates-numbereddocuments that Perfect 10 offers as evidence or as an exhibit in anycourt proceedingincluding motions, depositions, and pretrialhearingsat the time such documents are first introduced or filed. (sbu)
January 19, 2010 741 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re Exhibits for the January 15, 2010, Hearing Regarding Perfect 10's Motion for Sanctions and Perfect10's and Google's Motion s for Preservation Order, APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal 740 , Proposed Order to File Under Seal; and Proof of Service, served on 1/19/2010. (pcl)
January 19, 2010 740 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged proposed order. (pcl)
January 19, 2010 738 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Google Inc. of (Proposed) Order re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order Granting in Part Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. (1) to Produce Documents, (2) to Comply with the Protective Order, and (3) to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Production)(Kassabian, Rachel)
January 18, 2010 736 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S EXHIBITS FOR THE JANUARY 15, 2010 HEARING REGARDING PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND PERFECT 10'S AND GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR PRESERVATION ORDER; APPLICATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON; AND PROOF OF SERVICE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2010 737 MINUTES OF PERFECT 10's MOTION FOR THE IMPOSITION OF A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Perfect 10's Motion for the Imposition of A Document Preservation Order against Google is Denied, following oral argument on January 15, 2010. See attached order for further details.Court Recorder: 1/15/10. (es)
January 15, 2010 735 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT FURTHER SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10, INC. by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Having considered the parties' briefing and argument, and good cause having been shown, Google's Motion 654 is hereby GRANTED. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
January 15, 2010 730 OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 15, 2010 729 OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Sheena Chou in Support of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 14, 2010 743 SEALED DOCUMENT- GOOGLE INC.'S RESPONSE to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Kris Brewer. (mat)
January 14, 2010 742 SEALED DOCUMENT- GOOGLE INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt Submitted in Support of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions.(mat)
January 14, 2010 739 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING Application to File Under Seal 731 the following documents: Google Inc's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt submitted in support of Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions; and Google Inc's Response to Perfect 10 Inc's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Kris Brewer. (jp)
January 14, 2010 728 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-J Thereto)(Kassabian, Rachel)
January 14, 2010 727 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rachel Kassabian counsel for Defendant Google Inc. Changing address to 555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5th Floor, Redwood Shores, CA 94065. Changing e-mail to rachelkassabian@quinnemanuel.com. Filed by Defendant Google (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 13, 2010 732 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal 731 , Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt, Response to Perfect 10 Inc's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Kris Brewer, served on 1/13/2010. (jp)
January 13, 2010 731 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the following documents: Google Inc's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt submitted in support of Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions; and Google Inc's Response to Perfect 10 Inc's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Kris Brewer filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp) Modified on 1/20/2010 (jp).
January 13, 2010 726 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt Submitted in Support of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 13, 2010 724 DECLARATION of Kris Brewer in opposition to MOTION for Discovery regarding A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE 670 Supplemental Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google, and Exhibit A Thereto filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 13, 2010 723 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Mark McDevitt; Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Kris Brewer; Google Inc.'s Application to Seal; (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 12, 2010 733 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jefferey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
January 12, 2010 725 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Perfect 10, Inc.'s application to file under seal 721 the following documents is hereby GRANTED: (1) DISK Containing Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10 [Disk Attached] (2) EXHIBIT 3 to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10. (pcl)
January 12, 2010 720 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S SURREPLY re MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Defendant Google Inc.'s Surreply Regarding Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Surreply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-F Thereto [PUBLIC REDACTED])(Kassabian, Rachel)
January 11, 2010 722 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal 721 , [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal, Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections to the Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10 (see document for further details, served on January 11, 2010. (pcl)
January 11, 2010 721 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged proposed order. (pcl)
January 11, 2010 719 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian In Support of Google Inc.'s Surreply Regarding Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions and/or for The Appointment of a Special Master.(lra)
January 11, 2010 710 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2010 709 PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10, INC. re: MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2010 708 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) DISK CONTAINING EXHIBIT 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10 [DISK ATTACHED]; 2) EXHIBIT 3 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10; 3) APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 4) [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; and 5) PROOF OF SERVICE.. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2010 717 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Google Inc.'s application to file under seal 715 the following documents is hereby GRANTED: DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S SURREPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST GOOGLE AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER; and SURREPLY DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S SURREPLY REGARDING PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER. (pcl)
January 8, 2010 716 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Surreply regarding Plaintiff Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Goodle and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master; Surreply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian, APPLICATION to File Under Seal 715 , Proposed Order served on 1/8/2010. (jp)
January 8, 2010 715 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Its Surreply Regarding Perfect 10 Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Google and/or for the appointment of a Special Master, and Suppporting Documents, filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
January 8, 2010 706 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Surreply Regarding Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions; Surreply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Google's Application to Seal; (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 7, 2010 734 SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google. (mat)
January 7, 2010 718 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL 702 by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Protective Order in this matter 94 , the following documents, which have been lodged with this Court, shall be filed under seal: 1. REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for the Imposition of a Spoliation of Evidence by Google; 2. Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google; 3. EXHIBIT 8 to Reply Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for the Imposition of a Preservation Order Against Google to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google. granting 702 Application for Order (pcl)
January 7, 2010 714 SEALED DOCUMENT- Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. (mat)
January 7, 2010 713 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 8 to Reply Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for the Imposition of a Preservation Order against Google to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google. (mat)
January 7, 2010 712 SEALED DOCUMENT- Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for the Imposition of a Preservation Order Against Google to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google. (mat)
January 7, 2010 711 SEALED DOCUMENT- Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. (mat)
January 7, 2010 707 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Google Inc.s application 704 to file under seal the following documents is hereby GRANTED: GOOGLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT FURTHER SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10, INC.; REPLY DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT FURTHER SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10, INC. (pcl)
January 6, 2010 705 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc., re APPLICATION to file Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc., and Supporting Documents 704 ; Reply in Support of Its Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc.; Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Motion; (see document for further details) served on 1/6/2010. (pcl)
January 6, 2010 704 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc., and Supporting Documents filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (pcl)
January 6, 2010 703 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. re APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal 702 ; Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Perfect 10's Motion for the Imposition of a Preservation Order Against Google to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google; Evidentiary Objections to declaration of Kris Brewer in support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google (see document for further details,) served on 1/6/2010. (pcl)
January 6, 2010 702 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged proposed order. (pcl)
January 6, 2010 701 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-H Thereto [PUBLIC REDACTED])(Kassabian, Rachel)
January 6, 2010 700 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel, Daniel J. Cooper, for Perfect 10, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2010 699 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc.; Reply Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Google's Application to Seal; (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 5, 2010 696 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Discovery regarding A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE 670 - REPLY DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR THE IMPOSITION OF A PRESERVATION ORDER AGAINST GOOGLE TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE - filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2010 695 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1. REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR THE IMPOSITION OF A PRESERVATION ORDER AGAINST GOOGLE TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE, 2. PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF KRIS BREWER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE, 3. EXHIBIT 8 TO REPLY DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR THE IMPOSITION OF A PRESERVATION ORDER AGAINST GOOGLE TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE, 4. APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, 5. [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL, and 6. PROOF OF SERVICE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2010 694 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rachel M Herrick attorney for Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc, changing address to Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP, 555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5th Floor, Redwood Shores, CA 94065. Filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 31, 2009 698 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, served on 12/31/09. (se)
December 31, 2009 697 Google's APPLICATION to File Under Seal Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion for a Document Preservation Order and Supporting Documents filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged proposed order. (se)
December 31, 2009 693 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Discovery regarding A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE 670 Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for a Mutual Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-E Thereto [PUBLIC REDACTED], # 2 Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-B Thereto [PUBLIC REDACTED])(Herrick, Rachel)
December 31, 2009 692 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for a Mutual Document Preservation Order; Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Declaration of Kris Brewer in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 21, 2009 689 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: The hearing on Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence 654 670 is hereby CONTINUED from January 11, 2010, at 2:00 p.m., to January 15, 2010, at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Stephen Hillman, in Courtroom 550 of the Roybal Courthouse. Opposition due no later than December 31, 2009. Reply due no later than January 6, 2010. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google, Inc., 617 is set for January 15, 2010, at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Stephen Hillman, in Courtroom 550 of the Roybal Courthouse. The Court ORDERS Defendant Google, Inc., to file a Sur-Reply to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Reply and serve the parties by e-mail no later than January 8, 2010, by 4:00 p.m. (See document for further details.) Court Smart #: CS 12/21/09. (pcl)
December 18, 2009 691 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT A,B and D to To the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of The JOINT STIPULATION On Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10 Inc and Perfect 10's Motion for a Mutual Document Preservation Order to prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(lra)
December 18, 2009 690 SEALED DOCUMENT - JOINT STIPULATION On Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10 Inc and Perfect 10's Motion for a Mutual Document Preservation Order to prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google. (lra)
December 18, 2009 688 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Court has set a Telephonic Conference for 12/21/2009 at 1:00 PM. (pcl)
December 18, 2009 687 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Protective Order 94 the following documents, which have been lodged with this Court, shall be filed under seal: (1) JOINT STIPULATION on Google Inc's Motion for a Document Preservation Order to prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc., and Perfect 10, Inc's Motion for a Mutual Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google; and (2) EXHIBITS A, B & D to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Portion of the Joint Stipulation Regarding Google's Motion for a Document Preservation Order, and in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for a Document Preservation Order. (pcl)
December 16, 2009 684 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: denying 617 Motion for Sanctions and/or for Appointment of a Special Master. The Court removes the motion hearing from the December 21, 2009 calendar. The Court transfers the motion to Judge Hillman for his determination, report and recommendation or both (as the case may be). Judge Hillman may schedule the handling of the motion as he sees fit, consistent with his own busy calendar. (se)
December 16, 2009 679 NOTICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Google Inc.'s Notice re: Perfect 10, Inc.'s Improperly Filed Joint Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof)(Herrick, Rachel)
December 16, 2009 678 STATEMENT of Defendant Google Inc. Regarding MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Defendant Google Inc.'s Statement in Response to the Court's December 15, 2009 Order Regarding Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 16, 2009 677 STATEMENT of PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S DECEMBER 15, 2009 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING THE EFFECT THAT PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER COULD HAVE ON OTHER PENDING MOTIONS - MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2009 686 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
December 15, 2009 685 SEALD DOCUMENT- Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. (mat)
December 15, 2009 683 SEALED DOCUMENT- Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. for Evidentiary and other Sanctions against defendant Google Inc. and/or for the Appoiintment of a Special Master. (mat)
December 15, 2009 682 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Mark McDevitt. (mat)
December 15, 2009 681 SEALED DOCUMENT- Reply Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. for Evidentiary and other Sanctions agains defendant Google Inc. and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2009: Part 2, Part 3) (mat). Modified on 12/17/2009 (mat).
December 15, 2009 680 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 35 (A Disk) to the Reply Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master. (mat)
December 15, 2009 676 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 666 Application to File Under Seal Reply Documents in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. and/or For Appointment of a Special Master. (se)
December 15, 2009 675 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court ORDERS the parties to file by December 16, 2009 at 4:00 p.m. separatestatements not to exceed three pages each describing what effect, if any, Perfect 10sMotion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google, Inc. and/or forthe Appointment of a Special Master1 could have on any other pending motions beforethis Court (smo)
December 15, 2009 674 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Perfect 10's Portion of the Joint Stipulation Regarding Google's Motion For A Document Preservation Order, and in Support of Perfect 10's Motion For a Document Preservation 673 served on Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence By Perfect 10, Inc, and Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion For A Mutual Document Preservation Order to Prevent Spoliation of Evidence by Google; Exhbits A, B & D to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner; Application to File Under Seal Documents; Proposed Order to File Under Seal Documents. (es)
December 15, 2009 673 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Documents In Support of Perfect 10's Portion of the Joint Stipulation Regarding Google's Motion For A Document Preservation Order, and In Support of Perfect 10's Motion For a Document Preservation Order filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (es)
December 15, 2009 672 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Granting 664 GOOGLE INC.'s APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE JOINT STIPULATION ON GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT FURTHER SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10, INC., AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (es)
December 15, 2009 671 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) JOINT STIPULATION ON GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT FURTHER SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY PERFECT 10, INC., AND PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR A MUTUAL DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE; 2) EXHIBITS A, B & D TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10S PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING GOOGLES MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER; 3) APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10S PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING GOOGLES MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER; 4) [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10S PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING GOOGLES MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER; and 5) PROOF OF SERVICE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2009 670 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER TO PREVENT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE BY GOOGLE filed by PLAINTIFF Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Preservation)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2009 669 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER REGARDING GOOGLE, INC.'S NON-COOPERATION CONCERNING GOOGLE, INC.'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2009 668 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc; Reply Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10; Reply Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10; Exhibit 35 (a disk); Declaration of Mark McDevitt; (see document for further details); served on 12/14/09. (mg)
December 14, 2009 667 NOTICE OF LODGING of Reply Documents for Filing Under Seal, in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google, Inc. and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master; filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc (mg)
December 14, 2009 666 APPLICATION to File Reply Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google, Inc. and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master; filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged proposed order. (mg)
December 14, 2009 665 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 657 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 658 , APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion For A Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc., and Supporting Documents 664 (es)
December 14, 2009 664 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion For A Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc., and Supporting Documents filed by defendant Google Inc.(es)
December 13, 2009 663 DECLARATION of DR. NORMAN ZADA IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S PORTIONS OF THE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2009 662 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2009 661 DECLARATION of WENDY AUGUSTINE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 DECLARATION OF WENDY AUGUSTINE IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10, INC.'S PORTIONS OF THE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER, AND IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR A DOCUMENT PRESERVATION ORDER filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2009 660 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 REPLY DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2009 659 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 2) REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 3) EXHIBIT 35 (A DISK) TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER [DISK ATTACHED], FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 4) DECLARATION OF MARK MCDEVITT; 5) NOTICE OF LODGING OF REPLY DOCUMENTS FOR FILING UNDER SEAL, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER; 6) APPLICATION TO FILE REPLY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER; 7) [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE REPLY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER; AND 8) PROOF OF SERVICE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2009 658 DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support of MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian [PUBLIC REDACTED], # 2 Exhibits L-T to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian [PUBLIC REDACTED])(Herrick, Rachel)
December 11, 2009 657 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 11, 2009 656 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc.; Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 11, 2009 655 DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support of MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. 654 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian Regarding Perfect 10, Inc.'s Non-Cooperation Concerning Google Inc.'s Motion for a Document Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. (Submitted Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2.4) filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 11, 2009 654 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Document Preservation to Prevent Further Spoliation of Evidence by Perfect 10, Inc. filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
December 10, 2009 653 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google Inc.'s Corrected Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of A Special Master. (mat)
December 10, 2009 652 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Google's Corrected Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master 648 . (jp)
December 10, 2009 648 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google's Corrected Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google filed by Defendant Google Inc. (kbr)
December 9, 2009 649 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Corrected Opposition to Plaintiff Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master; APPLICATION to File Under Seal 648 , Proposed Order, served on 12/9/2009. (jp)
December 9, 2009 647 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Defendant Google Inc.'s Corrected Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 9, 2009 646 NOTICE OF ERRATA Regarding Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 9, 2009 645 DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in opposition to MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master, and Exhibits Thereto [PUBLIC REDACTED] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 9, 2009 643 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Defendant Google Inc.'s Corrected Opposition to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 8, 2009 651 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of RACHEL HERRICJ KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Goggle Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10 inc.'s Motion FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER (Attachments: # 1 PART 2, # 2 PART 3, # 3 PART 4, # 4 PART 5)(lra)
December 8, 2009 650 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC'S Opposition To Plaintiff Perfect 10. Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for The Appointment of a Special Master.(lra)
December 8, 2009 644 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 641 Application to Seal re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 636 . See document for description of documents to be filed under seal. (se)
December 7, 2009 642 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to file Under Seal Opposition to Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master 641 ; Proposed Order, Declaration of Rachel Herrick, Opposition to Plaintiff Motion for Evidentiary and Other sanctions against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master, served on 12/7/2009. (jp)
December 7, 2009 641 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master, and Supporting Documents filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
December 7, 2009 640 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/3/09 10:04a.m. (bem)
December 7, 2009 639 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/3/09 10:04a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin CourtHouse Services, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2010. (bem)
December 7, 2009 638 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court has reviewed the parties' filings re Perfect 10's settlement agreement with Microsoft and the extent (if any) to which it has a bearing on these cases. The Court need not express a view at this time. (See attached Minute Order for further information). The Court will continue to do its best to provide appropriate attention to the pending motions and other developments in these cases, but the only answer to counsel's question as to "when" is "As soon as I can." (jp)
December 7, 2009 637 DECLARATION of Jonathan Land in opposition to MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 Declaration of Jonathan Land in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 7, 2009 636 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master; Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
December 2, 2009 632 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/14/09 3:00pm (Lopez, Margarita)
December 2, 2009 631 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/14/09 3:00pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2010. (Lopez, Margarita)
December 1, 2009 635 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google, and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7)(mat)
December 1, 2009 634 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 9 (A Disk) to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Google, and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master [Disk Attached]. (mat)
December 1, 2009 633 SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Google Inc. and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master. (mat)
December 1, 2009 630 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Documents Under Seal in support of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Defendant Google Inc., and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master 627 . (jp)
November 30, 2009 628 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re APPLICATION to File Document Under Seal 627 , Notice of Lodging 626 , (see attached document for further information), served on 11/30/2009. (jp)
November 30, 2009 627 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal in support of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Evidentiary and Other Sanctions against Defendant Google Inc., and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Propsoed Order. (jp)
November 30, 2009 626 NOTICE OF LODGING of Documents for Filing Under Seal, in support of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion for Evidentiary and Other sanctions against Defendant Google Inc., and/or for the Appointment of a Special Master filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp)
November 29, 2009 621 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Proof of Service. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2009 620 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 2) DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST GOOGLE, AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 3) EXHIBIT 9 (A DISK) TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST GOOGLE, AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER [DISK ATTACHED], FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER; 4) NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS FOR FILING UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER; 5) APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER; and 6) [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2009 619 DECLARATION of SHEENA CHOU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2009 618 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER 617 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2009 617 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. FOR EVIDENTIARY AND OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. AND/OR FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 25, 2009 629 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Google's Response and Objections to Perfect 10, Inc's Response and Objections to Google's Evidence in suppor tof its Motions for Summary Judgment re: Safe harbors Under 17 USC section 512 615 . (jp)
November 25, 2009 625 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration and Rebuttal Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala. (mat)
November 25, 2009 624 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Paul Haahr. (mat)
November 25, 2009 623 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Rebuttal Declaration of Bill Brougher. (mat)
November 25, 2009 622 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada Filed in Further Opposition to Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding Entitlement to DMCA Safe Harbor. (mat)
November 24, 2009 616 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to file Under Seal 615 , Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada, Resonse to Evidentiary Objections, Response to Evidentiary Objections to the declaration and Rebuttal Declaration of Bill Brougher, Resonse to Evidentiary Objectiosn to the Declaration of Paul Haahr, Proposed Order served on 11/24/2009. (jp)
November 24, 2009 615 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google's Response and Objections to Perfect 10, Inc's Response and Objections to Google's Evidence in suppor tof its Motions for Summary Judgment re: Safe harbors Under 17 USC section 512 filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
November 23, 2009 614 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Responses to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations and/or Rebuttal Declarations of Shantal Rands Poovala, Bill Brougher, and Paul Haahr in Support of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 U.S.C. § 512; Google's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Norman Zada; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 23, 2009 613 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner Filed in Further Opposition to Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding Google's Entitlement to DMCA Safe Harbor filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 23, 2009 612 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Reply to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google's Evidentiary Objections in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 U.S.C. § 512 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 23, 2009 611 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration and Rebuttal Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 17, 2009 607 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 , MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 Google Inc.'s Reply to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Response Regarding Diane Price filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 16, 2009 606 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 - PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE REGARDING DIANE PRICE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER FOR PERFECT 10S RESPONSE REGARDING DIANE PRICE)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2009 605 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Order re: Perfect 10's Production of Documents Ordered Produced on October 6, 2009 560 : No later than November 30, 2009, Perfect 10 shall identify the location of documents in its October 22, 2009 production that are "responsive" to each of the 27 Compelled Requests. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
November 11, 2009 604 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 Google Inc.'s Second Supplemental Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion To Compel Perfect 10, Inc. To Affix Control Numbers To Its Document Productions filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 9, 2009 603 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10's Memorandum in Support of its Proposed Order Regarding the Identification of Certain Documents and Reply to Google's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
November 9, 2009 602 REPLY Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 - PERFECT 10'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING THE IDENTIFICATION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS AND REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS JOINDER IN AMAZON AND ALEXA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2009 601 NOTICE OF LODGING filed - PERFECT 10'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF ITS PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING THE IDENTIFICATION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENT re Notice of Lodging,, 599 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PERFECT 10'S PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING THE IDENTIFICATION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2009 600 SUPPLEMENT to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application and Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition Thereto filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Thomas Nolan in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto)(Herrick, Rachel)
November 6, 2009 599 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Google Inc. of (Proposed) Order Granting in Part Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Production and to Reimburse Defendants for Costs and Request for a Telephonic Conference, and Google Inc.'s Joinder Therein re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
November 3, 2009 608 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Case called. Counsel enter their appearances. Telephonic Conference held. Tape #: CS 11/3/2009. (pcl)
November 3, 2009 598 PERFECT 10'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S IMPROPER EX PARTE APPLICATION in Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Product 596 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2009 609 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Court set a Telephonic Conference for November 3, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (pcl)
November 2, 2009 597 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Google's Request for Clarification Re October 6, 2009 Order 590 : At the present time, the court will confirm the language and intent of the Order quoted above. Actual settlement agreements between Perfect 10 and third parties need not be produced. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
November 2, 2009 596 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel re: Perfect 10, Inc.: Defendant Google Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Alexa Internet's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Production Numbers to its Production and to Reimburse Defendants for Costs and Request for a Telephonic Conference, and Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition Thereto filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Nolan in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 23, 2009 593 Featured Case ORDER to File Under Seal Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc's Under Seal Exhibits From the September 22, 2099 Hearing Regarding Discovery Issues Before Judge Hillman by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (es)
October 23, 2009 592 SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc's Under Seal Exhibits from the September 22, 2009 Hearing Regarding Discovery Issues before Judge Hillman. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2009: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4) (mat).
October 23, 2009 591 REPLY REQUEST to Clarify re: the Court's October 6, 2009 Order Granting in Part Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Complete and Unredacted Financial Documents and Other Damages-Related Documents, and Amazon.com and Alexa Internet 590 , PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE INC.'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION RE: THE ORDER COMPELLING PERFECT 10 TO PRODUCE COMPLETE AND UNREDACTED FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS AND OTHER DAMAGES-RELATED DOCUMENTS, AND AMAZON.COM AND ALEXA INTERNETS JOINDER THEREIN, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUNSER IN RESPONSE TO GOOGLE INC.'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION RE: THE ORDER COMPELLING PERFECT 10 TO PRODUCE COMPLETE AND UNREDACTED FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS AND OTHER DAMAGES-RELATED DOCUMENTS)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2009 595 NOTICE OF LODGING Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc's Under Seal Exhibits From The September 22, 2009 Hearing Regarding Discovery Issues Before Judge Hillman; and Proposed Order to File Under Seal filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc 594 , 593 (es)
October 22, 2009 594 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc., Under Seal Exhibits From the September 22, 2009 Hearing Regarding Discovery Issues Before Judge Hillman filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (es)
October 21, 2009 590 REQUEST to Clarify re: the Court's October 6, 2009 Order Granting in Part Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Complete and Unredacted Financial Documents and Other Damages-Related Documents, and Amazon.com and Alexa Internet's Joinder Therein filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Nolan in Support Thereof, and Exhibit A Thereto)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 21, 2009 589 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC'S UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS FROM THE SEPTEMBER 22, 2009 HEARING REGARDING DISCOVERY ISSUES BEFORE JUDGE HILLMAN; Application & Proposed Order to file the same; NOTICE OF LODGING. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2009 588 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of PERFECT 10'S Evidentiary Objections and Response to Google's Evidentiary Objections Re: Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgement. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
October 13, 2009 587 SEALED DOCUMENT- PERFECT 10's Evidentiary Objections to: Declaration and Rebuttal Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor, Docket Nos. 467-469, 534 (Under Seal). (mat)
October 13, 2009 586 SEALED DOCUMENT- PERFECT 10'S Evidentiary Objections to: Declaration of and Rebuttal Declaration of Bill Brougher in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512.(mat)
October 13, 2009 585 SEALED DOCUMENT- PERFECT 10's Reply to Google, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Delcaration of Dr. Norman Zada. (mat)
October 13, 2009 584 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections and Response to Google's Evidentiary Objections. (mat)
October 13, 2009 583 SEALED DOCUMENT- PERFECT 10'S Evidentiary Objections: Declaration of Paul Haahr in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. (mat)
October 13, 2009 582 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLEADINGS RE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE GOOGLE'S THREE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge A. Howard Matz, granting 579 Application to Seal Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 572 . (se)
October 13, 2009 581 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re Evidentiary Objections to Declaration and Rebuttal Declaration of Bill Brougher, Evidentiary Objections to Declaration and Rebuttal Declaration fo Shantal Rands Poovala, Evidentiary Objection Declaration of Paul Haahr, Reply to Evidentiary Objections, Exhibits AA & BB tot he Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner, Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada, Notice of Lodging, Application to File Under Seal Pleadings, Proposed order, served on 10/13/2009. (jp)
October 13, 2009 580 NOTICE OF LODGING of Pleadings re Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections and Responses to Google's Evidentiary Objections re Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff. (jp)
October 13, 2009 579 APPLICATION to File Udner Seal Pleadings re Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections and Responses to google's Evidentiary Objections re Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
October 13, 2009 574 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Application To File Under Seal Pleadings Re Perfect 10's Evidentiary Objections And Responses To Google's Evidentiary Objections Re Google's Three Motions For Summary Judgment; and [Proposed] Order Thereon. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 573 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC'S EXHIBITS FROM THE SEPTEMBER 22, 2009 HEARING REGARDING DISCOVERY ISSUES BEFORE JUDGE HILLMAN as to Miscellaneous Document,, 409 , Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,,,,,, 408 . (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 572 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO: DECLARATION AND REBUTTAL DECLARATION OF BILL BROUGHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: GOOGLE'S ENTITLEMENT TO SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. §512; 2) PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO: DECLARATION AND REBUTTAL DECLARATION OF SHANTAL RANDS POOVALA IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE GOOGLE'S ENTITLEMENT TO SAFE HARBOR, DOCKET NOS. 467-469, 534 (UNDER SEAL); 3) PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS: DECLARATION OF PAUL HAAHR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: GOOGLE'S ENTITLEMENT TO SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. §512; 4) PERFECT 10'S REPLY TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA. 5) EXHIBITS AA & BB TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE GOOGLE'S THREE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; 6) DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS; 7) NOTICE OF LODGING OF PLEADINGS RE PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE GOOGLE'S THREE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; and 8) PROOF OF SERVICE.. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 571 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE GOOGLE'S THREE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 570 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S REDACTED REPLY TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA RE: GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 569 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MELANIE POBLETE RE GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 568 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY MAUSNER RE GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 567 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHEENA CHOU RE GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 566 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF MARGARET JANE EDEN, DEAN HOFFMAN, C.J. NEWTON, AND LES SCHWARTZ RE: GOOGLES MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 565 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF SEAN CHUMURA, BENNETT MCPHATTER AND DAVID OCONNOR RE: GOOGLES MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2009 564 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in Opposition to re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 PERFECT 10'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO: DECLARATION AND REBUTTAL DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: GOOGLE'S ENTITLEMENT TO SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. §512 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2009 610 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference regarding Bate Stamp Issue held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Case called. Counsel enter their apearances. Due to technical difficulties the hearing was not recorded. (pcl)
October 8, 2009 563 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Court set a Telephonic Conference for October 9, 2009 at 2: 30 p.m. (pcl)
October 7, 2009 578 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Google Inc.'s Application To File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits From The September 22, 2009 Hearing On Google's Pending Discovery Motions by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: That application 575 is hereby GRANTED. The Confidential Exhibits include materials that Perfect 10 has designated "Confidential" and/or "Highly Confidential" pursuant to the Protective Order. Accordingly, the Court hereby orders that the Confidential Exhibits be filed under seal. (pcl)
October 7, 2009 577 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits From The September 22, 2009 Hearing On Google's Pending Discovery Motions 575 , Notice of Lodging of Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits 576 , [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits (see document for further details), served on October 7, 2009. (pcl)
October 7, 2009 576 NOTICE OF LODGING Of Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits From The September 22, 2009 Hearing On Google's Pending Discovery Motions filed by defendant Google Inc. (pcl)
October 7, 2009 575 APPLICATION To File Under Seal Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits From The September 22, 2009 Hearing On Google's Pending Discovery Motions filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order and 2 Under Seal Documents. (pcl)
October 7, 2009 562 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Google Inc. of Non-Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits from the September 22, 2009 Hearing on Google's Pending Discovery Motions re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 64 to the deposition of Google Inc. pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 30(b)(6), dated November 19, 2008, # 2 Exhibit 66 to the deposition of Google Inc. pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 30(b)(6), dated November 19, 2008)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 7, 2009 559 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Notice of Lodging of Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits from the September 22, 2009 Hearing on Google's Pending Discovery Motions; Confidential Demonstrative Exhibits from the September 22, 2009 Hearing on Google's Pending Discovery Motions; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
October 6, 2009 561 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10, INC. TO COMPLY WITH THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that Google's Motion and Amazon.com and Alexa.com's Joinder Application is GRANTED IN PART, as follows: (See document for further details.) (pcl)
October 6, 2009 560 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10 TO PRODUCE COMPLETE AND UNREDACTED FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS AND OTHER DAMAGES-RELATED DOCUMENTS, AND AMAZON.COM AND ALEXA INTERNET'S JOINDER THEREIN by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that Google's Motion and the Amazon Defendants' joinder therein is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as follows: (See document for further details.) (pcl)
October 6, 2009 558 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/04/09 3:15pm and 9/22/09 10:02am,11:21am,1:35pm,2:52pm (Lopez, Margarita)
October 6, 2009 557 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/22/09 10:02am, 11:21am, 1:35pm, and 2:52pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Lopez, Margarita)
October 6, 2009 556 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/04/09 3:15pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Lopez, Margarita)
October 5, 2009 555 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 of [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION RE CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS AND BATE STAMPING DOCUMENTS, re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION RE CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS AND BATE STAMPING DOCUMENTS)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2009 554 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Google Inc. of [Proposed] Order Granting In Part Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel Perfect 10, Inc. To Comply With The Protective Order re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 , Motion Hearing, 541 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting In Part Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel Perfect 10, Inc. To Comply With The Protective Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 5, 2009 553 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 Google Inc.'s Response to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Objections to Evidence re: Second Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Production filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
October 1, 2009 552 DECLARATION of MELANIE POBLETE (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION) IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10 TO AFFIX DOCUMENT CONTROL NUMBERS TO ITS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (DOCKET NO. 543); re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 This document is to be linked to Docket Number 543; filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2009 550 DECLARATION of MELANIE POBLETE IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10 TO AFFIX DOCUMENT CONTROL NUMBERS TO ITS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (DOCKET NO. 543); re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 This document is to be linked to Docket Number 543; filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2009 549 DECLARATION of DR. NORMAN ZADA IN REPLY TO GOOGLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10, INC. TO AFFIX CONTROL NUMBERS TO ITS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION; re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 This document is to be linked to Docket Number 543; filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2009 548 REPLY TO GOOGLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10, INC. TO AFFIX CONTROL NUMBERS TO ITS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 This document is to be linked to Docket Number 543 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2009 547 PERFECT 10'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE: SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RACHEL HERRICK KASSABIAN IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10 TO AFFIX DOCUMENT CONTROL NUMBERS TO ITS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION ("SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL KASSABIAN DECL.") (DOCKET NO. 543-2) re: MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 This document is to be linked to Docket Number 543-2 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2009 546 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. of [Proposed] Order Granting In Part Google Inc.s Motion To Compel Perfect 10 To Produce Complete And Unredacted Financial Documents And Other Damages-Related Documents, And Amazon.Com and Alexa Internets Joinder Therein re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 , Motion Hearing, 541 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting In Part Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel Perfect 10 To Produce Complete And Unredacted Financial Documents And Other Damages-Related Documents, And Amazon.Com and Alexa Internet's Joinder Therein)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2009 551 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Exhibit 1 to the Second Supplemental Declaration of Rachel herrick Kassabia, Notice of Lodging, served on 9/30/2009. (jp)
September 30, 2009 545 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Google Inc. of [Proposed] Order Granting in Part Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Complete and Unredacted Financial Documents and Other Damages-Related Documents, and Amazon.com and Alexa Internet's Joinder Therein re MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 , Motion Hearing, 541 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting in Part Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Complete and Unredacted Financial Documents and Other Damages-Related Documents, and Amazon.com and Alexa Internet's Joinder Therein)(Herrick, Rachel)
September 29, 2009 544 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Exhibit 1 to the Second Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Production; Notice of Lodging of Non-documentary Exhibit 1 to the Second Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Production; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 29, 2009 543 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Production filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Herrick, Rachel)
September 25, 2009 542 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: granting in part and denying in part 371 Motion for Admissions. Perfect 10 is ordered to respond as specified above by December 31, 2009. (sbu)
September 22, 2009 541 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman:Case called. Counsel enter there appearances. Court and Counsel confer. Parties shall submitproposed order as to the ruling stated in open court.Court Reporter: CS9/22/09. (sbu)
September 21, 2009 540 DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support of MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 , MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of (1) Google's Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Documents, to Comply with the Protective Order and to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Production, and (2) Google's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google's Requests for Admission filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Herrick, Rachel)
September 18, 2009 539 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Telephonic Hearing is hereby cancelled. Parties shall appear in Courtroom 550 on the 5th floor on September 22, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. for the Discovery Hearing. (pcl)
September 14, 2009 538 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Court and Counsel confer. Discovery hearing set for September 22, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. will be Telephonic. Tape #: 09/14/09. (pcl)
September 11, 2009 537 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Corrected Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512(c) for its Blogger Service 535 . (jp)
September 10, 2009 536 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of Corrected Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law 535 , Proposed Order, Corrected Consolidated Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, served on 9/10/2009. (jp)
September 10, 2009 535 GOOGLE INC.'S APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Corrected Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512(c) for its Blogger Service filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
September 10, 2009 523 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 Google's Corrected Consolidated Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) for its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 10, 2009 522 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Corrected Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) for its Blogger Service; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 9, 2009 534 SEALED DOCUMENT - REBUTTAL DECLARATION of SHANTAL RANDS POOVALA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512 (lra)
September 9, 2009 533 SEALED DOCUMENT - REBUTTAL DECLARATION of BILL BROUGHER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(lra)
September 9, 2009 532 SEALED DOCUMENT - Google Inc's Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Dr. Norman Zada in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re DMCA Safe Harbor for Its eb and Image Search Blogger Service and Caching Feature.(lra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2009: # 1 part 2) (lra).
September 9, 2009 531 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S REPLY In Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RE: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. section 512(d) for its Caching Feature.(lra)
September 9, 2009 530 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.c.Section 512 for it Blogger Service. (lra)
September 9, 2009 529 SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S REPLY In Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. section 512(d) for Web and Image Search. (lra)
September 9, 2009 525 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 524 Application to Seal Portions of Google's Replies in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment. (kbr)
September 9, 2009 521 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google's Consolidated Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) for Web and Image Search (PART 1) [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Google's Consolidated Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) for Web and Image Search (PART 2) [Public Redacted])(Herrick, Rachel)
September 9, 2009 520 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 Google's Consolidated Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) for its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 9, 2009 519 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 9, 2009 518 DECLARATION of Shantal Rands Poovala in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Rebuttal Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512 [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Herrick, Rachel)
September 9, 2009 517 DECLARATION of Bill Brougher in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Rebuttal Declaration of Bill Brougher in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512 [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Inc. Documents related to Motion for Summary Judgment served on 9/8/09. (kbr)
September 8, 2009 524 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Replies in Support of Its Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Google Inc. (kbr)
September 8, 2009 516 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Melanie Poblete in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 515 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Les Schwartz in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 514 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of David O'Connor in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 513 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of C.J. Newton in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 512 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Bennett McPhatter in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 511 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Jeffrey Mausner in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 510 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dean Hoffman in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 509 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Margaret Jane Eden in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 508 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Sean Chumura in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 507 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Google Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Sheena Chou in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 506 DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Rebuttal Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 505 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 Public Redacted filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 504 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 Public Redacted filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 503 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 Public Redacted filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 8, 2009 502 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Defendant Google Inc.'s Replies in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 U.S.C. § 512; Consolidated Separate Statements in Support Thereof; Rebuttal Declarations of Shantal Rands Poovala and Bill Brougher in Support Thereof, and Exhibits Thereto; Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 4, 2009 528 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Case called. Counsel enter there appearances. Court and Counsel confer. Court sets a further Telephonic Conference for September 14, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. Court Recorder: CS 9/8/09. (pcl)
September 3, 2009 527 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Court sets a Telephonic Conference for September 4, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. (pcl)
August 26, 2009 501 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Defendant Google's (1) Motion to Compel Answer to Interrogatories, filed August 15, 2008 (docket number #336); (2) Motion Request for Admission, filed October 27, 2008 (docket number # 371); and (3) Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to produce documents to comply with Protective Order and to affix documents control numbers, filed on May 7, 2009 (docket number #409) are all rescheduled to be heard on September 22, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Hillman. (es)
August 13, 2009 500 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR and UNDER SUBMISSION (1) Defendant's Google's Motion for Summary Judgment 456 ; and (2) Defendant Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Blogger Service 457 ; (3) Defendant Googles Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Entitlement to Safe Harbor 458 ; and and Defendant Google's Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions 471 . The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (jp)
August 11, 2009 499 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: granting 487 Application to Seal Documents Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment. (kbr)
August 11, 2009 498 SEALED DOCUMENT - Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Opposition to Google's MOTION for Summary Judgment RE: Safe Harbor under 17 U.S.C. section512(d) for Web and Image Search filed (lra)
August 11, 2009 497 SEALED DOCUMENT - Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgmentre: Safe Harbor under 17 U.S.C. section 512(b) for Its Caching Feature filed (lra)
August 11, 2009 496 SEALED DOCUMENT - Perfect 10's STATEMENT of genuine issues in Opposition to Google's MOTION for Summary Judgment RE: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. section 512(b) For Its Caching Feature filed (lra)
August 11, 2009 495 SEALED DOCUMENT - pLAINTIFF pERFECT 10'S OppositionTo Google's MOTION for Summary Judgmentre: Safe Harbor under 17 U.S.C section 512(c) for Its Blogger Service filed (lra)
August 11, 2009 494 SEALED DOCUMENT - Perfect 10's STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Google Inc's MOTION for Summary Judgmentre: Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. section 512(c) for its Blogger Service, filed(lra)
August 11, 2009 493 SEALED DOCUMENT - Perfect 10's Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. section 512(d) for Web and Image Search. filed (Attachments: # 1 PART 2)(lra)
August 11, 2009 492 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT G,H,K,N, AND P to The Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment[ filed (lra) Modified on 8/12/2009 (lra).
August 11, 2009 491 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada Submitted In Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment filed (lra) Modified on 8/12/2009 (lra).
August 11, 2009 490 SEALED DOCUMENT - DISK CONTAINED EXHIBIT 9 to Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment 457 , 458 , 456 filed (lra)
August 11, 2009 489 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits 27-57 of the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Searhc, Blooger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426). Vol. 2 of 2 (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8)(mat)
August 11, 2009 488 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits 1-26 of the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re: DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Searhc, Blooger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426). Vol. 1 of 2 (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
August 10, 2009 487 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Documents Submtited in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Habor for Its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426) filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
August 10, 2009 486 NOTICE OF LODGING of Documents submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Habor for Its Web and Image Serach, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426) filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp)
August 10, 2009 485 REPLY in support of MOTION for Leave to Take Additional Depositions 471 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Zeller, Michael)
August 9, 2009 484 DECLARATION of Melanie Poblete in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 483 DECLARATION of Sheena Chou in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 482 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 481 DECLARATION of Bennett McPhatter in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 480 DECLARATION of David O'Connor in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 479 DECLARATION of Sean Chumura in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 478 DECLARATION of Les Schwartz in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 477 DECLARATION of CJ Newton in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 476 DECLARATION of Dean Hoffman in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 475 DECLARATION of Margaret Jane Eden in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 457 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 458 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 456 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 474 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of (1) Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. §512(c) For Its Blogger Service; (2) Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to Google's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. §512(d) For Web And Image Search; (3) Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Opposition to Google's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. §512(b) For Its Caching Feature; (4) Perfect 10's Statement of Genuine Issues In Opposition to Google's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service; (5) Perfect 10's Statement of Genuine Issues In Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search; (6) Perfect 10's Statement of Genuine Issues In Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature; (7) Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web And Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, And 426) (Including Exhs 1-26 And 27-53); (8) Exhibit 9, A Disk, to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426); and (9) Exhibits G, H, K, N, and P to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426). (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2009 473 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of (1) Application to File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426); (2) [Proposed] Order Granting Perfect 10's Application to File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426); (3) Notice of Lodging of Documents Submitted in Opposition to Google's Three Motions for Summary Judgment Re DMCA Safe Harbor for its Web and Image Search, Blogger Service, and Caching Feature (Docket Nos. 428, 427, and 426); and Proof of Service. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2009 472 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to Take Additional Depositions 471 PERFECT 10'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2009 471 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Take Additional Depositions filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian, and Exhibits A-E Thereto, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zeller, Michael)
July 10, 2009 470 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Pursuant to Stipulation 465 , it is ordered as follows: (1) Perfect 10 Opposition to Google Motions for Summary Judgment re Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC section 512(b), (c) and (d) shall be due on 8/10/2009; Google Reply papers in support of DMCA Motions shall bedue on 9/8/2009; The Hearing on Google DMCA MOTIONS 426 , 427 , 428 , 456 , 457 , and 458 shall be set for on 10/5/2009, or such other hearing date as is convenient for the Court. (jp)
July 9, 2009 465 STIPULATION for Order BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON GOOGLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: ENTITLEMENT TO SAFE HARBOR UNDER 17 U.S.C. 512(B), (C) & (D) filed by Defendant Google Inc.(Herrick, Rachel)
July 8, 2009 454 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz DENIED Ex Parte Application Re Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication Re Copyright Infringement against Defendant Google Inc 452 . (jp)
July 8, 2009 453 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court GRANTS, nunc pro tunc, Googles Motion for Order for Schedule forFiling Dispositive Motions for the reasons stated in Googles briefs.1 In addition, theCourt STAYS further briefing on Perfect 10's just-filed motion for summary judgment(Docket No. 436) until further order of the Court. The August 17, 2009 hearing forPerfect 10's motion is vacated.The Court is aware that Google decided to file its three DMCA motions, noticedfor August 17, 2009, without awaiting the Courts order on its motion. AlthoughGoogles filing of the DMCA motions before the Courts order exhibited gamesmanship -- i.e., it gives the appearance of Google racing to the courthouse at the same time it waspurporting to seek the Courts guidance on an orderly sequence of the filing of motions --Google did not violate any Court order.The Court also notes that the parties have not proposed deadlines for oppositionand reply briefs. The Court requires the oppositions to Googles DMCA motions to befiled by July 27, 2009 and the replies to be filed by August 3, 2009. (smo)
July 7, 2009 469 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. Vol 3 of 3 (mat)
July 7, 2009 468 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. Vol 2-3 (mat)
July 7, 2009 467 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. Vol 1-3 (mat)
July 7, 2009 466 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
July 7, 2009 464 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Documents in support of Perfect 10's Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication against Google 448 . (jp)
July 7, 2009 463 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Application to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 USC section 512, and supporting Documents 450 . (jp)
July 7, 2009 462 SEALED DOCUMENT- Disk Containing Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Summary Adudication against Google [Disk Attached]. (mat)
July 7, 2009 461 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit G to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication against Google. (mat)
July 7, 2009 460 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Paul Haahr in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. (mat)
July 7, 2009 459 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Bill Brougher in Support of Defendant Google's Motions for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitilement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512. (mat)
July 7, 2009 458 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512(b) for its Caching Feature. (mat)
July 7, 2009 457 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512(c) for its Blogger Service. (mat)
July 7, 2009 456 SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC 512(d) for Web and Image Search. (mat)
July 7, 2009 455 NOTICE OF LODGING of Non-Documentary Exhibit II to the Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala filed by defendant Google Inc. (jp)
July 7, 2009 452 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Schedule for Dispositive Motions Defendant Google Inc.'s Ex Parte Application re: Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication re: Copyright Infringement Against Defendant Google Inc. filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 6, 2009 449 NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GOOGLE. Plaintiff hereby lodges the following documents: Disk containing Exhibit 9 to the Declararion of Norman Zada; Exhibit G to the Declaration of Jeffrey N. Mausner. (kbr)
July 6, 2009 448 APPLICATION to FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GOOGLE filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (kbr)
July 6, 2009 447 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of DISK CONTAINING EXHIBIT 9 TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GOOGLE [DISK ATTACHED]; AND EXHIBIT G TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GOOGLE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 446 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of 1) APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GOOGLE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; AND 2) NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GOOGLE. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 445 DECLARATION of C.J. Newton In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 444 DECLARATION of Dean Hoffman In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 443 DECLARATION of David O'Connor In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 442 DECLARATION of Sean Chumura In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 441 DECLARATION of Melanie Poblete In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 440 DECLARATION of Sheena Chou In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2009 439 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2009 438 DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8-13, # 3 Exhibit 14-18, # 4 Exhibit 19-23, # 5 Exhibit 24-27, # 6 Exhibit 28-39, # 7 Exhibit 40-47, # 8 Exhibit 48-53)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2009 437 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, for Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication Against Google, Inc. MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement 436 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2009 436 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING PERFECT 10, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2009 451 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 USC section 512, and Supporting Documents 450 , Proposed Order, Notice of Motiona nd Motion for Summary Judgment, Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment re Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 USC section 512(b) for its Caching Feature, Declarations of Paul Haahr, Rachel Herrick Kassabian, Shantal Rands Poovala, Bill Brougher, Notice of Loding of Non-Documentary Exhibits to the Declarations of Shantal Rands Poovala, Statements of Uncontrverted Facts and Conclusions of Law served on 7/2/2009. (jp)
July 2, 2009 450 GOOGLE INC APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 USC section 512, and Supporting Documents filed by defendant Google Inc. (jp)
July 2, 2009 435 DECLARATION of Shantal Rands Poovala in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 VOLUME 3 (INCLUDING EXHIBITS N18 - PP) filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N18 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit N18 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit N18 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit N18 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit N18 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit N18 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit N18 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit N18 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit N18 Part 9, # 10 Exhibit N18 Part 10, # 11 Exhibit O, # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit R Part 1, # 15 Exhibit R Part 2, # 16 Exhibit R Part 3, # 17 Exhibit S, # 18 Exhibit T, # 19 Exhibit U, # 20 Exhibit V, # 21 Exhibit W, # 22 Exhibit X, # 23 Exhibit Y, # 24 Exhibit Z, # 25 Exhibit AA, # 26 Exhibit BB, # 27 Exhibit CC, # 28 Exhibit DD, # 29 Exhibit EE, # 30 Exhibit FF, # 31 Exhibit GG, # 32 Exhibit HH, # 33 Exhibit II, # 34 Exhibit JJ, # 35 Exhibit KK, # 36 Exhibit LL, # 37 Exhibit MM, # 38 Exhibit NN, # 39 Exhibit OO, # 40 Exhibit PP)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 434 DECLARATION of Shantal Rands Poovala in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 VOLUME 2 (INCLUDING EXHIBITS L40 - N17) filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L40, # 2 Exhibit L41, # 3 Exhibit L42, # 4 Exhibit L43, # 5 Exhibit L44, # 6 Exhibit L45, # 7 Exhibit L46, # 8 Exhibit L47, # 9 Exhibit L48, # 10 Exhibit M, # 11 Exhibit N1, # 12 Exhibit N2, # 13 Exhibit N3, # 14 Exhibit N4, # 15 Exhibit N5, # 16 Exhibit N6, # 17 Exhibit N7, # 18 Exhibit N8, # 19 Exhibit N9, # 20 Exhibit N10, # 21 Exhibit N11, # 22 Exhibit N12, # 23 Exhibit N13 Part 1, # 24 Exhibit N13 Part 2, # 25 Exhibit N13 Part 3, # 26 Exhibit N14, # 27 Exhibit N15, # 28 Exhibit N16 Part 1, # 29 Exhibit N16 Part 2, # 30 Exhibit N16 Part 3(a), # 31 Exhibit N16 Part 3(b), # 32 Exhibit N16 Part 4, # 33 Exhibit N16 Part 5, # 34 Exhibit N16 Part 6, # 35 Exhibit N16 Part 7, # 36 Exhibit N16 Part 8, # 37 Exhibit N16 Part 9, # 38 Exhibit N16 Part 10, # 39 Exhibit N16 Part 11, # 40 Exhibit N16 Part 12, # 41 Exhibit N16 Part 13, # 42 Exhibit N16 Part 14, # 43 Exhibit N16 Part 15, # 44 Exhibit N16 Part 16, # 45 Exhibit N16 Part 17, # 46 Exhibit N16 Part 18, # 47 Exhibit N16 Part 19, # 48 Exhibit N16 Part 20, # 49 Exhibit N16 Part 21, # 50 Exhibit N16 Part 22, # 51 Exhibit N17)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 433 DECLARATION of Shantal Rands Poovala in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 VOLUME 1 (INCLUDING EXHIBITS A - L39) filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L1, # 13 Exhibit L2, # 14 Exhibit L3, # 15 Exhibit L4, # 16 Exhibit L5, # 17 Exhibit L6, # 18 Exhibit L7, # 19 Exhibit L8, # 20 Exhibit L9, # 21 Exhibit L10, # 22 Exhibit L11, # 23 Exhibit L12, # 24 Exhibit L13, # 25 Exhibit L14, # 26 Exhibit L15, # 27 Exhibit L16, # 28 Exhibit L17, # 29 Exhibit L18, # 30 Exhibit L19, # 31 Exhibit L20, # 32 Exhibit L21, # 33 Exhibit L22, # 34 Exhibit L23, # 35 Exhibit L24, # 36 Exhibit L25, # 37 Exhibit L26, # 38 Exhibit L27, # 39 Exhibit L28, # 40 Exhibit L29, # 41 Exhibit L30, # 42 Exhibit L31, # 43 Exhibit L32, # 44 Exhibit L33, # 45 Exhibit L34, # 46 Exhibit L35, # 47 Exhibit L36, # 48 Exhibit L37, # 49 Exhibit L38, # 50 Exhibit L39)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 432 DECLARATION of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L1, # 13 Exhibit L2, # 14 Exhibit L3, # 15 Exhibit L4, # 16 Exhibit L5, # 17 Exhibit L6, # 18 Exhibit L7, # 19 Exhibit L8, # 20 Exhibit L9, # 21 Exhibit L10, # 22 Exhibit L11, # 23 Exhibit L12, # 24 Exhibit L13, # 25 Exhibit L14, # 26 Exhibit L15, # 27 Exhibit L16, # 28 Exhibit L17)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 431 DECLARATION of Paul Haahr in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 430 DECLARATION of Bill Brougher in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 [Public Redacted] filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 429 DECLARATION of Sibrina Khan in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] 426 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] 427 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] 428 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 428 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(d) For Web And Image Search [Public Redacted] filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 427 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(c) For Its Blogger Service [Public Redacted] filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 426 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Google Inc.'s Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b) For Its Caching Feature [Public Redacted] filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 425 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Notice of Lodging of Non-Documentary Exhibit II to the Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b), (c), and (d); Exhibit II Thereto (DVD filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order). (Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 424 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Notice of Lodging of Non-Documentary Exhibits to the Declaration of Shantal Rands Poovala in Support of Google's Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbors under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b), (c), and (d); portions of Exhibits N1-N11 and N14-N15 Thereto. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 2, 2009 423 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment re: Google's Entitlement to Safe Harbor Under 17 U.S.C. § 512(b), (c), & (d); Separate Statements in Support Thereof; Declarations of Shantal Rands Poovala, Paul Haahr, Bill Brougher, and Rachel Herrick Kassabian, and Exhibits Thereto; Application and [Proposed] Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
May 29, 2009 422 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Courts own motion, the Court hereby takes OFF-CALENDAR andUNDER SUBMISSION Defendants Motion for Order for Schedule for the Filing ofDispositive Motions [410, 411]. The parties will be notified if a hearing is necessary. (smo)
May 22, 2009 421 REPLY in support of Amended MOTION for Order for Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions 411 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Reply Regarding Google Inc.'s Motion for an Order Setting a Schedule for the Filing of Dispositive Motions, and Exhibits A-C Thereto)(Zeller, Michael)
May 18, 2009 420 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 (1) to Produce Documents, (2) to Comply with the Protective Order, and (3) to Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel, and Exhibits Thereto)(Herrick, Rachel)
May 17, 2009 419 DECLARATION of JEFFREY N. MAUSNER IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER WHICH WOULD DELAY PERFECT 10 FROM FILING ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, in Opposition to Amended MOTION for Order for Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions 411 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2009 418 DECLARATION of DR. NORMAN ZADA IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER WHICH WOULD DELAY PERFECT 10 FROM FILING ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, in Opposition to Amended MOTION for Order for Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions 411 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2009 417 PERFECT 10'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER WHICH WOULD DELAY PERFECT 10 FROM FILING ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT in Opposition to re: Amended MOTION for Order for Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions 411 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2009 416 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: The action entitled Perfect 10, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation, CV 07-5156 AHM (SHx) has been dismissed and is no longer subject to the order dated December 22, 2008, including Section A (Consolidation). (kbr)
May 14, 2009 415 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Defendant Google Inc's Request for Oral Argument on Pending Discovery Motions 405 is hereby DENIED. (pcl)
May 14, 2009 414 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Google Inc's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Perfect 10 ( 1) to produce documents (2) to Comply with protective order, and (3) to affix document control number to its document production 407 filed on May 7, 2009 and set for hearing on June 1, 2009 is hereby taken off calendar. (pcl)
May 12, 2009 413 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Google Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Stipulation Re Motion to Compel Perfect 10 (1) to Produce Documents, (2) to Comply with Protective Order, and (3) to Affix Document Control Numbers to Its Document Production and Portions of the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support Thereof by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Accordingly, the Confidential Materials are hereby ordered filed under seal. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
May 8, 2009 411 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Order for Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing Dispositive Motions)(Zeller, Michael)
May 8, 2009 410 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Schedule for the Filing of Dispositive Motions filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Order Setting a Schedule for the Filing of Dispositive Motions)(Herrick, Rachel)
May 7, 2009 412 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Stipulation re, Google's Motion to Compel Perfect 10 (1) to Produce Documents, (2) to Comply With Protective Order, and (3) to Affix Document Control Numbers to Its Document Production and Portions of the Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support thereof Order filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
May 7, 2009 409 DECLARATION OF VALERIE KINCAID IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S PORTIONS OF THE JOINT STIPULATION RE GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERFECT 10 TO (1) PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, (2) TO COMPLY WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND (3) TO AFFIX DOCUMENT CONTROL NUMBERS TO ITS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc re: MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 , Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,,,,,, 408 (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2009 408 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions 407 (Part 1 of 2) (Public Redacted) filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions (Part 2 of 2), # 2 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel (Public Redacted), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit II, # 38 Exhibit JJ, # 39 Exhibit KK, # 40 Exhibit LL (Part 1 of 2), # 41 Exhibit LL (Part 2 of 2), # 42 Exhibit MM, # 43 Exhibit NN, # 44 Exhibit OO, # 45 Exhibit PP, # 46 Exhibit QQ, # 47 Exhibit RR, # 48 Exhibit SS, # 49 Exhibit TT)(Herrick, Rachel)
May 7, 2009 407 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Perfect 10, Inc. to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2009 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Perfect 10 to Produce Documents, Comply with the Protective Order, and Affix Document Control Numbers to its Document Productions)(Herrick, Rachel)
May 7, 2009 406 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Joint Stipulation re. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents, Compliance with Protective Order, and Bates-Stamping; Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in support thereof, and Exhibits thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
May 1, 2009 405 REQUEST for Hearing as to Pending Discovery Motions re MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Setting Hearing on Google Inc.'s Pending Discovery Motions)(Herrick, Rachel)
February 12, 2009 404 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: The MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance 331 is VACATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Google may renew this motion before Judge Hillman after the stay is lifted. (jp)
February 11, 2009 403 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12-18-08, 3:08 p.m. (Amber, Leandra)
February 11, 2009 402 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-18-08, 3:08 P.M. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2009. (Amber, Leandra)
December 22, 2008 400 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court ORDERS that Perfect 10 shall select the factual and legal combinations that it will pursue using the list in Exhibit C to the attached Joint Status Report. This must be done by not later than 1/5/2009 (see document for further details). Perfect 10 shall provide this information in a spreadsheet format, preferably using the same spreadsheet referred to above, and shall provide the information to Microsoft by not later than 1/20/2009. The Court sets 8/11/2009 at the trial date. The scheduling order dated 2/11/2008 is vacated. (jp)
December 18, 2008 401 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court orders Mr. Mausner to provide the exact number of "combinations" to the Court by not later than December 19, 2008. Order to issue. Court orders that parties to agree on a sequence of pending motions but intends to start with A9's motion. The Court will not accept any further papers on plaintiff's fully briefed motions for summary judgment. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (jp)
December 15, 2008 399 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S TENTATIVE ORDER DATED DECEMBER 2, 2008 AND OPPOSITION TO CONTEMPLATED STAY (lra)
December 12, 2008 398 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Declaration, Application, Proposed Order 397 served on 12/12/08. (se)
December 12, 2008 397 DECLARATION of Thomas D. Nolan filed by Defendant Google Inc. re technical failures in the ECF system resulting in Google Inc.'s inability to electronically file the Notice of Manual Filing of Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal, and Proof of Service. (se)
December 12, 2008 396 GOOGLE INC.'S APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in support of Google Inc's Response to the Court's Tentative Order Dated December 2, 2008, and Opposition to Contemplated Stay filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
December 12, 2008 395 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1, the Procedures and Schedules of the Honorable A. Howard Matz, and the Protective Order entered by the Court in this action (Docket No. 94 ), Google Inc.'s application to file under seal the Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google Inc.'s Response to the Court's Tentative Order Dated December 2, 2008 and Opposition to Contemplated Stay, and Exhibits thereto (the "Roberts Declaration"), is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the Roberts Declaration is hereby ordered filed under seal. (jp)
December 12, 2008 394 Perfect 10's Response to Judge Matz's December 2, 2008 Order filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set Hearings,, 387 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2008 393 RESPONSE filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Incto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set Hearings,, 387 Google Inc.'s Response to the Court's Tentative Order Dated December 2, 2008 and Opposition to Contemplated Stay (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in Support Thereof, and Exhibits A-M Thereto)(Zeller, Michael)
December 12, 2008 392 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google Inc.'s Response to the Court's Tentative Order Dated December 2, 2008 and Opposition to Contemplated Stay; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Zeller, Michael)
December 3, 2008 391 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/6/08 1:43 pm (Nirenberg, Cindy)
December 3, 2008 390 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/27/08 4:06 pm (Nirenberg, Cindy)
December 3, 2008 389 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/18/08 2:28 pm (Nirenberg, Cindy)
December 3, 2008 388 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/14/08 11 am (Nirenberg, Cindy)
December 2, 2008 387 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE. CASE MANAGEMENT. The Court orders the parties in all three of the Perfect 10 cases to appear for a Status Conference on 12/18/2008 at 3:00 PM. The Court intends to issue an "Order Re Management of Perfect 10 v. Microsoft and Staying Related Actions." (See Tentative Order below.) The parties may respond in writing to the Courts tentative order by not later than 12/12/2008. No replies to response may be filed. (See document for further details). (jp)
November 25, 2008 386 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/27/08 11:13 AM. Court Reporter Cindy Nirenberg cindycsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
November 25, 2008 385 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/6/08 1:43 PM. Court Reporter Nirenberg, cindycsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
November 25, 2008 384 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/27/08 4:06 PM. Court Reporter Cindy Nirenberg, cindycsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
November 25, 2008 383 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/18/08 2:28 PM. Court Reporter Cindy Nirenberg, cindycsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
November 25, 2008 382 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/14/08 11 am. Court Reporter Cindy Nirenberg cindycsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2009. (Nirenberg, Cindy)
November 24, 2008 381 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: The hearing date of December 1, 2008, before Magistrate Judge Hillman is vacated. No other dates are set at this juncture. (pcl)
November 17, 2008 379 DECLARATION of Michael T. Zeller in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Improper Request for Stay, and Request for Sanctions filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael T. Zeller)(Zeller, Michael)
November 15, 2008 378 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS AMENDED ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING before Judge A. Howard Matz: Effective January 1, 2008, electronic filing has been mandatory for most new and pending civil cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Self-represented litigants and attorneys who take appropriate steps to opt out of the system need not comply with the following requirements. All documents which are required to be filed in an electronic format pursuant to General Order No. 08-03 must be filed electronically no later than midnight on the date due, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Documents filed late may be stricken by the Court. The Court will not accept documents which were filed electronically, but which otherwise fail to comply with filing requirements. (See document for further details). (jp)
November 14, 2008 380 JOINT LETTER from Jeffrey N. Mausner, attorneys for Perfect 10, and Michael T. Zeller, attorneys for Google. (pcl)
November 4, 2008 377 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: re: MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 . Hearing set for 11/17/2008 is vacated. If a hearing is necessary, the court will set a new date. (sbu)
November 3, 2008 376 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Google's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10's Responses to Google's Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in Support of Google's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10's Resposes to Google's Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Supplemental Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 31, 2008 375 STATEMENT Regarding the Court's Minute Order Regarding the Status Conference of October 6, 2008 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc ; Statement by Google Inc. re: Status Conference, 370 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Zeller, Michael)
October 28, 2008 374 DECLARATION of Valerie Kincaid In Support of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Portions of the Joint Stipulation - MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2008 373 DECLARATION of Rachel M. Herrick in Support of MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit C (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit D (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit D (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit D (Part 3), # 8 Exhibit D (Part 4), # 9 Exhibit D (Part 5), # 10 Exhibit D (Part 6), # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 27, 2008 372 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 371 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
October 27, 2008 371 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Admissions of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ; Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10, Inc.'s Responses to Google Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2008 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Google Inc.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Perfect 10's Responses to Google's Requests for Admission, Sets 1 and 2)(Herrick, Rachel)
October 24, 2008 369 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal As Counsel for Plaintiff, and with the consent of Plaintiff 367 , that Macias Counsel, Inc. and Sean E. Macias, Esq., are removed as counsel for Plaintiff in the above-captioned action. Plaintiff is currently represented by the Law Offices of Jeffrey N. Mausner, attorneys of record for Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. (jp)
October 23, 2008 368 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Motion for partial summary judgment set for hearing on 12/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (se)
October 22, 2008 367 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel, Sean E. Macias, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2008 366 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Preclude Disclosure of Confidential Information has been taken under submission, and is DENIED. No good cause has been shown to prohibit Mr. Chumura from access to confidential and highly confidential material. (pcl)
October 8, 2008 365 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Having considered the parties arguments in the Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsels Eyes Only (the Motion), and the Supplemental Declaration of Charles Rosenberg, and good cause having been shown, the Motion is hereby partially granted, 325 . Documents with Bates Range GGL 0334466 - GGL 033486 may be viewed by Dr. Zada in Mr. Mausners office only, and under his direct supervision. These documents relate to a 2004 Power Point Presentation. The remaining documents cited by Mr. Rosenberg relate only to 2006 - 2008 Power Point Presentations. The Motion is granted as to those documents. As the litigation progresses, this ruling might be subject to modification for good cause shown, namely a particularized need of Dr. Zada to review those documents. (ca)
October 6, 2008 370 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz:Court and counsel confer regarding the status of all three cases. Court orders Messrs. Zeller and Mausner to meet and confer regarding URLs v. DMCs. Parties are to file a status report which should include a proposal for a future telephonic status conference. Parties are instructed to obtain a transcript of this hearing and to split the cost four ways.Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (se)
October 5, 2008 364 STATEMENT of Perfect 10 for October 6, 2008 Case Management Conference Before Judge Matz filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set Hearings, 363 . (Mausner, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2008 363 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court does not intend to appoint either a technical advisor or adiscovery master at this time (see document for further details). Accordingly, the Court has determined that a further conference with counsel in all three cases is necessary. Court ORDERS the parties in all these cases to appear for a Status Conference set for 10/6/2008 at 1:30 PM. (jp)
September 22, 2008 362 SEALED DOCUMENT - FURTHER DECLARATION of CHARLES ROSENBERG IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE INC.'S for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsel's Eyes Only (lra)
September 22, 2008 358 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, GRANTING GOOGLE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE FURTHER DECLARATION OF CHARLES ROSENBERG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION. Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 357 (sbu)
September 18, 2008 360 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal 359 , Proposed Order, Further Declaration of Charles Rosenberg served on 9/18/2008. (jp)
September 18, 2008 359 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the further Declaration of Charles Rosenberg in support of Google's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsel's Eyes Only, filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
September 18, 2008 357 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Further Declaration of Charles Rosenberg in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsel's Eyes Only. (Herrick, Rachel)
September 17, 2008 361 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting Withdrawal 356 of Rusell J. Frackman as counsel for plaintiff; plaintiff is represented by Jeffrey N. Mauser, counsel of record. (se)
September 16, 2008 356 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal As Counsel For Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order re Notice of Withdrawal)(Frackman, Russell)
September 5, 2008 354 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Motion to Compel Answer to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc Google Inc Motion to Compel further Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 11 set for hearing on September 8, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby taken off calendar, re: MOTION 336 . (ca)
September 4, 2008 353 JOINT REPORT of Proposal Regarding Discovery Master filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2008 351 STATEMENT Regarding Google Inc.'s List of Pending and Contemplated Discovery Motions (Zeller, Michael)
August 29, 2008 350 STATUS REPORT of Perfect 10's Court Ordered List Re (1) Pending Discovery Motions, (2) Discovery Motions That Are Currently Contemplated and (3) Discovery Disputes That Are Reasonably Likely to Arise Within The Next Nine Months filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2008 355 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Cause called; appearances made. Also present is the Honorable Stephen J. Hillman, Magistrate Judge. Court questions Microsofts counsel regarding the current status of the case and the feasability of coordinating the discovery between all three related actions. The Court is provided with Microsoft's position on the matters discussed at the last hearing between plaintiff Perfect 10 and defendants Google and Amazon.com. Court authorizes Magistrate Judge Hillman to take off calendar all pending motions currently scheduled for hearing on 9/8/2008. Court and counsel discuss whether or not to separate the three issues contemplated in A9's forthcoming summary judgment motion into separate motions. The Court agrees that the Safe Harbor issue can be distilled in another motion whereas the direct and vicarious infringement issues should remain in a single motion. Court orders the parties to order a transcript of this hearing. The cost is to be split four ways. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp)
August 26, 2008 349 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2008 348 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz. The Court GRANTS Microsofts Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Comply With August 20, 2008 Order and For Telephonic Status Conference. Counsel shall have until September 4, 2008 to submit their joint recommendations concerning a Discovery Master. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on Wednesday, August 27, 2008 at 4:00 p.m. to allow Microsoft to convey its position as to the matters discussed at the August 18, 2008 hearing. (kbr).
August 25, 2008 347 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 Google Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Google's Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11, # 2 Exhibit A to the Supplemental Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick)(Herrick, Rachel)
August 21, 2008 342 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey N Mausner counsel for Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Changing e-mail to jeff@mausnerlaw.com. Filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2008 341 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: On Monday, the Court held a scheduling conference in Perfect 10, Inc. v. Google, Inc. and Perfect 10, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. The Court elicited information on the status of Plaintiffs case against Microsoft Corporation, whose counsel was not present, and issued tentative rulings affecting that case, in an effort to coordinate discovery in all three related cases. The Court directed the parties to obtain a transcript and make it available to Microsofts counsel as soon as possible. See document. (se)
August 19, 2008 345 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of RACHEL M. HERRICK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 filed (lra)
August 19, 2008 344 SEALED DOCUMENT - JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 filed(lra)
August 19, 2008 343 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman,granting Google Inc's Application to File Under seal Portions of the Joint Stipulation re: Google's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Google's Interrogatory Nos 3 and 11 and Portions of Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in support Thereof (lra)
August 19, 2008 340 AMENDED ANSWER - ANSWER OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC. TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. (NOT AMENDED ANSWER) filed by Counter Defendant Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2008 346 MINUTES OF Further Scheduling Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman is present. Court questions counsel about outstanding discovery issues. Court informs counsel that it is inclined to appoint a special discovery master and that each side would be expected to propose an appropriate candidate. Case scheduling order to issue. The stipulation and order regarding the copyright cut-off date is due one week after the Court issues its scheduling order.Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (se)
August 18, 2008 339 DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada In Opposition To MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2008 338 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Opposition To MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2008 337 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 336 - Public Redacted filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A to the Herrick Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to the Herrick Declaration - Public Redacted, # 4 Exhibit C to the Herrick Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to the Herrick Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to the Herrick Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to the Herrick Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to the Herrick Declaration)(Herrick, Rachel)
August 15, 2008 336 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Perfect 10, Inc. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2008 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11)(Herrick, Rachel)
August 15, 2008 335 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Joint Stipulation re. Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Google's Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 11; Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in support thereof, and Exhibits thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
August 12, 2008 352 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Joint Stipulation re Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel,, 337 ; Declaration of Rachel M. herrick; application to file Under Seal; Proposed Order granting application to file under seal served on 8/15/2008 by personal service. (ca)
August 11, 2008 334 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan - Joint Rule 16(b) Report ; estimated length of trial Perfect 10 - 12 days, Google - 20 days, filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2008 332 Amendment to MOTION for Protective Order for Designation of One Category of Documents as Outside Counsel's Eyes Only : Joint Stipulation on Google's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside 325 ; Amended (Proposed) Order Granting Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsel's Eyes Only filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Herrick, Rachel)
August 5, 2008 331 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance ; Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Documents and Testimony from FoneStarz Media Limited filed by Defendant and Counterclaimaint Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in support of Google's Motion for Issuance of a Letter of Request, and Exhibits A-D Thereto, # 2 (Proposed) Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance regarding FoneStarz Media Limited, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the (Proposed) Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance regarding FoneStarz Media Limited)(Herrick, Rachel)
August 4, 2008 333 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, granting APPLICATION to Seal 329 (lra)
August 4, 2008 330 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portion of Joint Stipulation 329 , Joint Stipulation, and Proposed Order served on 8/4/2008. (jp)
August 4, 2008 329 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Stipulation on Google's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents as Outside Counsel Eyes Only filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Order. (jp)
August 4, 2008 328 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Opposition To MOTION for Protective Order for Designation of One Category of Documents as Outside Counsel's Eyes Only : Joint Stipulation on Google's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside 325 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2008 327 DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada In Opposition To MOTION for Protective Order for Designation of One Category of Documents as Outside Counsel's Eyes Only : Joint Stipulation on Google's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside 325 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2008 326 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Joint Stipulation on Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsel's Eyes Only; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Herrick, Rachel)
August 4, 2008 325 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Designation of One Category of Documents as Outside Counsel's Eyes Only : Joint Stipulation on Google's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Protective Order to Designate One Category of Documents Outside Counsel's Eyes Only - PUBLIC REDACTED filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick, # 2 Exhibit s A through F to the Herrick Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Chuck Rosenberg, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion for Reconsideration of Protective Order)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 31, 2008 324 ANSWER to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A-E to Google's Answer to Perfect 10's Second Amended Complaint)(Zeller, Michael)
July 22, 2008 323 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7-14-08 1:27p.m. (bem, )
July 22, 2008 322 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7-14-08 1:27p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin CourtHouse Services, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008. (bem, )
July 16, 2008 321 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS before Judge A. Howard Matz: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's FRCP 15(a) MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 , which would add certain new claims and new factual allegations. Defendant Google, Inc. ("Google") opposes this motion. For the reasons set forth below, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion (see document for further details). (jp)
July 15, 2008 318 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge A. Howard Matz that this matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 8/18/2008 at 01:30 PM. The conference will be held pursuant to FRCP 16(b). The parties reminded of their obligations under FRCP 26(a)(1) to disclose information (without awaiting a discovery request) and under Rule 26(f) to confer on a discovery plan not later than twenty-one (21) days prior to the scheduling conference and to file a report with the Court entitled "Joint Rule 26(f) Report" not later than fourteen (14) days after they confer. Failure to comply with the following requirements or to cooperate in the preparation of the Joint Rule 26(f) Report may lead to the imposition of sanctions. (jp)
July 14, 2008 320 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: Court grants extension regarding outside attorney eyes only to August 1, 2008.Joint Stipulation shall be submitted to court on August 4, 2008. Court Smart: 7/14/2008. (sbu)
July 14, 2008 317 REPLY MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 - Perfect 10's Reply to Additional Document Submitted by Google's Counsel at the Hearing on Perfect 10's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 14, 2008 316 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz: MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 . Cause called; appearances made. Court circulates tentative order and questionnaire and hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Court takes plaintiffs motion UNDER SUBMISSION. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp)
July 11, 2008 319 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman:, ( Status Conference set for 7/14/2008 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman.) (sbu)
July 7, 2008 315 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner in support of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30, # 2 Exhibit 31)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2008 314 DECLARATION of Irina Voronina submitted in support of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2008 313 DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada in support of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27, # 5 Exhibit 28, # 6 Exhibit 29)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2008 312 REPLY in support of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2008 311 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in Support of Google's Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion for Leave, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits H-Q to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit R (Part I) to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit R (Part II) to the Declaration of Rachel Herrick, # 6 Google's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada, # 7 Proposed Order regarding Perfect 10's Motion for Leave)(Herrick, Rachel)
June 19, 2008 310 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court DENIES Defendant Google Inc.s ex parte application for a continuance of the July 7, 2008 hearing on Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. Defendant has not established good cause for the five week continuance it requests. In light of Plaintiffs acquiescence to a one week continuance, the Court hereby continues the hearing date to July 14, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge A. Howard Matz. Defendants opposition is due June 30, 2008 and Plaintiffs reply is due July 7, 2008. (smo)
June 19, 2008 309 PERFECT 10'S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATIONS OF JEFFREY N. MAUSNER AND DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT THEREOF re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 7, 2008 to August 11, 2008 Re: MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.; Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 7, 2008 to August 11, 2008 Re: MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.; Ex Parte Application 308 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2008 308 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 7, 2008 to August 11, 2008 Re: MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.; Ex Parte Application filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in Support of Google's Ex Parte Application, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Google Inc.'s Ex Parte Application)(Herrick, Rachel)
June 13, 2008 307 EXHIBIT 9 to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in support of to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp)
June 12, 2008 306 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: account information was not updated in ECF system RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 296 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
June 12, 2008 305 EXHIBIT 4, Part II to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 Exhibit 4, Part II to [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 304 EXHIBIT 4, Part I to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 Exhibit 4, Part I to [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 303 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint, re MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Second Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Second Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Second Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 302 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Motion to File Second Amended Complaint (a CD-ROM). (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 301 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support Of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16, # 8 Exhibit 17, # 9 Exhibit 18, # 10 Exhibit 19, # 11 Exhibit 20, # 12 Exhibit 21, # 13 Exhibit 22, # 14 Exhibit 23)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 300 EXHIBIT 5, Pages 29-50 to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 Exhibit 5, Part 2, Pages 29-50 to Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support Of Motion filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 299 EXHIBIT 5, Pages 1-28 to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 Exhibit 5, Part 1, Pages 1-28 to Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support Of Motion filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 298 DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada In Support Of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 297 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 297 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/7/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2008 296 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey N Mausner counsel for Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Changing firm name to Law Offices of Jeffrey N. Mausner. Filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2008 295 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING MOTION for Leave to File The Amended Complaint. After consideration of the parties submissions and the arguments raised by the parties and defendants non-opposition to the Motion, the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc is deemed filed and served on 5/27/2008, upon the Defendants who have previously appeared in this action. (jp)
May 13, 2008 294 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Mat on Google Inc Objections To, and Perfect 10, Inc's MOTION for Review of, the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008, Granting in Part and Denying In Part Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, came on for hearing on April 14, 2008, the Honorable A. Howard Matz presiding. Jeffrey N. Mausner appeared on behalf of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. ("Perfect 10"). Michael T. Zeller and Rachel M. Herrick appeared on behalf of Defendant and Counterclaimant 257 . Upon consideration of all papers and records on file and the parties' oral argument, the Court orders as follows: Perfect 10's objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order regarding Request Nos. 135, 136, and 137 are overruled, and the Magistrate Judge's Order regarding those Requests is AFFIRMED (see document for further details). GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS REGARDING REQUEST NO. 174. Google's objections are sustained in part and overruled in part. GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS REGARDING REQUEST NO. 196 Google's objections are overruled. (jp)
May 8, 2008 293 Featured Case ORDER FOR RETURN OF PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.SCASH BOND by Judge A. Howard Matz: The parties having Stipulated 291 , that the principal amount of the Cash Bond in the amount of $100,000 currently on deposit with the United States District Court for the Central District of California in connection with the above-entitled case be returned to Perfect 10 forthwith, together with all accrued interest thereon to date. (jp)
May 7, 2008 292 NOTICE OF LODGING filed regarding (Proposed) Order on Google Inc.'s Objections to, and Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of, Portions of the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part and Denying in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Google Inc.'s Objections to, and Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review of, Portions of the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part and Denying in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel)(Zeller, Michael)
May 6, 2008 291 STIPULATION for Disbursement of Funds to Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order For Return of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Cash Bond# 2 Exhibit A - Receipt for Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Cash Bond)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2008 288 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey D Goldman counsel for Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, Counter Defendant Perfect 10 Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey D. Goldman (Goldman, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2008 289 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court hears oral argument and GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof re Order 254 filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. 257 AND(2) First MOTION for Review of Order re: Perfect 10's Motion To Compel Defendant Google Inc. To Produce Documents Pursuant to Perfect 10's Requests for Production Nos. 128-131, 174, and 194-196 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. 258 . Defense counsel shall submit a proposed order.Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (se)
April 9, 2008 290 SEALED DOCUMENT - PERFECT 10'S RESPONSE TO GOOGLE'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS. (jp)
April 9, 2008 287 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING APPLICATION 282 . It is hereby Ordered that the following document be Filed Under Seal: Perfect 10's Response to Google's Evidentiary Objections. (jp)
April 9, 2008 282 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Following Document which may contain information which Google has designated as confidential or highly confidential; Perfect 10's Response to Google's Evidentiary Objections filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
April 9, 2008 281 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Perfect 10's Response to Google's Evidentiary Objections; Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2008 286 SEALED DOCUMENT - GOOGLE INC'S CORRECTED REPLY in support of its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008, Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc's Motion to Compel. (jp)
April 7, 2008 285 SEALED DOCUMENT - GOOGLE INC'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in support of Pertect 10, Inc's Opposition to Google Inc's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's February 22, 2008 Order Granting in part and Denying in part Pertect 10, Inc's Motion to Compel. (jp)
April 7, 2008 284 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of RACHEL M. HERRICK in support of Google Inc's Reply in support of its Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008, Granting in part and Denying in Part plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion to Compel. (jp)
April 7, 2008 283 SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY in support of its Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008, Granting in part and Denying in Part plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion to Compel. (jp)
April 7, 2008 280 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portion of Google Inc's Reply in support of its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008; Exhibits A, E, F, and H to the Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in support thereof; and Google's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada and Exhibits thereto 278 . (jp)
April 7, 2008 277 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Notice of Errata 275 , APPLICATION to File Under Seal Corrected Reply 276 ; Proposed Order; Corrected Reply, served on 4/7/2008. (jp)
April 7, 2008 276 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Google Inc's Corrected Reply in support of its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part and Denying in part Perfect 10 Inc's Motion to Compel filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
April 7, 2008 275 NOTICE OF ERRATA Regarding Google Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Google Inc.'s Corrected Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008)(Zeller, Michael)
April 7, 2008 274 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Corrected Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008 (portions thereof filed under seal); Google Inc.'s Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Zeller, Michael)
April 4, 2008 279 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Google Inc, re Reply in support of its Objections; Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick; Google Inc's Evidentiary Objections; APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portions of Reply 278 ; Proposed Order served on 4/4/2008. (jp)
April 4, 2008 278 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Portion of Google Inc's Reply in support of its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008; Exhibits A, E, F, and H to the Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick in support thereof; and Google's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada and Exhibits thereto filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
April 4, 2008 273 REPLY Reply In Support of Motion First MOTION for Review of Order re: Perfect 10's Motion To Compel Defendant Google Inc. To Produce Documents Pursuant to Perfect 10's Requests for Production Nos. 128-131, 174, and 194-196 258 Google Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008 filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick In Support of Google Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008)(Zeller, Michael)
April 4, 2008 272 DECLARATION of Dr. Norman Zada In Support Of Reply for MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i 257 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2008 271 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner In Support Of Reply for MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i 257 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit 10# 4 Exhibit 11# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2008 270 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i 257 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2008 269 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Google Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008; Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick In Support Thereof; Google's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada and Exhibits Thereto; Google's Application and (Proposed) Order to Seal; Proof of Service. (Zeller, Michael)
March 28, 2008 268 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' PERFECT 10 INC'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S OBJECTION TO JUDGE HILLMAN'S FEBRUARY 22, 2008 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PERFECT 10'S MOTION TO COMPEL 267 , Order 254 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (lra)
March 28, 2008 267 SEALED DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM in Opposition to DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S OBJECTION TO JUDGE HILLMAN'S FEBRUARY 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i 257 , APPLICATION to Seal Order 254 APPLICATION to Seal Order 254 APPLICATION to Seal Order 254 265 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (lra)
March 28, 2008 266 SEALED DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS WHICH CONTAIN INFORMATION WHICH GOOGLE HAS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTAL OR HIGHLY CONFIDENTAL 1) PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.,'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS TO JUDGE HILLMAN'S FEBRUARY 22, 2008 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PERFECT 10'S MOTION TO COMPEL 20 DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT THEREOF 254 re APPLICATION to Seal Order 254 APPLICATION to Seal Order 254 APPLICATION to Seal Order 254 265 (lra)
March 28, 2008 265 SEALED DOCUMENT APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS WHICH CONTAIN INFORMATION WHICH GOOGLE HAS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTAL OR HIGHLY CONFIDENTAL 1) PLAINTIFF PERFECT 10, INC.,'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS TO JUDGE HILLMAN'S FEBRUARY 22, 2008 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PERFECT 10'S MOTION TO COMPEL 20 DECLARATION OF DR. NORMAN ZADA IN SUPPORT THEREOF 254 filed by PLAINTIFF Perfect 10 Inc.Application set for hearing on 4/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (lra)
March 26, 2008 264 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i 257 Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review and Reconsideration of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part and Denying in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick Regarding Google Inc.'s Opposition to Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review and Reconsideration of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008, and Exhibits A-H Thereto# 2 Proposed Order Denying Perfect 10, Inc.'s Motion for Review and Reconsideration of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008)(Zeller, Michael)
March 26, 2008 263 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada in Support of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google's Objections to Judge Hillman's February 22, 2008 Order Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel, which contains information designated Confidential or Highly Confidential by Google. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2008 262 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google's Objections to Judge Hillman's February 22, 2008 Order Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel, which contains information designated Confidential or Highly Confidential by Google.. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2008 261 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of [Proposed] Order that the Following Documents Which Contain Information Designated by Google as Confidential/Highly Confidential be Filed Under Seal: Perfect 10's Memorandum in Opposition to Google's Objections to Judge Hillman's Order re Perfect 10's Motion to Compel; Zada Declaration in Support Thereof. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2008 260 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc of Application to File Under Seal the Following Documents Which Contain Information Designated by Google as Confidential or Highly Confidential: Perfect 10's Memorandum in Opposition to Google's Objections to Judge Hillman's Order Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel; Zada Declaration in Support Thereof. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2008 259 Amendment to MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i 257 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2008 258 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION for Review of Order re: Perfect 10's Motion To Compel Defendant Google Inc. To Produce Documents Pursuant to Perfect 10's Requests for Production Nos. 128-131, 174, and 194-196 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc.Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick Regarding Google Inc.'s Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick# 5 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Sustaining Google Inc.'s Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 22, 2008)(Zeller, Michael)
March 14, 2008 257 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Portions of Magistrate Judge Hillman's Order of February 22, 2008 Granting in Part Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents, and Objections Thereto; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof re Order 254 filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Proposed Order)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2008 256 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR REVIEW OF NONDISPOSITIVE RULING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HILLMAN by Judge A. Howard Matz, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 255 : COURT HEREBY ORDERS that, to the extent each party files a motion for review of Magistrate Judge Hillman's ruling: Each party's Motion for Review shall be due on March 14, 2008. Each party's Opposition will be due on March 26, 2008. Each party's Reply will be due on April 4, 2008. The parties' Motions will be heard on April 14, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (smo)
March 5, 2008 255 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Review of Nondispositive Ruling of Magistrate Judge Hillman filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(Herrick, Rachel)
February 22, 2008 254 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen J. Hillman, re MOTION to Compel 229 (sbu)
February 21, 2008 253 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel M Herrick on behalf of Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc (Herrick, Rachel)
February 21, 2008 252 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING held before Judge A. Howard Matz (se)
February 20, 2008 251 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: re APPLICATION of Andrew P. Bridges, Michael S. Brophy, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, and Matthew A. Scherb of Winston & Strawn LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Google Inc. 249 , Attorney Jennifer A Golinveaux; Matthew Alex Scherb; Andrew P Bridges and Michael S Brophy terminated. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Winston & Strawn LLP and its attorneys Andrew P. Bridges, Michael S. Brophy, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, and Matthew A. Scherb are authorized to withdraw as counsel for Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. in this action and shall hereby be considered withdrawn. (smo)
February 20, 2008 250 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found: Proposed Order not submitted as separate attachment as to APPLICATION of Andrew P. Bridges, Michael S. Brophy, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, and Matthew A. Scherb of Winston & Strawn LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Google Inc. 249 (se)
February 19, 2008 249 APPLICATION of Andrew P. Bridges, Michael S. Brophy, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, and Matthew A. Scherb of Winston & Strawn LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Google Inc. filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc. (Scherb, Matthew)
February 14, 2008 248 DECLARATION of Rachel M. Herrick re (Proposed) Order re Perfect 10's Motion to Compel filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I to Declaration of Rachel M. Herrick)(Zeller, Michael)
February 14, 2008 247 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc of Decl of Rachel M. Herrick re (Proposed) Order; Stipulation to File Under Seal; (Proposed) Order to File Under Seal; Proof of Service. (Zeller, Michael)
February 11, 2008 246 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 1 through 11; Sealed Documents(s): 19; Transcripts(s): 4; RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) 217 (car)
January 10, 2008 244 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel for Plaintiff filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (Frackman, Russell)
December 26, 2007 243 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 123 , Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 168 , Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 131 , Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 192 , CCA # 06-55405, 06-55406, 06-55425, 06-55759, 06-55854 and 06-55877. The Judgment is affirmed in part, reversed in part, remanded. Mandate received in this district on 12/28/2007. (dmap)
December 21, 2007 242 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc (Zeller, Michael)
December 10, 2007 241 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 11/27/07 Court Reporter: Huntington Court Reporters. (bem, )
November 27, 2007 245 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen J. Hillman : re: MOTION to Produce Documents 236 , MOTION to Produce Documents 235 . (sbu)
November 16, 2007 240 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen J. Hillman : re: MOTION to Compel 229 . Motion continued to 11/27/2007 at 9:30a.m. (sbu)
November 6, 2007 239 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found incorrect document type selected: RE MOTION to Produce Documents - DECLARATION OF DR. NORM ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS - 236 . (ca)
November 6, 2007 238 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found incorrect document type selected: RE MOTION to Produce Documents - PERFECT 10'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS - 235 . (ca)
November 5, 2007 237 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel 229 supplementing Defendant and Counter-Claimant Google Inc.'s Opposition to the Motion to Compel filed by Counter Claimant Google Inc, Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux)(Scherb, Matthew)
November 5, 2007 236 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Produce Documents - DECLARATION OF DR. NORM ZADA IN SUPPORT OF PERFECT 10'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS - filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Google Trends Graph# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Overture search results# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - page 1 - Google Analytics# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - page 2 - Google Analytics# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - page 3 - Google Analytics Terms# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - FOOBR - Google Analytics# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - E-mails# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - page 1 - Ads by Google - Angelina Jolie# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - page 2 - Ads by Google - Jennifer Lopez# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Excerpt from Defendant Google, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Admissions# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Letter to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 17-1 - News Article - attachment to letter to Ninth Circuit# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 17-2 - Declaration of Offir Gutelzon in Support of Perfect 10's Reply Brief Re Form of Preliminary Injunction - attachment to letter to Ninth Circuit# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 17-3 - Printout of portion of website picscout.com re image recognition - attachment to letter to Ninth Circuit)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2007 235 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Produce Documents - PERFECT 10'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS - filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Earlier Order re Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc. to Produce Documents and to Answer Interrogatories)(Mausner, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2007 234 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen J. Hillman, GRANTING APPLICATION to file under seal the declaration of Radhika Malpani submitted in support of Google's opposition to perfect 10's motion to compel pursuant to protective order entered Dec. 27, 2005 229 , 233 . (ca)
October 9, 2007 232 DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Mausner in support MOTION to Compel 229 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (sbu)
October 9, 2007 231 DECLARATION of Jennifer Golinveaux in opposition MOTION to Compel 229 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (sbu)
October 9, 2007 230 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel 229 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (sbu)
October 9, 2007 229 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Google to Produce documents filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc.Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2007 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (sbu)
October 5, 2007 233 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE DECLARATION OF RADHIKA MALPANI SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PERFECT 10'S MOTION TO COMPEL, PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED DEC. 27, 2005 re MOTION to Compel 229 filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged under seal and Order. (vh)
July 30, 2007 225 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 07/23/07. Court Reporter: Cindy L. Nirenberg. (bem, )
July 23, 2007 227 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS ORDER) held before Judge A. Howard Matz: As in both IMS and Egilman, neither of the pleadings at issue here contains any allegation that the defendants accessed or provided access to Perfect 10's website by avoiding or bypassing technological measures designed to protect copyrighted work. As stated in IMS, "a cause of action under the DMCA does not accrue upon unauthorized and injurious access alone; rather, the DMCA `targets the circumvention of digital walls guarding copyrighted material.'"" IMS, 307 F.Supp.2d at 532 (emphasis in original). Thus, the conduct alleged in both pleadings fails to state a claim constituting "circumvention" under the DMCA. As a result, the Court GRANTS both Google's 221 and Amazon's motion. Instead of entering judgment on the pleadings, which invites procedural confusion, the Court dismisses the fourth causes of action with prejudice. (mg)
July 23, 2007 226 MINUTES of Motion Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Proceedings: 1) Defendants Google Inc's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 221 ; 2) Amazon.com Inc's and A9.com Inc's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Court issues tentative order without oral argument. For reasons and findings stated on the record, the Court GRANTS the above motions with prejudice. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg.(mg)
July 23, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Jeffrey N Mausner is 818-716-2773. (mg)
July 23, 2007 224 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: changing address to 21800 Oxnard Street, Suite 910, Woodland Hills, CA 91367; telephone 818-992-7500 and 310-617-8100; fax number 818-716-2773; for attorney Jeffrey N Mausner. Filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc (mg)
July 16, 2007 228 REPLY in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 221 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (mg)
July 11, 2007 223 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Defendant Amazon.com's Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Fourth received on the Fourth Claim, received on 7/11/07, is to be filed and processed. The filing date is Ordered to be the date the document was stamped received but not filed with the Clerk. (mg)
July 6, 2007 222 RESPONSE to Google's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Fourth Cause of Action (Circumvention of Copyright Protection Systems) 221 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (mg)
June 29, 2007 221 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Fourth Cause of Action (Circumevention of Copyright Protection Systems); Memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof; filed by Defendant Google Inc.Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (mg)
November 2, 2006 218 APPEAL RECORD sealed documents sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 06-55406. 19 (see document for details) documents were sent with this transmittal. (dmap, )
November 2, 2006 217 RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 06-55406 Record consists of 11 volumes; 10 bulky documents (see document for details); 4 transcripts re Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 (dmap, )
October 23, 2006 220 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 10/12/06. Court Reporter: Dorothy Babykin. (et)
October 23, 2006 219 RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 10/12/06 Court Reporter: D. Babykin (et)
September 20, 2006 216 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 8/29/06. Telephonic Hearing; Court Reporter: D. Babykin. (lr, )
September 20, 2006 215 RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 8/29/06; Court Reporter: D Babykin (lr, )
August 16, 2006 214 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen J. Hillman :, Set Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/29/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman.Court Reporter: none present. (sbu, )
August 15, 2006 213 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 7/24/2006. Court Reporter: Leslie A King. (kks )
August 15, 2006 212 RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date: 7/24/2006 Court Reporter: Leslie A King. (kks )
July 24, 2006 208 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz : Court questions counsel, issues tentative ruling denying the above motion, and hears oral argument. For reasons and findings stated on the record, the Court DENIES the MOTION to Stay pending Discovery 180 . Court instructs counsel to file a proposed briefing schedule for upcoming discovery motions to be noticed before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. Court Reporter: Leslie A, King. (smo, )
July 19, 2006 211 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Defendant Google Inc' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Appeal re MOTION to Stay pending Discovery 180 filed by Defendants Amazon.Com Inc's and A9.Com Inc. (dw, )
July 17, 2006 210 DECLARATION of Jennifer A Golinveaux in Support of Google's Reply Re Motion to Stay Discovery re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending of the 5/9/06 Preliminary Injunction 193 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
July 17, 2006 209 REPLY in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery re: Ex Parte Application 193 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
July 13, 2006 207 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number: 06-55854, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court, 183 filed by Google Inc,. (lr, )
July 10, 2006 206 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number: 06-55877, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court, 192 filed by Google Inc. (lr, )
June 29, 2006 205 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Norman Zada in Opposition to Google's Motion to Stay Discovery (dw, )
June 29, 2006 204 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Jeffrey Mausner in Opposition to Google's Motion to Stay Discovery(dw, )
June 29, 2006 203 SEALED DOCUMENT OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY (dw, )
June 29, 2006 202 NOTICE of Filing the Following Documents Under Seal: 1) Perfect 10's Opposition to Google's Motion to Stay Discovery; 2) Declaration of Jeffrey Mausner in Opposition to Google's Motion to Stay Discovery; 3) Declaration of Norman Zada In Opposition to Google's Motion to Stay Discovery re MOTION to Stay pending Discovery 180 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
June 29, 2006 201 OPPOSITION to Google's MOTION to Stay Discovery 180 filed by Plaintiff (Redacted Version) Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
June 21, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals; re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 192 (lr, )
June 19, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to Circuit Court, mail by Fedex; 183 Filed on: 6/07/06; Entered on: 6/19/06. (lr, )
June 15, 2006 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [Proposed] Order Granting Google Inc's Ex Parte Application for Stay of the May 9, 2006 Prelminary Injunction submitted by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
June 15, 2006 200 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 filed by Perfect 10 Inc, Appeal to Circuit Court, 183 filed by Google Inc, Appeal to Circuit Court, 192 filed by Google Inc, Appeal to Circuit Court 168 filed by Perfect 10 Inc, CCA # 06-55405, 06-55406, 06-55425, 06-55759. Order received in this district on 06/19/06. Numbers 06-55405 and 06-55406 are consolidted preliminary injunction appeals. Numbers 06-55425 and 06-55759 and preliminary injuction cross-appeals relating to number 06-55406. Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 applies to these appeals. (cbr, )
June 15, 2006 199 GOGGLE INC'S REPLY In Support of Its EX PARTE APPLICATION For Stay of the 5/9/06 Preliminary Injunction 193 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
June 15, 2006 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from defendant Google Inc forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to Circuit Court, 192 (lr, )
June 15, 2006 192 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION NOTICE OF APPEAL AND REPRESENTATION STATEMENT to 9th CCA filed by defendant Google Inc. Appeal of Order 170 Filed On: 6/08/06; Entered On: 06/08/06; Filing fee $455; Paid; receipt number 86116. cc: Andrew P. Bridges; Russell J. Frackman, Jeffrey N. Mausner, Daniel J. Cooper (lr, )
June 15, 2006 187 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court GRANTS a temporary stay to permit Goodle to apply to the Ninth Circuit for a stay of the preliminary injunction. Stay shall remain in effect until 6/23/06. (See document for further information) RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Preliminary Injunction 185 Court Reporter: N/A. (dw, )
June 14, 2006 193 SEALED DOCUMENT EX PARTE APPLICATION For Stay of the 5/9/06 Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Ponts and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Jennifer Golinveaux (dw, )
June 14, 2006 190 Featured Case ORDER Granting Application to File Portions of Google's Ex Parte Application For Stay of the 5/9/06 Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jennifer A Golinveaux Under Seal by Judge A. Howard Matz: GRANTED. re APPLICATION to Seal 184 (dw, )
June 14, 2006 189 OPPOSITION to Google's EX PARTE APPLICATION For Stay Of the Preliminary Injunction Order 185 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
June 13, 2006 186 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Inc, re APPLICATION to Seal 184 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Preliminary Injunction 185 , was served on 6/13/06. (See document for additional documents served) (dw, )
June 13, 2006 185 EX PARTE APPLICATION For Stay of the 5/9/06 Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Supporting Declaration of Jennifer A Golinveaux (Redacted Version) filed by Defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (dw, )
June 13, 2006 184 APPLICATION to File Portions of Google's Ex Parte Application For Stay of the 5/9/06 Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jennifer A Golinveaux Under Seal filed by Defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order and Ex Parte Under Seal. (dw, )
June 13, 2006 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $100,000.00 into the registry of the Court from Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (ek, )
June 12, 2006 198 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT K to the Declaration of Susan E Lee in Support of Google Inc's Motion to Stay Discovery (dw, )
June 12, 2006 197 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Susan E Lee in Support of Google Inc's Motion to Stay Discovery (dw, )
June 12, 2006 196 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT I to the Declaratoin of Susan E Lee in Support of Google Inc's Motion to Stay Discovery (dw, )
June 12, 2006 195 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT G To the Declaration of Susan E Lee in Support of Google Inc's Motion to Stay Discovery (dw, )
June 12, 2006 194 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT E to the Declaration of Susan E Lee in Support of Google Inc's Motion to Stay Discovery (dw, )
June 12, 2006 191 Featured Case ORDER Re Application to File Exhibits E,G,I,J and K of the Declaration of Susan E Lee in Support of Google Inc's Motion to Stay Under Seal by Judge A. Howard Matz: GRANTED. re APPLICATION to Seal 188 (dw, )
June 9, 2006 188 APPLICATION to File Under Seal the Joint Stipulation Re: Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Google to Produce Documents (Exhibit E) and the Declarations of Radhika Malpani (Exhibits G and I) Diane Tang (Exhibit J) and Lawrence You (Exhibit K) in Support of Google's Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Pursuant to Protective Order Entered December 27, 2005 filed by Defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order Exhibits E & G, I - K. (dw, )
June 9, 2006 182 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc, re MOTION to Stay Discovery 180 , Declaration of Susan E Lee 181 , Exhibit E, G, I, J, K (all Exhibits confidential--FILED UNDER SEAL) was served on 6/9/06. (klg, )
June 9, 2006 181 DECLARATION of Susan E Lee in support of MOTION to Stay Discovery 180 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (klg, )
June 9, 2006 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (klg, )
June 9, 2006 173 NOTICE of Deposit of Cashier's Check ($100,000) Pursuant to Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
June 8, 2006 170 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Google's Ex Parte Application for an Order Modifying the Preliminary Injunction Order Entered 5/9/06 is DENIED. (smo, )
June 7, 2006 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from defendant Google Inc forwarded to 9th CCA. by Fedex; RE: Appeal to Circuit Court, 183 Filed on: 6/07/06; Entered on: 6/19/06 (lr, )
June 7, 2006 183 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION NOTICE OF APPEAL AND REPRESENTATION STATEMENT to 9th CCA filed by defendant Google Inc. Appeal of Preliminary Injunction, 161 Filed On: 5/08/06; Entered On: 5/09/06; Filing fee $455; Paid; receipt number 85850. cc: Andrew P. Bridges; Russell J. Frackman, Jeffrey N. Mausner, Daneil J. Cooper, Anthony J. Malutta (lr, )
June 6, 2006 169 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 06-55759, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court 168 filed by Perfect 10 Inc,. (dmap, )
June 5, 2006 179 Featured Case ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz granting defendant Googles APPLICATION for Leave to File portion of ex parte to modify preliminary injunction order and declaration of Radhika Malpani under seal 177 (lc, )
June 5, 2006 174 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying the Preliminary Injunction Order 171 filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (pcl, )
June 2, 2006 178 PROOF OF SERVICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION to modify re Preliminary Injunction, 161 176 , APPLICATION for Leave to File portion of ex parte to modify preliminary injunction order and declaration of Radhika Malpani under seal 177 and supporting documents were served on 6/2/06 by fax and mail filed by defendant Google Inc. (lc, )
June 2, 2006 177 APPLICATION for Leave to File portion of ex parte to modify preliminary injunction order and declaration of Radhika Malpani under seal filed by defendant Google Inc. (lc, )
June 2, 2006 176 EX PARTE APPLICATION to modify Preliminary Injunction 161 ; memorandum filed by defendant Google Inc. (lc, )
June 2, 2006 172 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Radhika Malpani in Support of Google's Ex Parte Application for an Order Modifying the Preliminary Injunction Order Entered 5/9/06 (dw, )
June 2, 2006 171 SEALED DOCUMENT EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying the Preliminary Injunction Order Entered 5/9/06; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Unreadacted version) (dw, ) Modified on 6/12/2006 (dw, ).
May 23, 2006 175 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 4/17/06; Court Reporter: Leslie A. King; Court of Appeals Case Number: 06-55406; Re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 (ghap, )
May 23, 2006 165 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen J. Hillman : Plaintiff has previously indicated that it will not be filing a Motion to Stay Discovery. If Google intends to do so in the near future,it shall advise the court no later than June 1, 2006. If Google does not file a Motion to stay discovery in the near future, the court will proceed with the discovery matter which have previously been taken under submission.Court Reporter: none present. (sbu, )
May 22, 2006 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Appeal to Circuit Court 168 as to Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc; Receipt Number: 85850 in the amount of $455. (lr, )
May 22, 2006 168 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Appeal of Preliminary Injunction, 161 Filed On: 5/8/06; Entered On: 5/9/06; Filing fee $ 455 paid. cc: Jeffrey N. Mausner; Andrew P. Bridges; Mark T. Jansen (dmap, )
May 22, 2006 163 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen J. Hillman, re MOTION for Order for Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories 100 (sbu, )
May 21, 2006 166 RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 4/17/06 Court Reporter: Leslie King (ghap, )
May 19, 2006 164 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen J. Hillman, re MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff MOTION to Compel 109 (sbu, )
May 16, 2006 167 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 4/17/06. Court Reporter: Leslie King. (ghap, )
May 8, 2006 161 Featured Case PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: THE COURT THEREFORE ORDERS AND DECREES AS FOLLOWS: 1) Google is preliminarily enjoined from engaging in the infringing conduct described in the Initial Order. (See document for further information)(dw, )
May 2, 2006 162 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 filed by Perfect 10 Inc, Appeal to Circuit Court 131 filed by Google Inc, CCA # 06-55406, 06-55425. Order received in this district on 05/04/06. These consolidated cases are preliminary injunction appeals. The parties' stipulated motions to amend the briefing schedules are granted. Brief schedule set. (cbr, )
April 18, 2006 157 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to Circuit Court, 131 filed by Google Inc, ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 06-55425. (ghap, )
April 17, 2006 158 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Court issues tentative Preliminary Injunction Order and questions counsel. The parties are to submit via email a red-lined version of the proposed preliminary injunction order. The parties are also advised of the possible retention of a court-appointed special advisor. Court orders the parties to meet and confer regarding a possible stay of discovery and to notify the Court of the outcome of their discussions. As a result of the pending appellate briefing schedule, the Court declines to set any pretrial and trial dates at this time.Court Reporter: Leslie A. King. (smo, )
April 13, 2006 160 REPORT to Court Re Status of (Proposed) Order Re Discovery Motion re MOTION to Compel 96 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
April 11, 2006 159 Google Inc's OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Zada Gutellllzon and Sluman in support of Plaintiffs Reply Brief re Form of Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Google Inc. (shb, )
April 11, 2006 152 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION For Stay of Proceedings Regarding Amazon.Com and A9.Com Only Pending Ruling By Court of Appeals and ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties and finding good cause therefore the Court hereby ORDERS: Discovery, motions, and all other proceedings in the above-entitled consolidated action against Amazon.com and A9.com only (Case 05-4753) shall be stayed until either i) the 9th Circuit issues a decision on Plaintiff's pending appeal from the Court's 2/22/06 order denying Plaintiff's preliminary injunction motion against defendants Amazon.com or ii) a period of 10 months from the date that Plaintiff files it opening brief on appeal whichever comes first. (See document for further information)(dw, )
April 7, 2006 149 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 06-55425, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court, 131 filed by Google Inc. (cbr, )
April 6, 2006 156 REFILING of the DECLARATION of Norman Zada In Support of Perfect 10's Brief Re Form of Preliminary Injunction; Declaration was Previously Filed on 3/20/06 but does not appear on the docket re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 155 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
April 6, 2006 155 REFILING OF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re Form of Preliminary Injunction; Brief was Previously Filed on 3/20/06 But Does not Appear on the Docket filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
April 6, 2006 148 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 filed by Perfect 10 Inc, ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 06-55406. (ghap, )
April 4, 2006 151 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 filed by Perfect 10 Inc, Appeal to Circuit Court, 131 filed by Google Inc, CCA # 06-55406, 06-55425. Order received in this district on 4/6/06. Appeals Number 06-55405, 06-55406, 06-55425 are preliminary injunction appeals. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The court sua sponte consolidates appeal number 06-55405 and 06-55406. Additionally, the court notes that number 06-55425 is a cross-appeal of the same order at issue in number 06-55406. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days of the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an officical transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The brief schedule is set. (ghap, )
April 3, 2006 150 FURTHER JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f)Meeting filed; estimated length of trial 12 to 20 days. (dw, )
March 30, 2006 147 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 06-55406, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 filed by Perfect 10 Inc. (ghap, )
March 30, 2006 146 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz : On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby continues the Further Consolidated Scheduling Conference 121 from 4/3/06 to 4/17/06 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (smo, )
March 27, 2006 145 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 11/7/05; Preliminary Hearing; Court Reporter: Leslie King; Re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 131 . (ghap, )
March 27, 2006 144 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of BOB SLUMAN in support of Perfect 10 Reply Brief regarding form of preliminary injunction. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 143 DECLARATION of OFFIR GUTELZON in support of Perfect 10 Reply Brief regarding form of preliminary injunction 141 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 142 DECLARATION of NORMAN ZADA in support of Perfect 10 BRIEF regarding form of preliminary injunction 141 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 141 REPLY BRIEF of Plaintiff regarding form of preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 140 PROOF OF SERVICE Response to Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Form of Preliminary Injunction (Redacted Version) 137 , Declaration of ANDREW P. BRIDGES in support of Google Response to Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Form of Preliminary Injunction 138 , APPLICATION to File Portions of Goodle Inc Response to Plaintiff Brief regarding form of preliminary injunction and Declarations of Radhika Malpani and Jessie Jiang Under Seal 139 , was served on 3/27/2006 filed by defendant Google Inc. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 139 APPLICATION to File Portions of Goodle Inc Response to Plaintiff Brief regarding form of preliminary injunction and Declarations of Radhika Malpani and Jessie Jiang Under Seal filed by defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order and Under Seal Documents. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 138 DECLARATION of ANDREW P. BRIDGES in support of Google Response to Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Form of Preliminary Injunction 137 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 137 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Form of Preliminary Injunction (Redacted Version) filed by Defendant Google Inc. (jp, )
March 27, 2006 136 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Jessie Jiang In Support of Google's Response to Plaintiff's Brief Re Form of Preliminary Injunction (dw, ) Modified on 3/29/2006 (dw, ).
March 27, 2006 135 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Rahika Malpani in Support of Google's Response to Plaintiff's Brief Re Form of Preliminary Injunction (dw, ) Modified on 3/29/2006 (dw, ).
March 27, 2006 134 SEALED DOCUMENT RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Brief Re Form of Preliminary Injunction (Unredacted Version) (dw, ) Modified on 3/29/2006 (dw, ).
March 27, 2006 133 Featured Case ORDER Granting Application to File Declarations of Radhika Malpani and Jessie Jiang and Portions of Goodle Inc's Response to Plaintiff's Brief Re Form of Preliminary Injunction Under Seal by Judge A Howard Matz: GRANTED. (dw, ) Modified on 3/28/2006 (dw, ).
March 24, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to Circuit Court 131 . (cbr, )
March 22, 2006 132 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 11/7/05; Court Reporter: Leslie A. King; Re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 . (ghap, )
March 22, 2006 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from defendant Google Inc forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to Circuit Court 131 . (cbr, )
March 22, 2006 131 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL/Representation Statement to 9th CCA filed by defendant Google Inc. Appeal of Order 119 Filed On: 02/17/06; Entered On: 02/21/06. Filing fee $255, Paid, receipt number 83451. cc: Andrew P. Bridges; Russell J. Frackman; Jeffrey N. Mausner; Daniel J. Cooper; Anthony J. Malutta. (cbr, ) Modified on 3/24/2006 (cbr, ).
March 22, 2006 130 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: EXHIBITS A THROUGH C to the Declaration of Heraldo Botelho In Support of Memorandum in Support of Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to 2/21/06 Order (dw, )
March 22, 2006 129 Featured Case ORDER Granting Application to File Exhibits to the Declaration of Heraldo Botelho In Support of Memorandum in Support of Google's Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to 2/21/06 Order Under Seal by Judge A. Howard Matz: GRANTED. re APPLICATION to Seal 124 (dw, )
March 22, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 . (ghap, )
March 20, 2006 154 DECLARATION of Norman Zada in Support of Perfect 10's Brief re Form of Preliminary Injunction 153 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 153 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF Re Form of Preliminiary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 128 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Inc, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 125 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 126 , Declaration (Motion related) 127 , was served on 3/20/06. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 127 DECLARATION of Andrew P Bridges In Support of Google's Memorandum in Support of Google's Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to 2/21/06 Order re APPLICATION to Seal 124 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 126 DECLARATION of Heraldo Botelho In Support of Goodle's Memorandum In Support of Google's Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to 2/21/06 Order. re APPLICATION to Seal 124 Exhibits A through C Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order Entered 12/27/05 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 125 MEMORANDUM in Support of Google Inc's Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to 2/21/06 Order APPLICATION to Seal 124 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 124 APPLICATION to File Exhibits to the Declaration of Heraldo Botelho in Support of Memorandum in Support of Google's Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to 2/21/06 Order Under Seal filed by Defendant Google Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (dw, )
March 20, 2006 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to Circuit Court, 123 . (ghap, )
March 20, 2006 123 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION NOTICE OF APPEAL AND REPRESENTATION STATEMENT to 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Appeal of Order, 119 Filed On: 2/17/06; Entered On: 2/21/06; Filing fee $255, Paid receipt number 83391. cc: Jeffrey N. Mausner; Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp; Daniel J. Cooper; Winston and Strawn, San Fransisco, California; Winston and Strawn, Los Angeles, Califronia; Townsend and Townsend and Crew. (ghap, ) Modified on 3/21/2006 (ghap, ).
March 8, 2006 122 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Proposed Preliminary Injunction. (jp, )
February 24, 2006 ***Terminated all old scheduling deadlines and hearings. (smo, )
February 24, 2006 121 Featured Case ORDER SETTING FURTHER RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge A. Howard Matz: The conference will be held pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) to disclose information (without awaiting a discovery request) and under R. 26(f) to confer on a discovery plan not later than twenty-one (21) days prior to the scheduling conference and to file a report with the Court entitled "Further Joint Rule 26(f) Report" not later than fourteen (14) days after they confer. Further Joint Rule 26 Report due by 3/27/06. Further Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/06 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge A. Howard Matz.(smo, )
February 21, 2006 120 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Court DENIES Perfect 10's motion for preliminary injunction against Amazon. RE: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 Court Reporter: N/A. (dw, )
February 17, 2006 119 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying In Part Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Google by Judge A. Howard Matz: Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Perfect 10's motion for a preliminary injunction aginst Google. re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 (dw, )
February 13, 2006 118 SEALED DOCUMENT RE REVISED JOINT STIPULATION Re Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents After Second Set of Conferences of Counsel Filed Pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman (dw, ) Modified on 2/21/2006 (dw, ).
February 13, 2006 117 SEALED DOCUMENT re: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS of Radhika Malpani, Lawrence You, and Jennifer A Golinveaux In Support of Opposition to Revised Motions to Compel to Produce Documents and to Answer Interrogatories Filed Pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman (dw, ) Modified on 2/21/2006 (dw, ). Modified on 2/21/2006 (dw, ).
February 13, 2006 116 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Spreadsheets (Exhibits 1-5) for Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories re MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 109 (dw, ) Modified on 2/21/2006 (dw, ).
February 13, 2006 115 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Inc, re MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff MOTION to Compel 109 , Declaration (Motion related) 110 , Motion Related Document 113 , Declaration (Motion related) 114 , was served on 2/13/06. (dw, )
February 13, 2006 114 DECLARATION of Andrew P Bridges In Support of Google's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories re: MOTION to Compel 109 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
February 13, 2006 113 JOINT STIPULATION Re Google's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories 109 filed by Defendant Perfect 10 Inc, Google Inc. (dw, )
February 13, 2006 112 NOTICE that Revised Joint Stipulation Re Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion to Compel Defendant Google Inc to Produce Documents After Second Set of Conferences of Counsel Filed Pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman is Being Filed Under Seal Pursuant to the Request of Defendant Google Inc filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
February 13, 2006 111 DECLARATION of Norman Zada and Jeffrey N Mausner In Support of Perfect 10's Motion to Compel Google to Produce Documents Filed With Revised Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman re MOTION to Compel 96 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
February 13, 2006 110 DECLARATION of Susan E Lee In Support of Google's MOTION to Compel Producito of Documents and Respones to Interrogatories 109 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
February 13, 2006 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories of Plaintiff, filed by Defendant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/13/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (dw, )
February 9, 2006 108 DECLARATION of Jennifer A Golinveaux, Radhika Malpani, and Diane Tang In Support of Google Inc's to Answer Interrogatories Filed Pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman re MOTION for Order for Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories 100 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
February 9, 2006 107 DECLARATION of Norman Zada and Jeffrey N. Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's MOTION Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories 100 Filed With Revised Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
February 9, 2006 106 REVISED JOINT STIPULATION Re Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion to Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories filed pursuant to Order of Judge Hillman filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
February 1, 2006 105 NOTICE of Appearance of Mark T Jansen and Anthony J Malutta filed by Defendants Amazon.Com Inc and A9.Com Inc. (dw, )
January 27, 2006 104 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Stephen J. Hillman :, Resetting Hearing as to MOTION to Compel 96 , MOTION for Order for Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories 100 Motion set for hearing on 2/21/2006 and 2/22/2006 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman.Court Reporter: none present. (sbu, )
January 5, 2006 95 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz : On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby vacates the 1/10/06 Further Consolidated Scheduling Conference. The Court will reset the scheduling conference after it rules on the pending preliminary injunction motions.Court Reporter: Not Reported. (smo, )
January 3, 2006 103 JOINT STIPULATION Re Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc's Motion to Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answers Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, and Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
January 3, 2006 102 DECLARATION of Jennifer A Golinveaux In Support of Google Inc's Opposition to Perfect 10's MOTION to Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories 100 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
January 3, 2006 101 DECLARATION of Norman Zada and Jeffrey N Mausner in Support of Perfect 10's MOTION to Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories 100 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
January 3, 2006 100 NOTICE OF MOTION to Compel Defendant Google Inc to Answer Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (dw, )
December 28, 2005 99 DECLARATION of NORMAN ZADA in support of MOTION to Compel Goodgle Inc to Produce Documents 96 filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp, )
December 28, 2005 98 DECLARATION of JENNIFER A. GOLINVEAUX in support of Opposition to MOTION to Compel Goodgle Inc to Produce Documents 96 filed by plaintiff Google Inc. (jp, ) Modified on 1/6/2006 (jp, ).
December 28, 2005 97 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff MOTION to Compel Defendant Goodgle Inc to Produce Documents 96 filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (jp, )
December 28, 2005 96 DISCOVERY MOTION: NOTICE OF MOTION to Compel Goodgle Inc to Produce Documents; Joint Stipulation; Declarations of Norman Zada; Jennifer Golinveaux filed by plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (jp, )
December 27, 2005 94 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Stephen J. Hillman: IT IS SO ORDERED. (See Document for further information)(dw, )
December 27, 2005 93 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen J. Hillman : Following oral argument on 12-21-05, the court now rules on Google's Motion for entry of Protective Order. Defendant Amzon hhas joinded in defendant Google's Motion papers, and oral argument, though Amazon has not filed otion papers on its own. Accordingly, the court enters plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order.Tape #: 05-51. (sbu, )
November 29, 2005 92 MINUTES OF (In Chambers) by Judge A. Howard Matz: On the Court's own motion the Court hereby continues the Further Consolidated Scheduling Conference to 1/10/2006 01:30 PM.Court Reporter: Not Reported. (dw, )
November 22, 2005 91 JOINT STIPULATION RE: re MOTION for its Protective Order 90 filed by defendant and counterclaimant Google Inc, Google Inc. (ca, )
November 22, 2005 90 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order filed by defendant and counterclaimant Google Inc, Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2005 at 2:00 PM before Honorable A. Howard Matz. (ca, )
November 18, 2005 88 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 11/7/05. Court Reporter: Leslie A. King. (mo, )
November 18, 2005 87 RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 11/7/05 Court Reporter: Leslie A. King (mo, )
November 17, 2005 86 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz : On the Court's own motion, the Court hereby continues the Further Consolidated Scheduling Conference 35 from 11/21/05 to 12/12/05 at 1:30 p.m. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/5/2005. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (smo, )
November 9, 2005 85 EVIDENTIARY CITATIONS SUBMITTED BY Plaintiff Perfect 10, Inc. In Response to Court's Questions at Hearing On Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc 74 (yl, )
November 9, 2005 82 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Document No. 81, Stipulation for Protective Order was erroneously docketed to CV04-09484 AHM (SHx) Re: Stipulation and Order, Protective Order 81 (dw, )
November 8, 2005 89 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF Electronic Frontier Foundation (yl, )
November 8, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Proof of Service submitted by Defendant Google Inc. Service on 11/6/05 (dw, )
November 8, 2005 83 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz ORDERING 1) Proposed Sur-Reply Declaration of Alexander MacGillivray ; 2) Proof of Service by E Mail 3) Proof of Service by Hand delivery submitted by Defendant Google Inc received on 11/7/05 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(dw, )
November 8, 2005 81 Featured Case STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Robert J. Kelleher: Having reviewed the terms of the foregoing Stipulation and finding that good cause exists for said Protective Order requested IT IS SO ORDERED. (dw, )
November 7, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [proposed] surreply declaration of Jennifer A Golinveaux in support of oppositon to motion for preliminary injunction submitted by Defendant Google Inc. (yl, )
November 7, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [proposed] surreply memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction submitted by Defendant Google Inc. (yl, )
November 7, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [proposed] Order Granting Google's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Sur Reply Papers submitted by Defendant Google Inc. (yl, )
November 7, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [Proposed] Order Granting Electronic Frontier Foundation Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae submitted by Amicus Curiae (yl, )
November 7, 2005 84 OPPOSITION to Google's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply And Supporting Declarations In Opposition to Perfect 10's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 79 ; Declaration of Norman Zada filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
November 7, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Proof of Service submitted by Defendant Google Inc. Service on 11/7/05 (dw, )
November 7, 2005 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [Proposed] Sur-Reply Declaration of Alexander MacGillivray In Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction submitted by Defendant Google Inc. (dw, )
November 7, 2005 74 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge A. Howard Matz : Court issues draft outline and questions counsel. For reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS Electronic Frontier Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae and DENIES Defendant's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Norman Zada. Court also GRANTS the request for judicial notice and DENIES the Ex Parte Application to File a Sur-Reply. The proposed Sur-Reply will be stamped "PLACED IN FILE NOT USED." Court takes UNDER SUBMISSION both of Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction.Court Reporter: Leslie A. King. (smo, )
November 4, 2005 80 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Inc, re Response (non-motion) 75 , Declaration (non-motion) 76 , Response (non-motion) 77 , Response (non-motion) 78 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Support of Google's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 79 , was served on 11/4/05. (shb, )
November 4, 2005 79 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Support of Google's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Google Inc. (shb, )
November 4, 2005 78 RESPONSE to evidentiary Objections of Percect 10, Inc to the Declaration of Alexander MacGillivray filed by Defendant Google Inc (shb, )
November 4, 2005 77 RESPONSE to Evidentiary Objections of Percect 10, Incv to the Declaration of John R Levine filed by Defendant Google Inc (shb, )
November 4, 2005 76 DECLARATION of Susan E Lee in support of Google's Response to Objections to Lee Declaration filed by Defendant Google Inc. (shb, )
November 4, 2005 75 RESPONSE to Evidentiary Objections of Perfect 10, Inc to the Declaration of Andrew Bridges filed by Defendant Google Inc (shb, )
November 4, 2005 73 RESPONSE to Perfect 10's Objections to Declaration of Susan E Lee in support of Opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (shb, )
November 1, 2005 72 NOTICE of Filing Original Proofs of Service filed by Defendant Google Inc, re Notice (Other) 70 , was served on 10/31/05. (dw, )
October 31, 2005 71 REPLY to response to MOTION to Strike Declaration of Norman Zada 24 39 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (shb, )
October 28, 2005 70 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO CROSS-EXAME DECLARANT NOTMAN ZADA filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc, Google Inc. (shb, )
October 24, 2005 69 DECLARATION of Elena Segal In Opposition to Motion of Electronic Frontier Foundation For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae re MOTION for Leave 50 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 24, 2005 68 MEMORANDUM Of Points and Authorities of Plaintiff Perfect 10 in Opposition to Motion of Electronic Frontier Foundation for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae re MOTION 50 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 21, 2005 67 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Dr. Norman Zada (Motion related) 24 39 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (yl, )
October 20, 2005 66 NOTICE of Appearance of James G> Gilliland Jr. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Re Reply Documents in Support of Motion of Perfect 10 Inc for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc, re Response in Opposition to Motion 57 , Response in Opposition to Motion 61 , Response in Opposition to Motion 62 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 63 , Declaration (Motion related) 64 , Declaration (Motion related) 58 , Declaration (Motion related) 59 , Response in Opposition to Motion 60 , was served on 10/17/05. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 64 DECLARATION of Allen Wang In Support of Perfect 10's Reply Re: Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 63 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 62 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS of Perfect 10 Inc to the Declaration of John R. Levine to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 61 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS of Perfect 10 Inc to the Declaration of Susan E Lee Re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 60 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS Of Perfect 10 to the Declaration of Andrew Bridges to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 59 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D Goldman In Support of MOTION of Plaintiff Perfect 20 Inc for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 58 REPLY DECLARATION of Norman Zada In Support of MOTION Of Plaintiff Perfect 20 Inc for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 57 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS of Perfect 10 Inc to the Declaration of Alexander MacGillivray re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Plaintiff Perfect 10 Inc. (dw, )
October 17, 2005 55 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen J. Hillman : Telephonic argument held. Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. However plaintiff's counsel is expected to be as prepared as possible for discovery meet and confer sessions, so that Dr. Zada's participation is kept to a minimum.Tape #: 05-38. (sbu, )
October 14, 2005 56 CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation (dw, )
October 14, 2005 49 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Ordering the Notice of Moiton of Electronic Frontier Foundation For Leave to File Amicus Curiae; Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae; Declaration of Jason M Schultz in Support; Proposed Order Brief Amicus Curiae; Proof of received 10/13/05 is to be filed and processed. Filing date is ORDERED to be the date the doucment was stamped received but not filed with the Clerk. processed. (dw, )
October 13, 2005 53 PROOF OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion of Electronic Forntier Foundation for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae (See document for additional documents served) filed by Amicus Curiae was served on 10/13/05. (dw, )
October 13, 2005 52 DECLARATION of Jason M Schultz In Support of MOTION of Electronic Frontier Foundation For Leave to File Amicus Curiae 50 filed by Amicus Curiae, Electronic Frontier Foundation (dw, )
October 13, 2005 51 NOTICE OF MOTION of Electronic Frontier Foundation for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae re MOTION for Leave 50 (dw, )
October 13, 2005 50 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (dw, )
October 13, 2005 48 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: Ordering Motion of Amicus Curiae For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brie; Declaration of Jason Chulty In Support of Service; Brif Amicus Curiae filed by (Filer not specified) to be rejected and not filed and is ORDERED returned to Counsel. Reason for rejection: Local Rule 6.1 Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect; Other: Court requires 14 Point Font Size(dw, )
October 11, 2005 54 PROOF OF SERVICE re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 22 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (See document for additional documents served) (dw, )
September 28, 2005 41 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz ORDERING Defendants' Motion to Strike Declaration, Declaration of Norman Zada submitted by Defendant Google Inc received on 9/26/05 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(dw, )
September 28, 2005 40 NOTICE OF MOTION to Strike Declaration of Norman Zada re MOTION to Strike Declaration 39 filed by Defendant Google Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable A. Howard Matz. (dw, )
September 28, 2005 38