Fatima Rita Dos Santos Fahmy v. Stephen Grahm Hogge et al Featured Case

Defendant: Stephen Graham Hogge and Does
Plaintiff: Fatima Rita Dos Santos Fahmy
Case Number: 2:2008cv01152
Filed: February 20, 2008
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Philip S. Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2008 1
COMPLAINT against Defendants Stephen Graham Hogge, Does 1-3. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Fatima Rita Dos Santos Fahmy. (et)
October 7, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES: (In Chambers) Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Lift Sanction imposed on August 13, 2008 35 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ir)
October 14, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES: (In Chambers) Defendant's Motion to Reconsider 34 37 is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED for lack of personal jurisdiction IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (ir)
January 2, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez:Plaintiffs Motion for Relief from the Courts order of dismissal is DENIED 52 . The evidentiary hearing set for January 5, 2009 is cancelled. (lc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fatima Rita Dos Santos Fahmy v. Stephen Grahm Hogge et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Graham Hogge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Rita Dos Santos Fahmy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]