Joe Satriani v. Christopher Martin et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Joe Satriani
Defendant: Christopher Martin, Jonathan Buckland, Guy Berryman, William Champion and Capitol Records
Case Number: 2:2008cv07987
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2009 25 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 ORDER) (lc) mailed copy to copyright office; Modified on 9/14/2009 (lc).
September 14, 2009 24 Featured Case ORDER upon Stipulation dismiss action pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) with prejudice; each party bears own costs 23 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
September 9, 2009 23 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Christopher Martin, Jonathan Buckland, Guy Berryman, William Champion, Capitol Records. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order For Dismissal With Prejudice)(Steinberg, David)
September 4, 2009 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: stipulation to dismiss case in which answers are on file, FRCP cite is incomplete, however case has Pending Court hearings therefore, a formal proposed order is required, which should have been submitted as a separate attachment to main document. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case 21 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc)
September 3, 2009 21 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) filed by Defendants Christopher Martin, Jonathan Buckland, Guy Berryman, William Champion, Capitol Records.(Steinberg, David)
July 16, 2009 20 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to FRCP 16(b): Counsel must agree on date for the disclosure of expert witness reports pursuant to FRCP 26(a)2; Discovery cut-off: 1/29/10; Last day to file Motions: 3/1/10; Final Pretrial Conference: 5/10/10 4:00 PM; Jury Trial: 5/8/10 9:00 AM; by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
July 14, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson Approving the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3) requiring the parties to appear before a retired judicial officer or other private or non-profit dispute resolution body. (lc)
July 6, 2009 18 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court and counsel confer re case status. Court sets trial dates. (Refer to the SCHEDULING ORDER to be issued hereafter.)Court Reporter: none. (lc)
May 28, 2009 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Wrong event: misc(report); Correct Specific Event: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan RE: Report 16 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc)
May 27, 2009 16 JOINT REPORT of FRCP 26(f) Conference of Counsel and Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. (Miller, Seth)
April 27, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The conference will be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than twenty-one (21) days prior to the scheduling conference and file a report with the Court entitled "Rule 26(f) Report", not later than fourteen (14) days after they confer as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2009 at 03:30 PM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson.) (sch)
April 6, 2009 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Capitol Records.(Frackman, Russell)
April 6, 2009 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Christopher Martin, Jonathan Buckland, Guy Berryman, William Champion.(Frackman, Russell)
February 20, 2009 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Capitol Records' Request To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint 10 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. For good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Capitol Records has up to and including 4/6/2009 to file its response to the Complaint. (sch)
February 19, 2009 11 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capitol Records, identifying Maltby Investments Limited, Capitol Records, LLC. (Steinberg, David)
February 19, 2009 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 4/6/09 re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Capitol Records. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Grantin Capitol Records' Request To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint)(Steinberg, David)
February 9, 2009 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. upon Christopher Martin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Russell J. Frackman, Esq.. (King, Howard)
February 9, 2009 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. upon William Champion waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Russell J. Frackman, Esq.. (King, Howard)
February 9, 2009 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. upon Jonathan Buckland waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Russell J. Frackman, Esq.. (King, Howard)
February 9, 2009 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. upon Guy Berryman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Russell J. Frackman, Esq.. (King, Howard)
December 30, 2008 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. upon Capitol Records waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/18/2008, answer due 2/17/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Alasdair McMullan. (King, Howard)
December 9, 2008 4 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D Pregerson. Counsel are referred to the courts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear motion date with court clerk prior to filing the motion. Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 AM. The Court requires non-blue backed courtesy copies of only the following manual and electronic filed documents: (1) All noticed motions and related documents; and (2) All ex parte applications and related documents. Said courtesy copies are to be delivered directly to Room 244-J. (lc)
December 4, 2008 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Joe Satriani. (et)
December 4, 2008 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. (et) (ds).
December 4, 2008 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Christopher Martin, Jonathan Buckland, Guy Berryman, William Champion, Capitol Records. (et)
December 4, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Christopher Martin, Jonathan Buckland, Guy Berryman, William Champion, Capitol Records. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Joe Satriani. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Satriani v. Christopher Martin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Satriani
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Buckland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Berryman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Champion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Records
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]