American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv01734
Filed: March 12, 2009
 
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: XX US, Outside California
Presiding Judge: Wu
Referring Judge: Zarefsky
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court notifies the parties that the CM/ECF electronic filing system will be unavailable from 7:00 AM., on Saturday, February 13, 2010 until midnight on Monday, February 15, 2010. (See attached Minute O rder for further information). Because the Court will be unable to access these documents electronically over the weekend, the Court ORDERS the parties to submit paper copies of these documents to chambers by noon on Friday, February 12, 2010. The Court will refuse to consider any filings not so submitted. (jp)
June 30, 2010 179 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge A. Howard Matz. (se)
June 30, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge A. Howard Matz: the Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Report setting forth the status of their efforts and their positions and proposals as to Phase Two. The Report shall be filed by not later than August 9, 2010. (se)
October 12, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court will not be able to preside over trial in this case on the scheduled date of December 6, 2011, and orders the parties to meet and confer and propose a trial date not earlier than mid-April of 2012. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than Monday, October 24, 2011. (jp)
March 5, 2012 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz: The Court prefers that the declarations of declarants from Phase I whose testimony will be proffered in Phase II be refiled. The presumptive trial schedule will be 9:00 a.m. to no on and 1:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. on any given day. Plaintiff's forthcoming motion regarding the precise dates for which interest on costs that are awarded would accrue must be filed by 3/9/2012. The opposition thereto must be filed by 3/16/2012 and any reply by 3/19/2012. Thereafter, the Court will take the matter under submission. Plaintiff's other forthcoming motion regarding whether AISLIC recovers for payments made to the water purveyors must be filed by 3/12/2012. The opposition thereto must be filed by 3/19/2012 and any reply by 3/22/2012. Again, the Court will take the motion under submission. Court Reporter: C Nirenberg. (jp)
March 16, 2012 257 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: Within one hour, the parties are to file separately a list containing (1) the names ofthe witnesses they intend to rely on at trial, and (2) the sequence in which they intend tocall the witnesses. The Court requires updated lists in light of that fact that many issueswere resolved at the March 5 Final Pretrial Conference. (smo)
January 9, 2013 319 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (ALLOCATION PHASE; POST-TRIAL) signed by Judge A. Howard Matz. AISLIC is entitled to and hereby is GRANTED a declaratory judgment that the United States shall pay it $3,314,794 for Past Response Costs. A ISLIC is entitled to and hereby is GRANTED a declaratory judgment that 40% of its future necessary response costs at or for the Bermite Site that are consistent with the NCP will be allocated to the United States and shall be paid by the United States. See document for details. Partial judgment shall be entered in accordance with this ruling. AISLIC is ORDERED to file a "[Proposed] Partial Judgment" containing the agreed-to calculation of prejudgment interest by not later than January 30, 2013. (smo)
January 31, 2013 321 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge A. Howard Matz, in favor of American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company against United States of America. The United States shall pay to AISLIC $3,314,794 as its share of Past Costs. The United States shall pay AISLIC $174,215 in prejudgment interest for the United States' share of Past Costs. See Judgment for additional terms. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (kbr)
July 7, 2014 377 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King. IT IS AGREED AND ORDERED that: This Agreement applies to, is binding upon, and inures to the benefit of AISLIC and the United States. Within ninety (90) days after the Effective Date of this Agreement, t he United States will pay $2,034,958.82 to AISLIC. If the Past Cost Payment is not made in full within ninety (90) days after the Effective Date of this Agreement, then interest on the unpaid balance shall be paid commencing on the 91st day after the Effective Date. Upon the Court's approval of this Agreement, all claims brought by AISLIC against the United States in the Consolidated Actions shall be dismissed with prejudice. Each Party shall bear its own litigation and administrative costs and expenses, including attorneys' fees. Related to: Order 376 . (See attached document for details.) (lom)
August 12, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz: Court ORDERS Plaintiff to notify the Court whether the Bingham McCutchen firm represents any party still actively involved in this case, and to do so by 8/17/2009. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Adam Joshua Katz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Philip Barron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]