Zynga Inc. v. Playerauctions.com Featured Case

Defendant: Playerauctions.com
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02576
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2011 25 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: Stipulation for Protective Order 24 . [SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS] (hr)
April 11, 2011 24 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Player Auctions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Protective Order)(Newman, Brian)
April 6, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue 22 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. It is Ordered: The fact discovery cut-off currently scheduled for June 30, 2011 is hereby continued until August 29, 2011; The expert discovery cut-off currently scheduled for August 30, 2011 is hereby continued until October 28, 2011; The motion hearing cut-off currently scheduled for October 24, 2011 at 10:00 A.M is hereby continued until January 9,2012 at 10:00 A.M.; The pretrial conference currently scheduled for November 14, 2011 at 2:30 P.M. is hereby continued until February 6, 2012 at 2:30 P.M.; The 3-5 day jury trial currently scheduled for December 13, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. is hereby continued until March 6, 2012 at 10:00 A.M. (lom)
April 5, 2011 22 Joint Stipulation to Continue Discovery Cut-Off, Motion Hearing Cut-Off, Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 19 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caplan, David)
December 27, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3) requiring the parties to appear before a retired judicial officer or other private or non-profit dispute resolution body. (mg)
December 22, 2010 20 NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3); parties request to appear before a retired judicial officer or other dispute resolution body for mediation type settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caplan, David)
December 16, 2010 19 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) all fact discovery shall be completed on or before June 30, 2011; (2) all expert discovery shall be completed on or before July 30, 2011; (3) settlement conference shall be held on or before Aug. 30, 2011; (4) motions shall be set for oral argument on or before Oct. 24, 2011 at 10:00 A.M.; (5) Pre Trial Conference is set on Nov. 14, 2011 at 2:30 P.M.; (6) 3-5 day Jury Trial is set on Dec. 13, 2011 at 10:00 A.M.; (7) all motions to amend pleadings shall be filed on or before Jan. 4, 2011; and (8) ADR-01 Form (Settlement Procedure Selection: Request and Notice) shall be filed on or before Dec. 27, 2010. (lom)
December 9, 2010 18 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Oren Bitan counsel for Defendant Player Auctions, LLC.Oren Bitan is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Dedendant Player Auctions, LLC (Bitan, Oren)
December 3, 2010 17 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set on Dec. 6, 2010 is taken off calendar. (jl)
December 1, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 15 Request to Substitute Attorney Brian H. Newman as attorney of record in place and stead of Record of Attorneys Bernard LeSage and Oren Bitan. (lom)
November 24, 2010 15 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Brian H. Newman in place of attorney Bernard LeSage filed by defendant Player Auctions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Request For Approval Of Substitution Of Attorney)(Newman, Brian)
November 24, 2010 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian H Newman counsel for Defendant Player Auctions, LLC. Changing firm name to Dykema Gossett, LLC, 333 So. Grand Avenue, #2100, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing e-mail to bnewman@dykema.com. Adding Brian H. Newman as attorney as counsel of record for Player Auctions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Player Auctions, LLP (Newman, Brian)
November 23, 2010 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 Court Days, filed by Plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc... (Caplan, David)
October 21, 2010 12 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. On the Court's own motion, Scheduling Conference is hereby continued to Dec. 6, 2010 at 11:00 A.M. (lom)
September 30, 2010 11 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS re Scheduling Conference by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. On the Courts o wn motion, this case is set for a Scheduling Conference on Nov. 29, 2010 at11:00 A. M. pursuant to FRCP 16(b). Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Counsel shall file a Rule 26(f) discovery plan within 14 days after the conference of counsel. The Rule 26(f) discovery plan shall contain the following information: 1. A brief description of the nature of the case and type of action filed and the date filed in the District Court; 2. The number of depositions to be taken by each side and the date the date the depositions are set; 3. The written discovery sought and date responses to interrogatories requests for production and requests for admissions are due; 4. The number of experts expected to be called by each side and the expert's area of expertise; 5. Proposed Pre Trial Conference date; 6. Date Demand for Jury Trial was filed; 7. Prospects of Settlement; 8. Positions of counsel re: consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge; 9. A list of contemplated motions, including what type of motion, a tentative hearing date, and whether discovery must be conducted prior to the filing of the motions. (lom)
September 29, 2010 10 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Player Auctions, LLC, identifying 1. Zynga Game Network, Inc. (Plaintiff) 2. Player Auctions, LLC (Defendant).. (Newman, Brian)
September 29, 2010 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 7 filed by Defendant Player Auctions, LLC.(Newman, Brian)
September 27, 2010 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc., upon Defendant Player Auctions, LLC served on 9/8/2010, answer due 9/29/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashley McDonald, Person in Charge at Buchalter et al., Counsel for Player Auctions, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Wilson, Dennis)
September 8, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint 7 as to Defendant Player Auctions, LLC. (lom)
September 8, 2010 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1 ; Deand for Jury Trial against Defendants Player Auctions, LLC filed by Plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc. (lom) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2010: # 1 Summons Issued) (lom).
July 26, 2010 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc., upon Defendant Playerauctions.com served on 7/25/2010, answer due 8/15/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tilak Thanam, UPS Clerk/Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Wilson, Dennis)
April 9, 2010 5 Featured Case STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. This action has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable Consuelo B. Marshall. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California and comply with these rules. This Order controls the procedures used in this case. See Item 7, regarding Motions: Motions shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules 6 and 7. Local Rule 6-1 provides: "The notice of motion shall be filed with the Clerk not later than twenty-eight (28) days before the date set for hearing, and shall be served on each of the parties electronically or, if excepted from electronic filing, either by deposit in the mail or by personal service." This Court typically hears motions on Mondays, beginning at 10:00 a.m. The briefing schedule for the motion shall be governed by Local Rules 6 and 7. (Refer attached Order for other requirements.) (lom)
April 8, 2010 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Zynga Game Network Inc. (car)
April 8, 2010 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Zynga Game Network Inc. (car) Modified on 4/9/2010 (car).
April 8, 2010 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc. (car) (ds).
April 8, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Playerauctions.com. (car)
April 8, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Playerauctions.com. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Zynga Game Network Inc. (car) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Inc. v. Playerauctions.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playerauctions.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network Inc.
Represented By: David K Caplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]