Wedgewood Investment Pool LLC v. Ricardo Vasquez et al

Plaintiff: Wedgewood Investment Pool LLC
Defendant: Ricardo Vasquez, Does and Maripaz Vasquez
Case Number: 2:2011cv03218
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Referring Judge: Victor B. Kenton
Nature of Suit: Economic Stabilization Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dale S. Fischer:, ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer remanding case to Superior Court for the State of California, Southeast District, Downey, Case number 10CO4562. The Court agrees with Plaintiffs counsel that attorneys fees are appropriate for the reasons stated in the Ex Parte Application. Both the amount of time spent and the hourly rate sought are reasonable. The Court awards fees of $2370. The Court imposes sanctions of $500, payable to the clerk of the court. Both the attorneys fees and sanctions are ordered to be paid no later than May 11, 2011. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal Letter) (shb)
January 13, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, in favor of Wedgewood Investment Pool LLC against Maripaz Vasquez, Ricardo Vasquez Related to: Request for Attorneys Fees 22 . IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Douglas E. Klein shall payWedgewood Investmen t Pool, LLC the amount of $2,370.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Wedgewood Investment Pool, LLC, shall recover post-judgment interest at the legal rate, as provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a), from May 9, 2011 until paid. (shb)
April 19, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO STATE COURT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Defendants shall file their response no later than 4/27/2011. Court Reporter: Not Reporter. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedgewood Investment Pool LLC v. Ricardo Vasquez et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wedgewood Investment Pool LLC
Represented By: Sam Chandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Vasquez
Represented By: Douglas E Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maripaz Vasquez
Represented By: Douglas E Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]