Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC et al v. KTS Karaoke, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Sony/Atv Songs LLC and Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC
Defendant: Timmy Sun Ton and KTS Karaoke, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv03986
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 33 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney James C Bradshaw, III for Defendants KTS Karaoke, Inc., Timmy Sun Ton. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
May 8, 2012 32 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Timothy L Warnock for Plaintiffs Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Sony/Atv Songs LLC. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
May 8, 2012 31 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Howell G O'Rear for Plaintiffs Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Sony/Atv Songs LLC. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
May 8, 2012 30 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap)
May 8, 2012 29 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO 120, # 2 AO-121) (ghap)
May 8, 2012 28 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:12-CV-00089 TJC JEG from USDC, Middle District of Tennessee (Nashville).The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the Civil Case Number: CV 12-3986 GAF (MANx). (Attachments: # 1 CV-18)(ghap)
May 8, 2012 27 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Tennessee Middle
April 16, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, and Defendant's Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. This action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California as related to the pending case of KTS Karaoke, Inc. v. Sony/ATV Music Publishing, LLC, Case No. CV12-0014. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/16/12. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
April 16, 2012 25 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/16/12. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
April 11, 2012 24 DECLARATION of M. Danton Richardson filed by KTS Karaoke, Inc., Timmy Sun Ton re: 23 REPLY to RESPONSE to the 9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit search results)(Bradshaw, James) Modified Text on 4/12/2012 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
April 11, 2012 23 REPLY to RESPONSE to the 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California filed by KTS Karaoke, Inc., Timmy Sun Ton. (Bradshaw, James) Modified Text on 4/12/2012 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
April 2, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/26/2012. Pending before the Court is the defendants' motion to dismiss or to transfer 9 , along with the plaintiffs' response. The defendants shall have until 4/11/2012, to file a reply to the plaintiffs' response, if necessary. Counsel for the parties shall notify the office of the Magistrate Judge upon the resolution of the defendants' pending motion to dismiss or to transfer so that a case management conference can be expeditiously scheduled. The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to Chief Judge Campbell for his consideration of the defendants' pending motion to dismiss or to transfer and accompanying filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/2/12. (dt) Modified on 4/2/2012 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
April 2, 2012 21 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 8/15/2012. Discovery due by 3/29/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/2/12. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 30, 2012 20 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Joint - Revised) filed by All Parties. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 26, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/26/2012; ORDER to enter. (Tape #G2012-042, 043.) (jwc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 23, 2012 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Parties. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 23, 2012 18 DECLARATION of Seth M. McInteer filed by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC re: 14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - order confirmation, # 2 Exhibit B - returns and exchange policy email, # 3 Exhibit C - UPS delivery confirmation, # 4 Exhibit D - copy of shipping label)(Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 23, 2012 17 DECLARATION of Jonas Kant filed by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC re: 14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 23, 2012 16 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Smarr filed by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC re: 14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 23, 2012 15 DECLARATION of Timothy L. Warnock filed by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC re: 14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence dated December 23, 2011, # 2 Exhibit B -Copies of purchase and shipping documents, # 3 Exhibit C - Webpage printed from www.ktskaraoke.com)(Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 23, 2012 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California filed by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order for Preliminary Injunction and Recall, # 2 Exhibit B - KTS Karaoke, Inc. and Timmy Sun Ton's Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 3 Attachment Unreported cases)(Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 19, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California. Plaintiff shall have until 3/23/12, to file a Response. Defendant shall have until 4/11/2012, to file any Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/19/12. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 19, 2012 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California (Uncontested) by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 6, 2012 Note to Filer, James Bradshaw, re DE#9: This document is a scanned document;scanning should only be used for documents not created on your computer. This document does not need to be re-filed unless otherwise directed by the Court. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 6, 2012 NOTICE TO COUNSEL M. Danton Richardson, Surjit P. Soni and Leo E. Lundberg, JR.: WITHIN 20 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00, per attorney, (LR 83.01(d)). (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 6, 2012 Bar status for attorneys James C. Bradshaw, III, of TN, M. Danton Richardson, Sujit P. Soni, and Leo E. Lundberg, Jr. of CA verified as active this date. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 5, 2012 11 DECLARATION of Leo E. Lundberg, Jr. filed by KTS Karaoke, Inc., Timmy Sun Ton re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Delaware Sec of State internet search, # 2 Exhibit D - Tennessee Sec of State internet search, # 3 Exhibit E - California Sec of State internet search, # 4 Exhibit F - New York Sec of State internet search, # 5 Exhibit G - Florida Sec of State internet search, # 6 Exhibit H - uscourts.gov in Tennessee internet search, # 7 Exhibit I - uscourts.gov in California internet, # 8 Exhibit J - Sony/ATV contact inf internet search)(Bradshaw, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 5, 2012 10 DECLARATION of Timmy Sun Ton filed by KTS Karaoke, Inc., Timmy Sun Ton re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed by Sun Ton, # 2 Exhibit B- Complaint filed against Sun Ton)(Bradshaw, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 5, 2012 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Case to the Central District of California by KTS Karaoke, Inc., Timmy Sun Ton. (Bradshaw, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 2, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs' Uncontested MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference 7 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/26/2012 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Prior to the initial case management conference, counsel for the parties shall confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint initial case management order. Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/2/12. (xc: M. Danton Richardson and James C. Bradshaw, III, by regular mail.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 2, 2012 7 MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference (Uncontested) by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 1, 2012 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC. Timmy Sun Ton served on 2/13/2012. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
March 1, 2012 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC. KTS Karaoke, Inc. served on 2/13/2012. (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
January 23, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/23/12. (tmw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
January 19, 2012 Bar status for attorney Timothy L. Warnock and Howell G. O'Rear of TN verified as active this date. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
January 19, 2012 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/5/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
January 19, 2012 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]
January 19, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against KTS Karaoke, Inc. and Timmy Sun Ton (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Sounds LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC. (Summons Issued) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - LEGENDS - 1-17-12 (3)., # 2 Exhibit 2 - STAR DISC 1-17-12 (2), # 3 Exhibit 3 - NORTHSTAR - 1-18-12, # 4 Exhibit 4 - BACKSTAGE - 1-18-12, # 5 Exhibit 5- RADIO STARZ - 1-18-12, # 6 Exhibit 6 - POP HITS MONTHLY - 1-18-12, # 7 Exhibit 7 - QUICK HITZ - 1-18-12, # 8 Exhibit 8 - SONGS ON MACHINE - 1-18-12, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/8/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC et al v. KTS Karaoke, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC
Represented By: Howell G O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy L Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC
Represented By: Howell G O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy L Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Sounds LLC
Represented By: Howell G O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy L Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Tunes LLC
Represented By: Howell G O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy L Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/Atv Songs LLC
Represented By: Howell G O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy L Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Discos Music Publishing LLC
Represented By: Howell G O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy L Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmy Sun Ton
Represented By: Wyatt Tarrant and Combs
Represented By: Leo Edward Lundberg, Jr
Represented By: Michael Danton Richardson
Represented By: Surjit P Soni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTS Karaoke, Inc.
Represented By: Surjit P Soni
Represented By: Michael Danton Richardson
Represented By: Leo Edward Lundberg, Jr
Represented By: Wyatt Tarrant and Combs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]