Fox Broadcasting Company et al v. Dish Network LLC et al Featured Case

Defendant: Dish Network LLC and Dish Network Corporation
Plaintiff: Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc and Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv04529
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Presiding Judge: George H. King
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 194 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: The court has considered the Joint Stipulation and Supplemental Memoranda of the Parties. There is no benefit to having oral argument. The court takes the Motion under submission, and rules asfollows:denying 179 Motion to Compel (sbu)
April 24, 2013 193 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing,, 188 , as to plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Dolores Valencia at dvalencia@jenner.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 4/19/13 by Anne Kielwasser. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Singer, David)
April 24, 2013 192 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Maria Navarro at mm7@orrick.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 19, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Molinski, William)
April 23, 2013 191 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Dish to Produce Documents it already agreed to produce 179 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Fox's Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth Freilich ISO DISH's Supplemental Opposition to Fox's Motion to Compel)(Molinski, William)
April 23, 2013 190 REPLY in support of a motion MOTION to Compel Dish to Produce Documents it already agreed to produce 179 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Stone, Richard)
April 19, 2013 188 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court and counsel confer. Following oral argument, the Court advises counsel that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against DISH's New 2013 Services 129 is taken under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (gk)
April 17, 2013 189 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of David Singer in Support of Fox's Motion to Compel Dish to Immediately Produce Documents it already agreed to produce. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9)(mat)
April 17, 2013 187 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of William A. Moliski in Opposition to Fox's MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
April 17, 2013 186 SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Fox's Motion to Compel Dish to Immdiatley Produce Documents its Already Agreed to Produce. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat)
April 17, 2013 185 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Exhibits 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 28, and 29 Declaration ofDavid Singer in Support ofFox's Motion to Compel Dish to Immediately Produce Documents it Already Agreed to Produce (the "Singer MTC Declaration"), which Judge Gee previously ordered to be sealed; Exhibits 1, 2, and 38 of the Singer MTC Declaration, as well as Exhibits C, D, S, T, and U of the Declaration of William A. Molinski in Opposition to Fox's Motion to Compel (the "Molinski Declaration"); and The Joint Stipulation Regarding Fox's Motion to Compel Dish to Immediately Produce Documents it Already Agreed to Produce, and the Singer and Molinski Declarations filed with the Joint Stipulation, are to be sealed. IT IS SO ORDERED. 183 184 [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (gr)
April 17, 2013 182 SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC. (Molinski, William)
April 17, 2013 181 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman re: MOTION to Compel Dish to Produce Documents it already agreed to produce 179 previously scheduled for 5/6/2013 2:00pm has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(sbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 16, 2013 180 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re MOTION to Compel Dish to Produce Documents it already agreed to produce 179 served on 4/15/2013. (Stone, Richard)
April 15, 2013 184 DECLARATION OF DAVID SINGER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING FOX'S MOTION TO COMPEL UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. 183 (gr)
April 15, 2013 183 FOX'S APPLICATION TO FILE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL UNDER SEAL filed by plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (gr)
April 15, 2013 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Dish to Produce Documents it already agreed to produce filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2013 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Attachments: # 1 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING FOXS MOTION TO COMPEL DISH (PUBLIC REDACTED), # 2 Declaration of David Singer and Exhibits 1-16 (Public Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 17-26 to the Declaration of D. Singer (Public Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 27-38 of the Declaration of D. Singer (Public Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 39 to the Declaration of D. Singer (Public Redacted), # 6 Declaration of William Molinski and Exhibits A-M (Public Redacted), # 7 Exhibit N-Y to the Declaration of W. Molinski (Public Redacted), # 8 Declaration of Seth Freilich, # 9 Proposed Order)(Stone, Richard)
April 15, 2013 178 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Under Seal Documents re Fox's Motion to Compel and Application to Seal. (Stone, Richard)
April 8, 2013 177 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' REPLY in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Dish's New 2013 Services. (mat)
April 8, 2013 176 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs Application for Filing Documents Under Seal 174 by Judge Dolly M. Gee that Portions of Plaintiffs Reply in support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction against Dish's New 013 Services, which include statements previously filed under seal by the parties are hereby filed under seal. (jp)
April 5, 2013 175 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re Reply (Motion related),, 172 , APPLICATION to Seal 174 served on 3/5/13. (bp)
April 5, 2013 174 APPLICATION TO FILE REPLY BRIEF UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
April 5, 2013 173 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporationto Objection/Opposition (Motion related), 158 (Stone, Richard)
April 5, 2013 172 REPLY in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Singer, # 2 Exhibit A to David Singer)(Stone, Richard)
April 5, 2013 171 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Dish's New 2013 Services; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order Thereon; Proof of Service. (Stone, Richard)
March 26, 2013 170 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, 130 , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 served on 03/04/2013. (Stone, Richard)
March 26, 2013 169 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, upon Defendant EchoStar Technologies LLC served on 3/4/2013, answer due 3/25/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pamela Trujillo, Clerk Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Stone, Richard)
March 19, 2013 168 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David Shull in Support of DHS's Opposition to Fox's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on Dish's New 2013 Services. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9)(mat)
March 19, 2013 167 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Richard Rapp in Support of DHS's Opposition to Fox's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on Dish's New 2013 Services.(mat)
March 19, 2013 166 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of David Kummer in Support of DHS's Opposition to Fox's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on Dish's New 2013 Services. (mat)
March 19, 2013 165 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Vivex Khemka in Support of DHS's Opposition to Fox's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on Dish's New 2013 Services.(mat)
March 19, 2013 164 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Annette L. Hurst in Support of DHS's Opposition to Fox's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on Dish's New 2013 Services. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
March 19, 2013 163 SEALED DOCUMENT- DHS's Opposition to Fox's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on Dish's New 2013 Services. (mat)
March 19, 2013 162 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DISH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that Defendants' Application 161 is GRANTED in its entirety. The Clerk shall maintain under Seal the following documents: (1) Portions of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "DISH's New 2013 Services," publicly filed on 3/15/2013; (2) Exhibits 17-32 attached to the Declaration of Annette Hurst in Support of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "DISH's New 2013 Services;" (3) Portions of the Declaration of Vivek Khemka in Support of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "DISH's New 2013 Services;" (4) Portions of the Declaration of David Kummer in Support of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "DISH's New 2013 Services;" (5) Portions of the Declaration of David Shull in Support of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "DISH's New 2013 Services" and Exhibits 1-10 attached thereto; and (6) Portions of the Declaration of Richard Rapp in Support of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "DISH's New 2013 Services." (gk)
March 15, 2013 161 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by Defendants Dish Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corp. and EchoStar Technologies L.L.C. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
March 15, 2013 160 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC, re Notice of Lodging 156 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92),,, 155 served on March 13, 2013. (Hurst, Annette)
March 15, 2013 159 OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC. (Hurst, Annette)
March 15, 2013 158 OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC. (Hurst, Annette)
March 15, 2013 157 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Paul Horowitz, # 2 Declaration Annette L. Hurst, # 3 Declaration Vivek Khemka, # 4 Declaration David Kummer, # 5 Declaration Richard Rapp, # 6 Declaration David Shull)(Hurst, Annette)
March 15, 2013 156 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Non-Paper Exhibit (DVD) in Support of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "Dish's New 2013 Services" re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92),,, 155 (Hurst, Annette)
March 15, 2013 155 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Dish Network LLC of DISH's Opposition to Fox's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on "Dish's New 2013 Services" [Conditionally Filed Sealed]; Declaration of Annette L. Hurst ISO DISHs Opposition and Exhibits 17 32 [Conditionally Filed Under Seal]; Declaration of Vivek Khemka ISO DISH's Opposition [Conditionally Filed Under Seal]; Declaration of David Kummer ISO DISH's Opposition [Conditionally Under Seal]; Declaration of Richard Rapp ISO DISH's Opposition [Conditionally Filed Under Seal]; Declaration of David Shull ISO DISH's Opposition and Exhibits 1-10 [Conditionally Filed Under Seal]; Lodged Non-Paper Exhibit (DVD) ISO DISH's Opposition; Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order for Application to File Under Seal. (Hurst, Annette)
March 13, 2013 154 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION AND PLAINTIFFS' REPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation 153 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendants may file a memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction in a length not exceeding 35 pages, excluding indices and exhibits. Plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction in a length not to exceed 35 pages. (gk)
March 12, 2013 153 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Defendants' Opposition and Plaintiffs' Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, EchoStar Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Exceed Page Limits)(Hurst, Annette)
March 12, 2013 152 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant EchoStar Technologies LLC, identifying EchoStar Corporation. (Molinski, William)
March 12, 2013 151 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 135 filed by Defendant EchoStar Technologies LLC.(Molinski, William)
March 12, 2013 150 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 135 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC.(Molinski, William)
March 11, 2013 149 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint filed 2/25/2013 140 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). Proof of Service (subsequent documents) event utilized for docketing this filing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
March 1, 2013 146 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of David Singer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Dish's New 2013 Services. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
February 26, 2013 148 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Michael Biard in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Dish's New 2013 Services. (mat)
February 26, 2013 147 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Dish's New 2013 Services. (mat)
February 26, 2013 145 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiffs' Application 142 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs' Retransmission Consent Agreement with Defendant Dish Network L.L.C., originally entered into 7/1/2002 (the "RTC Agreement"), and the 10/29/2010 Letter Agreement (the "2010 Amendment") which are attached as Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Michael Biard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Against Dish's New 2013 Services ("Biard Declaration"); (2) Portions of the Biard Declaration which describe the RTC Agreement and the 2010 Amendment; (3) Portions of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Against Dish's New 2013 Services (the "Fox Memorandum") which describe the RTC Agreement and the 2010 Amendment; (4) The DVR usage spreadsheet that Dish designated Highly Confidential, attached as Exhibit K to the Declaration of David Singer; (5) Portions of the Fox Memorandum which describe the DVR usage spreadsheet; and (6) Portions of the Declaration of David Singer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Against Dish's New 2013 Services, which describe the DVR usage spreadsheet; are hereby filed under seal. (gk)
February 26, 2013 141 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee 137 . DISHs opposition to FOXs motion for preliminary injunction is due on March 15, 2013, and FOXs reply is due on April 5, 2013. The parties will personally serve their respective briefs and supporting materials. The hearing on FOXs motion will be held on April 19, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. (im)
February 25, 2013 140 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re Amended Complaint 135 (Stone, Richard)
February 25, 2013 137 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Joint Stipulation Continuing Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Preliminary Injunction)(Singer, David)
February 22, 2013 139 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, and Fox Television Holdings, Inc., upon Dish Network L.L.C., Defendants Dish Network Corporation, and EchoStar Technologies L.L.C. served on 2/22/2013, answer due 3/15/2013. Service of the Publicly Redated First Amended Complaint were executed upon William A. Molinski, Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe, LLP via messenger; Annette L. Hurst, Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP via UPS, Elyse D. Echtman, Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP via UPS, and Mark A. Lemley, Durie Tangri LLP via UPS statute under which service was made not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. (gk)
February 22, 2013 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint 138 as to Defendants Dish Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, and EchoStar Technologies L.L.C. (gk)
February 22, 2013 138 REDACTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Dish Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, and EchoStar Technologies L.L.C.; amending Complaint 1 ; with Jury Demand; filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Issued Summons on First Amended Complaint)(gk) Modified on 2/25/2013 (gk).
February 22, 2013 136 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Plaintiffs'. (Stone, Richard)
February 22, 2013 134 NOTICE Regarding DKT. Nos. 125 and 126 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Stone, Richard)
February 21, 2013 144 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp. and Fox Television Holdings, Inc., re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against DISH's New 2013 Services, Application to File Under Seal 142 , Declaration of David Singer in Support of Application to File Under Seal 143 , Declaration of David Singer in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against DISH's New 2013 Services, Declaration of Michael Baird in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against DISH's New 2013 Services, DVD in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against DISH's New 2013 Services, and Proposed Order, served on 2/21/2013. (gk)
February 21, 2013 143 DECLARATION of David Singer in Support of Application to File Under Seal 142 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp. and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. (gk)
February 21, 2013 142 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp. and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
February 21, 2013 135 SEALED DOCUMENT- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Breach of Contract. (mat)
February 21, 2013 133 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION CONSENTING TO FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation 132 , it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiffs are permitted to file the First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the parties' stipulation; and (2) Dish Network L.L.C. and Dish Network Corp.'s response to the First Amended Complaint is due 21 days from the date the stipulation was filed. (gk)
February 21, 2013 132 SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION Consenting to File of First Amended Complaint Under FRCP 15(a)(2).(mat)
February 21, 2013 131 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR FILING UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiffs' Application 123 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Portions of the parties' Stipulation Permitting Filing of First Amended Complaint, together with the concurrently-filed Proposed First Amended Complaint, are hereby filed under seal. Upon the Court's approval of the parties' Stipulation Permitting Filing of First Amended Complaint Under Seal, the First Amended Complaint may be filed under seal. Plaintiffs shall file a redacted public version of the First Amended Complaint within five days of the date of this Order. (gk)
February 21, 2013 130 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on 129 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David R. Singer, # 2 Exhibit A-G of David R. Singer Declaration, # 3 Exhibit H - Part 1 of David R. Singer Declaration, # 4 Exhibit H - Part 2 of David R. Singer Declaration, # 5 Exhibit H - Part 3 of David R. Singer Declaration, # 6 Exhibit I-K of David R. Singer Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Michael Biard, # 8 Declaration of Sherry Brennan, # 9 Proposed Order)(Stone, Richard)
February 21, 2013 129 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Dish's New 2013 Services .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Stone, Richard)
February 21, 2013 128 NOTICE OF LODGING filed DVDs in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Dish's New 2013 Services re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 127 (Stone, Richard)
February 21, 2013 127 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of See Attached Document List. (Stone, Richard)
February 21, 2013 126 NOTICE OF LODGING filed DVD in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Dish's New 2013 Services re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 125 (Stone, Richard)
February 21, 2013 125 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of See Attached Document List. (Stone, Richard)
February 19, 2013 124 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re Joint Stipulation Consenting to Filing of First Amended Complaint Under FRCP 15(a)(2); Application to File Under Seal 123 ; Proposed Order Approving Joint Stipulation; and Proposed Order Regarding Application for Filing Under Seal, served on 2/19/2013. (gk)
February 19, 2013 123 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp. and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
February 19, 2013 122 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of 1) Application to File Under Seal; 2) Proposed Order Thereon; 3) Joint Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint; 4) Proposed Order Thereon; 5) First Amended Complaint; 5) Summons; 6) Proof of Service. (Stone, Richard)
January 10, 2013 121 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/21/12 @ 4:30 p.m. re Transcript 108 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Kielwasser, Anne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2012 120 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 110 filed by Fox Television Holdings Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, CCA # 12-57048. The appeal filed 11/9/12 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. Order received in this district on 11/13/12. (car)
November 13, 2012 119 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman, re Stipulation for Discovery,, use and confidentiality of nelson data 113 (sbu)
November 13, 2012 117 SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEAL From Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Representation Statement. (cbr)
November 13, 2012 116 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR FILING ATTACHMENT TO NOTICE OF APPEAL UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiffs' Application to File Attachment to Notice of Appeal Under Seal 115 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's Under Seal Order attached to Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal is hereby filed under seal. (gk)
November 12, 2012 114 JOINT REPORT of ON PROPOSED REDACTIONS TO ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Molinski, William)
November 9, 2012 115 APPLICATION to File Attachment to Notice of Appeal Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp. and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
November 9, 2012 113 STIPULATION for Discovery as to NIELSEN DATA filed by plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order CONCERNING DISCOVERY, USE AND CONFIDENTIALITY OF NIELSEN DATA)(Singer, David)
November 9, 2012 112 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of COURT UNDER SEAL ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Stone, Richard)
November 9, 2012 111 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 110 (Stone, Richard)
November 9, 2012 110 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 109 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-11235668 paid.) (Stone, Richard)
November 7, 2012 118 Featured Case ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [REDACTED VERSION] by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 41 is DENIED. Given that this Order quotes from the parties' confidential agreements, which have been filed under seal, within five days from the date of this Order, the parties will meet and confer regarding which portions of this Order, if any, they propose to be redacted such that the Court may issue a redacted version of the Order. The parties shall file a joint report with the Court by no later than 11/12/2012 regarding the proposed redacted version of the Order. (gk)
November 7, 2012 109 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER Re: Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
October 9, 2012 108 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 09/21/12 at 4:30 pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Anne Kielwasser, phone number 213/894-2969 AKtranscripts.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2013. (Kielwasser, Anne)
September 25, 2012 106 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 9/21/12 to 9/21/12 as to Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation Court Reporter Anne Kielwasser. Court will contact Hilda Vecino at hvecino@jenner.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Singer, David)
September 25, 2012 105 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings September 21, 2012 to September 21, 2012 as to Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC Court Reporter Anne Kielwasser. Court will contact Maria Navarro at mm7@orrick.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 21, 2012. Category: Daily. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Molinski, William)
September 21, 2012 107 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court and counsel confer. Following oral argument, the Court advises counsel that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 41 is taken under submission and a written order will issue. Further, the Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for hearing on 9/28/2012 is hereby vacated. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (gk)
September 19, 2012 97 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER DENYING Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 95 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See attached Minute Order for further details). Defendant and therefore do not shed additional light on the issues currently before the Court. Should Public Knowledge wish to participate at a later stage of this litigation, it is free to file a timely application to do so at that time. In light of the foregoing, Public Knowledges ex parte application is DENIED. (jp)
September 18, 2012 96 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Defendants Application for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal 93 by Judge Dolly M. Gee that DISH shall be allowed to file DISH's Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Consisting solely of the deposition of Sherry Brennan. The Court Strikes the accompanying 3-page brief. The Clerk shall maintain that document and its attachments under seal. (jp)
September 18, 2012 95 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Granting Leave to File Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Amicus Public Knowledge. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
September 18, 2012 94 OBJECTIONS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION BY NON-PARTY PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Stone, Richard)
September 14, 2012 92 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation.. (Stone, Richard)
September 14, 2012 91 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(Stone, Richard)
September 13, 2012 90 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee re: Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction 41 currently scheduled for 9/21/2012 8:30 AM has been rescheduled.to 4:00 PM on 9/21/2012. *PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(vv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2012 104 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of John Hauser in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 12, 2012 103 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Richard Rapp in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 12, 2012 102 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Dan Minnick in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 12, 2012 101 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Vivek Kemkha in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 12, 2012 100 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Keith Gerhards in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 12, 2012 99 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of David Shull in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
September 12, 2012 98 SEALED DOCUMENT- DISH'S Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 12, 2012 89 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS DISH NETWORK CORPORATION AND DISH NETWORK L.L.C.'S CORRECTED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' Application 74 , 76 is GRANTED in its entirety. The Clerk shall maintain under Seal the following documents: (1) Portions of Defendants DISH Network Corporation and DISH Network L.L.C.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (2) Portions of the Declaration of David Shull; (3) Portions of the Declaration of Keith Gerhards; (4) Portions of the Declaration of Vivek Khemka; (5) Portions of the Declaration of Dan Minnick; (6) Portions of the Declaration of Dick Rapp; (7) Portions of the Declaration of John Hauser in Support of Defendants DISH Network Corporation and DISH Network L.L.C.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. (gk)
September 12, 2012 83 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Singer in Opposition to Dish Network's Application to File Supplemental Evidence in Connection with Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion)(Stone, Richard)
September 12, 2012 82 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, Defendants Application for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Application for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal; DISHs Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction served on September 11, 2012. (Molinski, William)
September 11, 2012 93 APPLICATION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal filed by defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp)
September 11, 2012 87 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DISH NETWORK L.L.C. AND DISH NETWORK CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCKET NUMBER 58 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants' Application for an Order to File Under Seal 75 is GRANTED in its entirety. The Clerk shall maintain under Seal the following document: Defendants DISH Network Corporation and DISH Network L.L.C.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, publicly filed on 8/31/2012 58 . (gk)
September 11, 2012 81 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee re: Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 41 currently scheduled for September 21, 2012 at 9:30 AM has been advanced to 8:30 AM on September 21, 2012. Further, the Court will not entertain any demonstrative evidence absent the parties stipulation. *PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(vv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2012 80 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC of Defendants Application for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Application for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal; DISHs Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Molinski, William)
September 10, 2012 88 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
September 10, 2012 86 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiff's Application for Filing Documents Under Seal 84 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction which include statements previously filed under seal by the parties are hereby filed under seal. (gk)
September 7, 2012 85 DECLARATION of David Singer in Support of Plaintiffs' Application to File Reply Brief Under Seal 84 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. (gk)
September 7, 2012 84 APPLICATION to File Reply Brief Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
September 7, 2012 79 REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Stone, Richard)
September 7, 2012 78 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporationto Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 65 (Stone, Richard)
September 7, 2012 77 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Stone, Richard)
September 6, 2012 76 Corrected APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Molinski, William)
September 5, 2012 72 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C. and DISH Network Corporation's Application to File Under Seal Docket Number 58; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants DISH Network L.L.C. and DISH Network Corporation's Application to File Under Seal Docket Number 58 served on September 4, 2012. (Molinski, William)
September 4, 2012 75 APPLICATION to File Under Seal Docket Number 58 filed by Defendants Dish Network L.L.C. and Dish Network Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
September 4, 2012 74 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation and Dish Network L.L.C. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
September 4, 2012 73 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee 57 . (im)
September 4, 2012 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 [CORRECTED PUBLIC VERSION] filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
September 4, 2012 70 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC of Defendants Dish Network L.L.C. And Dish Network Corporations Application To File Under Seal Docket Number 58; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Dish Network L.L.C. And Dish Network Corporations Application To File Under Seal Docket Number 58. (Molinski, William)
September 4, 2012 69 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, served on September 1, 2012. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 68 DECLARATION of WILLIAM A. MOLINSKI IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 67 DECLARATION of JOHN HAUSER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 66 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC of SEE ATTACHMENT A. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 65 OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS OFFERED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION REQUEST IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 64 DECLARATION of DICK RAPP IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 63 DECLARATION of DAVE KUMMER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration IAN SAFFER)(Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 62 DECLARATION of VIVEK KHEMKA IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 61 DECLARATION of DAVID SHULL IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 60 DECLARATION of KEITH GERHARDS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 59 DECLARATION of DAN MINNICK IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 58 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 31, 2012 57 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Molinski, William)
August 30, 2012 56 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 52 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lisa Toth Simpson on behalf of Defendants Dish Network LLC and Dish Network Corporation, designating William A. Molinski as local counsel. (lt) Modified on 8/31/2012 (lt).
August 29, 2012 54 STATEMENT of Subsequent Developments Re Order on DISH's Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Conference EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Conference and Setting of Schedule 36 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 29, 2012 52 APPLICATION for attorney Lisa Toth Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10884557 paid.) filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Molinski, William)
August 28, 2012 51 Featured Case MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONFERENCE AND SETTING OF EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court denies Defendants DISH Network L.L.C. and DISH Network Corp.'s Ex Parte Application for conference and setting of expedited discovery and briefing schedule for preliminary injunction motion 36 . Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 24, 2012 48 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. correcting Transcript Order Form (AO-435), Transcript Order Form (AO-435) 45 (Molinski, William)
August 24, 2012 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings August 24, 2012 to August 24, 2012 as to Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC Court Reporter Anne Kielwasser. Court will contact Maria Navarro at mm7@orrick.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: August 24, 2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Molinski, William)
August 23, 2012 55 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of David Singer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7)(mat)
August 23, 2012 53 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Michael Biard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
August 23, 2012 50 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat)
August 23, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiffs' Application 46 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that portions of Plaintiffs' Retransmission Consent Agreement with Defendant Dish Network L.L.C., originally entered into 7/1/2002 (the "RTC Agreement"), and the 10/29/2010 Letter Agreement (the "2010 Amendment"), Portions of the Biard Declaration which describe the RTC Agreement and the 2010 Amendment; Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction which describe the RTC Agreement and the 2010 Amendment; Excerpts from the deposition of Dan Minnick, attached as Exhibit L to the Declaration of David Singer; and Portions of the Preliminary Injunction Motion which describe Mr. Minnick's deposition testimony; are hereby filed under seal. (gk)
August 22, 2012 47 DECLARATION of Michael Biard in Support of Application to Seal 46 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. (gk)
August 22, 2012 46 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., and Fox Television Holdings, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
August 22, 2012 44 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Application to File Under Seal and Related Documents; Sealed Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction.. (Stone, Richard)
August 22, 2012 43 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of DVD containing two video files.. (Stone, Richard)
August 22, 2012 42 NOTICE OF LODGING filed DVDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate 41 (Stone, Richard)
August 22, 2012 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of David R. Singer, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Singer, # 4 Exhibit B (part 1 of 3) to Declaration of D. Singer, # 5 Exhibit B (part 2 of 3) to Declaration of D. Singer, # 6 Exhibit B (part 3 of 3) to Declaration of D. Singer, # 7 Exhibit C - F to Declaration of D. Singer, # 8 Exhibit G - N to Declaration of D. Singer, # 9 Declaration of David Haslingden, # 10 Declaration of Robert D. Liodice, # 11 Declaration of Steven J. Smith, # 12 Declaration of Sherry Brennan, # 13 Exhibit A to Declaration of S. Brennan, # 14 Exhibit B - F to Declaration of S. Brennan, # 15 Declaration of Michael Biard, # 16 Proposed Order And Preliminary Injunction)(Stone, Richard)
August 22, 2012 40 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Conference EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Conference and Setting of Schedule 36 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
August 21, 2012 39 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, 38 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Singer, David)
August 21, 2012 38 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Conference EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Conference and Setting of Schedule 36 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Singer, # 2 Exhibit A - C, # 3 Exhibit D - N)(Singer, David)
August 21, 2012 37 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Conference EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Conference and Setting of Schedule 36 electronically served on August 20, 2012. (Molinski, William)
August 20, 2012 36 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Conference, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Conference and Setting of Schedule filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration William A. Molinski, # 2 Exhibit A-I, # 3 Exhibit J-R, # 4 Proposed Order)(Molinski, William)
August 16, 2012 35 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for September 28, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. [Fed. R. Civ. P.16] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. SEE ORDER. (im)
August 2, 2012 34 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS-TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee 23 .Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order Transferring Civil Action Under Section 3.1 of General Order 08-05, filed on July 18, 2012. SEE ORDER. (im)
August 2, 2012 33 Featured Case INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (im)
July 30, 2012 32 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC.(Molinski, William)
July 24, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 28 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney E. Joshua Rosenkranz on behalf of Defendants, designating William A. Molinski as local counsel. (lt)
July 24, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elyse D. Echtman on behalf of Defendants, designating William A. Molinski as local counsel. (lt)
July 24, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 26 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter A. Bicks on behalf of Defendants, designating William A. Molinski as local counsel. (lt)
July 24, 2012 28 APPLICATION for attorney E. Joshua Rosenkranz to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10714144 paid.) filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Molinski, William)
July 24, 2012 27 APPLICATION for attorney Elyse D. Echtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10714076 paid.) filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Molinski, William)
July 24, 2012 26 APPLICATION for attorney Peter A. Bicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10713984 paid.) filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Molinski, William)
July 24, 2012 25 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. RE Stipulation for Protective Order 24 . (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
July 20, 2012 24 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re: Stipulated Protective Order)(Singer, David)
July 18, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to Section 3.1 of General Order 08-05. ORDER case transferred from Judge George H. King to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 12-04529 DMG(SHx). Signed by Judge George H. King. (rn)
July 10, 2012 22 NOTICE of Decision: Lifting of Temporary Anti-Suit Restraining Order by United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Singer, David)
June 13, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. King, having read and considered the Joint Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to Initial complaint 20 . Defendant Dish Network L.L.C. shall have until 20 days after the Court in the New York Action rules on the Motion for an Anti-Suit Injunction to file and serve its response to the Complaint. (ir)
June 11, 2012 20 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 20 days after the Court in the New York action rules on the Motion for an Anti-Suit Injunction re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Molinski, William)
June 11, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT (See document for further details) by Judge George H. King. (ir)
June 5, 2012 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, upon Attorney for Defedants All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Valerie Goo, Esq. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Singer, David)
June 5, 2012 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, upon Defendant Dish Network Corporation served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Registered Agent. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Singer, David)
June 5, 2012 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, upon Defendant Dish Network LLC served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Registered Agent. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Singer, David)
June 4, 2012 15 PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 6/4/12: initiating documents. (mg)
June 4, 2012 14 PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 6/4/12: initiating documents. (mg)
June 4, 2012 13 CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 6/4/12 addressed to agallegos@jenner.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Chief Judge for further proceedings. (mg)
May 30, 2012 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman: denied in view of the ruling of the Southern District of New York. 7 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing (sbu)
May 30, 2012 11 NOTICE of Decision: Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order by United States District Court for Southern District of New York filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
May 29, 2012 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Singer, David)
May 29, 2012 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Related Case(s): 12-CV-04536 (C.D. Cal.), 12-CV-4551 (C.D. Cal.) (Thomas, Andrew)
May 29, 2012 8 DECLARATION of William A. Molinski in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing 7 filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit C-3, # 6 Exhibit C-4, # 7 Exhibit C-5, # 8 Exhibit D)(Molinski, William)
May 29, 2012 6 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC, identifying Dish Network L.L.C., Dish DBS Corporation, Dish Orbital Corporation, Dish Network Corp.. (Molinski, William)
May 29, 2012 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (Molinski, William)
May 24, 2012 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time to hear Plaintiffs motion for expedited discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order.(et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2012: # 1 Proposed Order) (mg).
May 24, 2012 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO-121) (et)
May 24, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation for Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (et) (mg).
May 24, 2012 2 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (et) (mg).
May 24, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. (et)
May 24, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network LLC. Case assigned to Judge George H. King for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Holdings Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company. (et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox Broadcasting Company et al v. Dish Network LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network LLC
Represented By: William A Molinski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network Corporation
Represented By: William A Molinski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Broadcasting Company
Represented By: Amy M Gallegos
Represented By: David R Singer
Represented By: Richard Lee Stone
Represented By: Andrew J Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Television Holdings Inc
Represented By: Amy M Gallegos
Represented By: David R Singer
Represented By: Richard Lee Stone
Represented By: Andrew J Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Amy M Gallegos
Represented By: David R Singer
Represented By: Richard Lee Stone
Represented By: Andrew J Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]