Rimowa GmbH v. Marvel Entertainment LLC et al Featured Case

Defendant: Hot Toys Limited, Marvel Entertainment LLC and Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc
Plaintiff: Rimowa GmbH
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv06651
Filed: August 1, 2012
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 26 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 ORDER) (am)
January 25, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety and as against all parties, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), with each party to bear its own fees and costs of suit. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (am)
January 23, 2013 24 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. Rule 41(a)(1) filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Action With Prejudice)(Mandavia, Anjani)
January 7, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER OF THE CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE OCJ# 13-004 approved by Chief District Judge George H. King. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of District Judge Jesus G. Bernal, this case is transferred from the calendar of District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of District Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation CV12-6651 JGB(FMOx). (sn)
January 3, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting Sixth Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 21 by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. Defendants Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc and Marvel Entertainment LLC's answers are due 1/18/2013. (kbr)
December 28, 2012 21 Sixth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 18, 2013 re Amended Complaint, 5 filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Sixth Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Mandavia, Anjani)
December 4, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FIFTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 19 , by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. The Court hereby orders that Defendants shall have through and including December 28, 2012, within which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (kbr)
December 3, 2012 19 Fifth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 28, 2012 re Amended Complaint, 5 filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Fifth Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Mandavia, Anjani)
November 19, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 17 by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. Good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby orders that Defendants shall have through and including December 3, 2012, within which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (kbr)
November 16, 2012 17 Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 3, 2012 re Amended Complaint, 5 filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Mandavia, Anjani)
November 6, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Third Stipulation to Extend the time for Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint for an additional two weeks 14 by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald that Defendants shall have through and including 11/19/2012, within which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (jp)
November 5, 2012 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. correcting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 14 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Mandavia, Anjani)
November 5, 2012 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 19, 2012 re Amended Complaint, 5 filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Mandavia, Anjani)
September 26, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 12 . Defendants Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc and Marvel Entertainment LLC answers are due 11/5/2012. (kbr)
September 25, 2012 12 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 5, 2012 re Amended Complaint, 5 filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Mandavia, Anjani)
August 27, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 9 , by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to Local Rule 8-3, Defendants Buena Vista Home entertainment, Inc. and Marvel Entertainment LLC shall have until October 1, 2012 to respond to the Amended Complaint. (kbr)
August 24, 2012 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 9 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3))(Mandavia, Anjani)
August 23, 2012 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc answer now due 10/1/2012; Marvel Entertainment LLC answer now due 10/1/2012, re Amended Complaint, 5 filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH.(Mandavia, Anjani)
August 13, 2012 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rimowa GmbH, upon Defendant Marvel Entertainment LLC served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ryan Potter, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Mandavia, Anjani)
August 13, 2012 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rimowa GmbH, upon Defendant Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marsha Reed, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Mandavia, Anjani)
August 9, 2012 6 AMENDED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (jp)
August 9, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint 5 as to defendants Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc, Hot Toys Limited, Marvel Entertainment LLC. (jp)
August 9, 2012 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc, Marvel Entertainment LLC, Hot Toys Limited amending Complaint 1 with JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 21 Day Summons Issued). (jp) Modified on 8/10/2012 (jp).
August 1, 2012 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 1, 2012 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Rimowa GmbH. (et)
August 1, 2012 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (et) (mg).
August 1, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc, Marvel Entertainment LLC. (et)
August 1, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc, Marvel Entertainment LLC. Case assigned to Judge Michael W Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Rimowa GmbH. (et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rimowa GmbH v. Marvel Entertainment LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Toys Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Entertainment LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Home Entertainment Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rimowa GmbH
Represented By: Marvin Gelfand
Represented By: Anjani Mandavia
Represented By: Audrey Anne Millemann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]