Global Acquisitions Network et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Defendant: Zanco, Christopher Ray Zanco, W C Investment Holdings Inc, Glen McInerney, Oriana Capital Partners LLC, Jon Leary, Dexter Chappell, Valerie Chappell, Bank of America Corporation, HLB Financial LLC, Bernard Woodson and Does
Plaintiff: Global Acquisitions Network and Shawn Corneille
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv08758
Filed: October 12, 2012
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Referring Judge: Carla Woehrle
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 116 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JON LEARYS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT 104 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc). Modified on 12/17/2013. (lc).
December 20, 2013 117 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 108 PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ORIANA CAPITAL PARTNERS 99 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson . (lc) Modified on 12/20/2013. (lc).
December 27, 2013 119 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A PLAUSIBLE CLAIM by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiffs to showcause why this action should not be dismissed as implausible. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a brief, not to exceed five pages, by January 17, 2014, showing cause why this action should not be dismissed as implausible. The brief must be accompanied by a declaration attesting to the facts contained in the brief, signed under penalty of perjury. Failure to file a response will result indismissal of this action with prejudice. (lc)
December 14, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting 13 defendant Bank of America Corporation Motion to Set Aside Default 12 . (lc). Modified on 12/14/2012 (lc).
December 19, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:Plaintiffs to file a brief, notto exceed ten pages, by Friday, January 4, 2013, showing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Defendant should also deliver a courtesy copy to chambers. The court will regard any failure to file an explanatory brief as consent to dismiss this matter. (lc)
December 19, 2012 20 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dean D. Pegerson. Plaintiffs to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, by Friday, January 4, 2013, showing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiffs should also deliver a courtesy copy to chambers, Room 244-J, Second Floor, 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles. The court will regard any failure to file an explanatory brief as consent to dismiss this matter. (lc). Modified on 12/19/2012 (lc).
February 19, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND CERTAIN CLAIMS 21 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss as to all claims against BAC. However, the Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint to add an allegation of alter ego liability against BAC and to add Bank of America, N.A. and BANA Holding Corporation as defendants. Additionally, the Court grants leave to amend the four fraud-based claims (Claims 5, 6, 7, 8) to plead, if possible, additional facts to meet Rule9(b)s particularity requirements, and to amend the conspiracy claim (Claim 9). Because it would be futile to amend the claims for negligence (Claim 2), breach of fiduciary duty (Claim 3), and accounting (Claim 11), the Court dismisses those claims without leave to amend. The conversion claim (Claim 10) is also dismissed without leave to amend, per Plaintiffs agreement that it does not apply to BAC. (lc). Modified on 2/19/2013. (lc).
June 7, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 50 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc). Modified on 6/7/2013 (lc).
July 9, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT LEARY MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(2) 65 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson . (lc). Modified on 7/9/2013 (lc).
September 13, 2013 94 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b) 75 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc). Modified on 9/13/2013. (lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Global Acquisitions Network et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zanco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ray Zanco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W C Investment Holdings Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen McInerney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oriana Capital Partners LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Leary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Chappell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Chappell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HLB Financial LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Woodson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Acquisitions Network
Represented By: Jon A Divens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Corneille
Represented By: Jon A Divens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]