LegalZoom.com Inc v. Rocket Lawyer Incorporated Featured Case

Plaintiff: LegalZoom.com Inc
Counter Defendant: LegalZoom.com Inc
Counter Claimant: Rocket Lawyer Incorporated
Defendant: Rocket Lawyer Incorporated
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv09942
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Gary A. Feess
Referring Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2014 192 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Court announces that due to the Court's upcoming retirement this case will have to be transferred to another judge for trial. The Court and counsel confer about their transfer options. The parties are advised that there is a Voluntary Consent List to the Assignment of Cases to Magistrate Judges ("Voluntary Consent List") maintained by the Clerk of the Court with the names of magistrate judges that are willing to try a case. The parties should decide on how they wish to proceed but if the Court does not hear from them by close of business on Tuesday, November 25, 2014, the Court will return this case to the case assignment wheel to be randomly reassigned to another district judge. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (smo)
November 18, 2014 191 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess. On the Court's own motion, the Court sets a Status Conference on 11/20/2014 at 9:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2014 190 Featured Case ORDER Granting Stipulation re: Scheduling and Additional Discovery by Judge Gary A. Feess: Upon consideration of the Joint Stipulation for Order re Scheduling and Limited Additional Discovery and good cause appearing, the Court hereby ORDERS the following: This action shall proceed on the following schedule: Trial on April 21, 2015 at 8:30 a.m.; Hearing on Motions in Limine and Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions on April 13, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.; Pretrial Conference, Motions in Limine to be filed, Proposed Voir Dire Questions Lodged, and Agreed-to Statement of Case on March 16, 2015 at 3:30 p.m.; Deadline to amend pretrial filings is March 10, 2015; Last date to conduct Settlement Conference is February 24, 2015; Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment on February 23, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.; Deadline to supplement summary judgment record is February 2, 2015; Close of Limited Renewed Discovery is January 16, 2015. See document for details. (smo)
November 10, 2014 189 NOTICE of Consent to E-Serive of Documents filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Nguyen, Mary Ann)
November 7, 2014 188 Joint STIPULATION for Order re Scheduling and Limited Additional Discovery filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Hong-An Vu added to party Rocket Lawyer Incorporated(pty:cc))(Vu, Hong-An)
November 7, 2014 187 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: Request re: Attorney Consent to E-Service of Documents. The Court has been advised that attorney Mary Ann Thi Nguyen has not consented to e-service of documents filed with the Court's CM/ECF filing system. Ms. Nguyen is requested to file a response within seven days hereof indicating whether she will consent to e-service of filed documents and, if not, the reason for nonconsent. Attached hereto are the instructions for communicating consent. If needed, assistance is available at the website provided in the instructions. See document for details. (Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2014.) (smo)
November 6, 2014 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Status Conference,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 183 , as to Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated Court Reporter. Court will contact Laura Weaver at lweaver@goodwinprocter.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 10/31/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Vu, Hong-An)
November 3, 2014 185 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings October 31, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. re Transcript 184 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2014 184 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on October 31, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO, CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2015. (Cuneo, Patricia)
October 31, 2014 183 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Court and counsel confer about the parties' various requests to supplement the record for the overall pending summary judgment motion(s). The Court is inclined to reopen discovery on a limited basis for a period of 60 days. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer and then submit by no later than Friday, November 7, 2014 a proposed pretrial and trial schedule including dates for the submission of supplemental materials for the pending summary judgment motion(s). Court vacates all pending motion, pretrial and trial dates and deadlines, to be reset after the Court reviews the parties' proposed schedule. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (smo)
October 28, 2014 182 STATEMENT regarding Settlement filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated (Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2014 181 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by defendant/counterclaimant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2014 180 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by defendant/counterclaimant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2014 179 JOINT Exhibit List filed by defendant/counterclaimant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated.. (Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2014 178 Witness List filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated.. (Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2014 177 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated.. (Attachments: # 1 Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions)(Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2014 176 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Final Pretrial Conference Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Heather, Fred)
October 28, 2014 175 Witness List filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc.. (Heather, Fred)
October 28, 2014 174 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Heather, Fred)
October 28, 2014 173 TEXT ENTRY ONLY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess. NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR. Please disregard the previous text only entry. The status conference in this case is still on calendar for hearing this Friday, 10/31/2014 at 9:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. The previous message was intended for another case.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2014 172 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess. On the Court's own motion, the Court vacates the status conference previously scheduled for 10/31/2014 at 9:30 AM. The Court will take the matter under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 27, 2014 171 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess. On the Court's own motion, the Court sets a Status Conference for Friday, 10/31/2014 at 9:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 23, 2014 170 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE 166 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE FACTUAL RECORD)(Jones, Michael)
October 23, 2014 169 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) EXHIBITS A-C TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE FACTUAL RECORD; 4) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE FACTUAL RECORD. (Attachments: # 1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Jones, Michael)
October 22, 2014 168 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE 166 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Allan)(Heather, Fred)
October 21, 2014 167 APPLICATION FOR AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael Jones in Support of Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion to Supplement Factual Record in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (the "Exhibit") filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
October 21, 2014 166 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF HONGAN VU IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD AND TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE, # 2 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 3 DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 4 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD, # 5 Proposed Order GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD AND TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE)(Vu, Hong-An)
October 21, 2014 165 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL; 3) EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Jones, Michael)
October 20, 2014 164 PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL RE: Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Unredacted) in Support of LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bp)
October 17, 2014 163 **SEALED** EXHIBIT A-C TO DECLARATION OF FRED D. HEATHER IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bp)
October 17, 2014 162 REPLY MOTION to Supplement Factual Record in Opposition to Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment 143 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fred D. Heather)(Heather, Fred)
October 17, 2014 161 REPLY MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Redactions 127 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Allan)(Heather, Fred)
October 17, 2014 160 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS; 4) UNREDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD; and 5) EXHIBITS A-C TO FRED HEATHER'S DECLARATION.. (Heather, Fred)
October 17, 2014 159 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael Jones in Support of Rocket Lawyer's Opposition to LegalZoom's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions as to Declaration (non-motion) 130 . (Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2014 158 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REDACTED OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Redactions 127 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Hainline, Forrest)
October 17, 2014 157 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: APPLICATIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court: (1) GRANTS, in part Legal Zoom's application to file Exhibits A-C to the Fred D. Heather Declaration under seal but (2) DENIES Legal Zoom's application to file its Reply Memorandum to Supplement the Factual Record and Reply Memorandum for Rule 11 Sanctions and Exhibits E. to the Fred D. Heather Declaration under seal. The Court (3) DENIES Rocket Lawyer's application to file its Opposition to the Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Exhibits 2 to the Michael Jones Declaration in Support of Rocket Lawyer's Opposition to the Motion to Supplement the Record under seal. denying 133 Application to Seal, granting in part and denying in part 155 Application to Seal (bp)
October 16, 2014 156 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: Continuing Hearing by Judge Gary A. Feess: Upon a cursory review, the Court anticipates at least some supplementation of the record will be granted, which could affect the Court's analysis of the issues presented in the summary judgment motions. To permit adequate consideration of all evidence supporting the Motions for Summary Judgment, the hearing regarding the Motions for Summary Judgment [60, 67, 69, 117 & 118] and for Sanctions [121 & 127] presently scheduled for Monday October 27, 2014 are hereby CONTINUED to 9:30 AM on Monday November 10, 2014. The Motion to Supplement the Record [138, 143 & 149] is taken under submission and the hearing presently scheduled for 9:30 AM on Monday October 27, 2014 is VACATED. See document for details. (smo)
October 14, 2014 155 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bp)
October 13, 2014 154 REPLY MOTION to Supplement Factual Record in Opposition to Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment 143 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fred D. Heather)(Heather, Fred)
October 13, 2014 153 REPLY MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Redactions 127 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Allan)(Heather, Fred)
October 13, 2014 152 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS; 4) UNREDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD; and 5) EXHIBITS A-C AND E TO FRED HEATHER'S DECLARATION.. (Heather, Fred)
October 10, 2014 151 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess granting 145 Application to Seal. (bm)
October 10, 2014 150 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess granting 144 Application to Seal. (bm)
October 10, 2014 149 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD In Opposition To Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bm)
October 10, 2014 148 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF BARAK VAUGHN IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S To Supplement Factual Record In Opposition To Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bm)
October 10, 2014 147 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JONES In Support Of Rocket Lawyer's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Supplement The Record (bm)
October 10, 2014 146 SEALED DOCUMENT - ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
October 7, 2014 145 PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bm)
October 6, 2014 144 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Lodged Proposed Order. (bm)
October 6, 2014 143 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Factual Record in Opposition to Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Allan, # 2 Declaration of Barak Vaughn, # 3 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
October 6, 2014 142 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; 4) UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF BARAK VAUGHN; EXHIBITS L-N AND Q. (Heather, Fred)
October 6, 2014 137 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REDACTED OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION for Order for Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. Plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. will and hereby does apply for an order permitting them to file under seal the following: 1) Unredacted Notic 125 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD)(Jones, Michael)
October 6, 2014 136 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL;3) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD; and 4) EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jones, Michael)
October 2, 2014 139 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF BARAK VAUGHN IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION Of Legalzoom.com, Inc. To Supplement Factual Record In Opposition To Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion For Summary Judgment 138 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bm)
October 2, 2014 138 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. To Supplement Factual Record In Opposition To Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion For Summary Judgment (bm)
October 2, 2014 135 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess: The Court is currently in receipt of an application to file under seal, submitted by Plaintiff LegaZoon.com ("LegalZoom"). (Docket No. 132[Appl.].) Legal Zoom seeks to supplement the factual record in opposition to Rocket Lawyer's Motion for Summary Judgment with unredacted documents Legal Zoom has recently become aware of that were not previously included in Legal Zoom's filings, unredacted versions of the Motion to Supplement the Factual Record, portions of Barak Vaughn's declaration describing Exhibits L-Q to his declaration and Exhibits L-Q themselves. (Id.at 2.) Legal Zoom urges that good cause exists to seal these documents because they are "subject to the Court's protective order and the sealing of these documents is necessary in order to protect information that Rocket Lawyer has designated as 'confidential' or 'attorneys' eye only,' including without limitation, confidential business information and other sensitive business data relating to Rocket Lawyer Incorporated." (Id.) For reasons given below, Legal Zoom's application to file the documents under seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 125 , 132 (bp)
October 1, 2014 133 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bp)
October 1, 2014 131 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing by Judge Gary A. Feess: The ex parte application is 126 GRANTED. The hearing presently scheduled for October 6, 2014, is CONTINUED to October 27, 2014 at 9:30 a.m., at which time the Rule 11 motion, the cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Supplement the record will all be heard. See document for details. (smo)
October 1, 2014 130 DECLARATION of Michael Jones re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 129 In Support of Rocket Lawyer's Opposition to LegalZoom's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Jones, Michael)
October 1, 2014 129 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REDACTED OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Redactions 127 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Hainline, Forrest)
October 1, 2014 128 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS; AND 4) EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL JONES IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jones, Michael)
September 30, 2014 141 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 TO THE DECLARATION Of Michael Jones In Support Of Rocket Lawyer's Opposition To Legalzoom's Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions (bm)
September 30, 2014 140 SEALED DOCUMENT - ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions 121 (bm)
September 30, 2014 134 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SEAL LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS (ECF NO. 121) by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Seal 122 : Upon consideration of the parties' "JOINT STIPULATION TO SEAL LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS (ECF NO. 121)" and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The unredacted version of "LEGALZOOM.COM, INC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES" and supporting declarations (ECF No. 121) (the "Motion"), which was filed on September 26, 2014, shall be placed under seal. 2. LegalZoom may file on September 29, 2014, an appropriately redacted version of the Motion to be placed into the public court file without seeking a new hearing date. (bm)
September 30, 2014 132 PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
September 29, 2014 127 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Redactions filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vaughn, # 2 Declaration of Allan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
September 29, 2014 126 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD SUPPORTING LEGALZOOM'S OPPOSITION TO ROCKET LAWYER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR (2) IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON THE PENDING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s Motion to Supplement Factual Record, # 2 Declaration of Aaron Allan, # 3 Declaration of Barak Vaughn, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application, # 5 Proposed Order Granting LegalZoom's Motion to Supplement Factual Record)(Heather, Fred)
September 29, 2014 125 APPLICATION for Order for Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. Plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. will and hereby does apply for an order permitting them to file under seal the following: 1) Unredacted Notice of Motion and Motion of LegalZoom.com, Inc. to Supplement Factual Record in Opposition to Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporateds Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Unredacted Declaration of Barak Vaugh in Support of LegalZoom.com, Inc.s Motion to Supplement Factual Record; and (3) Exhibits to Declaration of Barak Vaughn filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
September 29, 2014 124 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. TO SUPPLEMENT FACTUAL RECORD IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (4) UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF BARAK VAUGHN IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM'S MOTION TO SUPPLMENT FACTUAL RECORD; (5) EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF BARAK VAUGHN. (Heather, Fred)
September 29, 2014 123 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. correcting Stipulation to Seal 122 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
September 26, 2014 122 Joint STIPULATION File of LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (ECF No. 121) Under Seal filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
September 19, 2014 120 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess re: MOTIONS for Summary Judgment 60 69 117 118 previously scheduled for 9/22/2014 9:30 AM have been rescheduled. Motions set for hearing on 10/6/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2014 119 NOTICE SUBSEQUENTLY DECIDED CASE PRECIDENT RELEVANT TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heather, Fred)
September 10, 2014 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Cook, Brian)
September 10, 2014 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Heather, Fred)
September 10, 2014 116 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SECTION III.B.3 OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Heather, Fred)
August 12, 2014 115 Featured Case ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing and Case Deadlines for Mediation by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Continue 104 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Mediation shall occur within thirty (30) days of this Order, subject to Judge Cahill's availability. 2. The hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment is continued to a date not more than two weeks after the date the parties agree on for mediation. Within a reasonable time after agreeing on a mediation date, the parties shall file amended notices of their respective motions for summary judgment. 3. The current case deadlines are revised as follows: The summary judgment motions are continued to 9/22/2014 at 9:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess, Discovery cut-off 8/12/2014, Hearing on Motions in Limine is set for hearing on 12/2/2014 at 9:30 AM, Last day to file a Proposed Pretrial Order due is 10/28/2014, Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/14/2014., Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 at 8:30 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2014 at 3:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. See document for details. (smo)
August 12, 2014 114 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Gary A. Feess: Court questions counsel about the status of the case. The Court is advised that there is a mediation date of September 3, 2013 before the Honorable William J. Cahill (Ret.). For reasons stated on the record, the Court will grant the Stipulation to Continue the Summary Judgment Hearing and Case Deadlines for Mediation 104 as modified by the Court. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (smo)
August 8, 2014 113 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT E TO THE DECLARATION OF HONG-AN VU III IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (bm)
August 8, 2014 112 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (bm)
August 8, 2014 111 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BROUGHT BY PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. (bm)
August 8, 2014 110 SEALED DOCUMENT - UNREDACTED EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO ROCKET LAWYER'S OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT f (bm)
August 8, 2014 109 Featured Case ORDER Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Judge Gary A. Feess: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The Court has determined there is good cause to grant the Application 105 and accepts for filing under seal the following documents: 1) Unredacted Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Rocket Lawyer's Motion for Summary Judgment; and 2) Exhibit E to the Declaration of Hong-An Vu in Support of Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment. These documents shall be accepted for filing under seal in their entirety. (smo)
August 8, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff Legalzoon.com, Inc.'s Application to File Documents Under Seal by Judge Gary A. Feess: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the application of LegalZoom.com, Inc. 102 is GRANTED and the following documents are to be filed under seal: 1) Reply Memorandum ofPoints and Authorities (Unredacted) in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Brought by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc.; and 2) Evidentiary Objections (Unredacted) to Rocket Lawyer's Opposition to LegalZoom.com's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.IT IS SO ORDERED. (smo)
August 6, 2014 107 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gary A. Feess re: Stipulation to Continue 104 . On the Court's own motion, the Court sets a Status Conference for Tuesday, 8/12/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 6, 2014 106 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Gary A. Feess RE: APPLICATION for Order for GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 102 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted as filed. If you electronically file the application please in the future include a copy of the proposed order as an attachment. (cb)
August 5, 2014 104 Joint STIPULATION to Continue SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AND CASE DEADLINES FOR MEDIATION filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Hong-An)
August 5, 2014 103 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Application for Leave to File Under Seal 102 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Application. A stand-alone proposed order can be submitted by e-filing a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 4, 2014 105 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
August 4, 2014 102 APPLICATION for Order for GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Heather, Fred)
August 4, 2014 101 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Incto Notice (Other) 88 Objection to Rocket Lawyer's Notice for Judgment Independent of Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 56(f) (Heather, Fred)
August 4, 2014 100 REPLY MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 69 (Redacted) filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Evidentiary Objections to Rocket Lawyer's Opposition to LegalZoom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted))(Heather, Fred)
August 4, 2014 98 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BROUGHT BY PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC; AND 4) UNREDACTED EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO ROCKET LAWYER'S OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Heather, Fred)
August 4, 2014 93 DECLARATION of Hong-An Vu In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AND/OR ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (REDACTED) 60 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A-D and F)(Vu, Hong-An)
August 4, 2014 92 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AND/OR ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (REDACTED) 60 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MEMORANDUM OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS)(Jones, Michael)
August 4, 2014 91 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND 4) EXHIBIT E TO THE DECLARATION OF HONG-AN VU III IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Jones, Michael)
August 1, 2014 99 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA J. WINOGRAD IN SUPPORT OF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 60 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5)(bm)
August 1, 2014 97 SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES IN OPPOSITION TO ROCKET LAWYER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 60 . (bm)
August 1, 2014 96 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS 1-8 TO THE DECLARATION OF HON-AN VU IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 93 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
August 1, 2014 95 SEALED DOCUMENT - ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 69 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
August 1, 2014 94 SEALED DOCUMENT - ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 69 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
August 1, 2014 90 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess granting 77 Application. (bm)
August 1, 2014 89 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess granting 86 Application to Seal. (bm)
July 30, 2014 88 NOTICE for Judgment Independent of Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 56(F) filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Jones, Michael)
July 29, 2014 87 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS 78 by Clerk of Court that the document is accepted as filed RE: Application for Order Granting Leave to File 77 . (bm)
July 29, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER Granting Stipulation to Take Certain Depositions After the Existing Discovery Cut-Off Date by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation for Order 84 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, good cause having been shown in the Stipulation, the following depositions may be taken after the existing discovery cutoff, and on or before September 5, 2014, with the one exception being Dan Nye, whose deposition may be taken on or before September 12, 2014. See document for details. (smo)
July 28, 2014 86 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
July 28, 2014 84 Joint STIPULATION for Order To Take Certain Depositions After The Existing Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
July 28, 2014 83 DECLARATION of Hong-An Vu re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, 82 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92),, 81 IN OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 EX 9-35)(Vu, Hong-An)
July 28, 2014 82 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REDACTED OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 69 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REDACTED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MEMORANDUM OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Jones, Michael)
July 28, 2014 81 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; 4) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES IN OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND 5) EXHIBITS 1-8 TO THE DECLARATION OF HONG-AN VU IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S OPPOSITION TO LEGALZOOM.COM. INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Jones, Michael)
July 25, 2014 80 SEALED DOCUMENT - ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S UNREDACTED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION (bm)
July 25, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Gary A. Feess granting 71 Application to Seal (bm)
July 25, 2014 78 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Order Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. Plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. will and hereby does apply for an order permitting them to file under seal the following: 1) Unredacted Plaintif 77 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed Order not submitted. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
July 24, 2014 77 APPLICATION for Order Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. Plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. will and hereby does apply for an order permitting them to file under seal the following: 1) Unredacted Plaintiff LegalZoom.com, Inc. s Statement of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to Rocket Lawyerss Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; 2) Unredacted Declaration of Patricia Winograd in Support of LegalZoom.com, Inc.s Opposition to Rocket Lawyer Incorporateds Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Heather, Fred)
July 24, 2014 76 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc of APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (Heather, Fred)
July 22, 2014 75 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc (Heather, Fred)
July 21, 2014 74 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AND/OR ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (REDACTED) 60 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Genuine Disputes, # 2 Declaration of Patricia Winograd, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Bruce Isaacson, # 4 Declaration of Alan Goede)(Heather, Fred)
July 18, 2014 73 Featured Case ORDER Granting Stipulation re: Summary Judgment Briefing by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation for Order 64 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, good cause having been shown in the Stipulation, the briefing schedule for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment is as follows -- see document for details. (smo)
July 18, 2014 72 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Heather, Fred)
July 15, 2014 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aaron P Allan on behalf of Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc (Attorney Aaron P Allan added to party LegalZoom.com Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron P Allan added to party LegalZoom.com Inc(pty:cd))(Allan, Aaron)
July 14, 2014 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclusions of Law, # 2 Declaration of Travis Gigi, # 3 Declaration of Dorian Quispe, # 4 Declaration of Aaron Allan, # 5 Appendix of Exhibits, # 6 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
July 11, 2014 71 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Lodged Lodged Proposed Order. (bp)
July 11, 2014 68 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS F-L to the Declaration of Hong-An Vu in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
July 11, 2014 67 SEALED DOCUMENT- UNREDACTED ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. (mat)
July 11, 2014 66 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), 65 (Attachments: # 1 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S REDACTED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION)(Jones, Michael)
July 11, 2014 65 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS UNREDACTED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jones, Michael)
July 11, 2014 64 STIPULATION for Order RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Hong-An)
July 11, 2014 63 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: Application to File Under Seal by Judge Gary A. Feess: Because Defendant's unredacted motion for summary judgment and exhibits F through L to the Declaration of Hong-An Vu appear to contain confidential information, the application to file them under seal 62 is GRANTED. However, the application to file the entirety of the separate statement of undisputed facts under seal is DENIED. Should Defendant wish to submit another application to seal the separate statement of undisputed facts, it should either appropriately redact the document or explain why such redaction is impracticable. Defendant is instructed to contact the Court Clerk to either (1) arrange to pick up the materials it requested be filed under seal or (2) inform the Court that it may destroy the documents. See document for details. (smo)
June 30, 2014 62 APPLICATION for an Order Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated will and hereby does apply for an order permitting them to file under seal the following: 1) Unredacted Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Motion For Summary Judgment And/Or Adjudication; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; 2) Exhibits F-L to the Declaration of Hong-An Vu in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; and 3) Rocket Lawyer Incorporated's Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts in Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment And/Or Adjudication. (smo)
June 30, 2014 61 DECLARATION of Hong-An Vu In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AND/OR ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (REDACTED) 60 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (PART1), # 3 Exhibit B (PART 2), # 4 Exhibits C-E and M-O)(Vu, Hong-An)
June 30, 2014 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AND/OR ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (REDACTED) filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF PAUL HOLLERBACH IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 30, 2014 59 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated of 1) APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; 3) UNREDACTED ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; 4) EXHIBITS F-L TO THE DECLARATION OF HONG-AN VU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; 5) ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION. (Attachments: # 1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Jones, Michael)
May 29, 2014 58 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Hainline, Forrest)
May 15, 2014 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES SET IN THE COURT'S JANUARY 22, 2014 ORDER FOR GOOD CAUSE by Judge Gary A. Feess granting 51 Ex Parte Application to Continue: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court, having read and considered the Ex Parte Application and Application to Continue the Trial and Related Dates; the Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declarations of Patricia Jones Winograd and Mary Ann Nguyen in support thereof, and all other evidence submitted in support of the Ex Parte Application, and after finding that good cause exists, hereby orders the following revised schedule in the above referenced action: Trial Estimated length: 4-5 days: October 21, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.; Hearing on Motions in Limine; Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions: October 6, 2014; File Findins of Fact and Conclusions of Law; Hearing on Motions in Limine: October 6, 2014; Pretrial Conference; Motions in Limine to be filed; Proposed Voir Dire Qs Lodged and Agreed-to Statement of Case: September 22, 2014 at 3:30 p.m.; Lodge Pretrial Conf. Order; File Memo of Contentions of Fact and Law; Exhibit and Witness Lists; File Status Report re Settlement; File Agreed Upon Set of Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms; File Joint Statement re Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc.: September 9, 2014; Last date to conduct Settlement Conference: August 26, 2014; Last day for hearing motions: August 18, 2014; Discovery cut-off [Note: Expert disclosure no later than 70 days prior to this date.]: August 12, 2014. (bm)
April 10, 2014 55 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Trial and Related Date Set in the Court's January 22, 2014 Order for Good Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Patricia Jones Winograd and Mary Ann Nguyen 51 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
April 10, 2014 54 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Gary A. Feess: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Trial and Related Date Set in the Court's January 22, 2014 Order for Good Cause 51 is accepted as filed. The proposed order should be filed as an attachment to a notice of lodging. (smo)
April 8, 2014 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Ex Parte Application 51 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to the Ex Parte Application. A standalone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 7, 2014 52 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATEDS'OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Trial and Related Date Set in the Court's January 22, 2014 Order for Good Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Patricia Jones Winograd and Mary Ann Nguyen 51 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF HONG-AN VU IN SUPPORT OF ROCKET LAWYER'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES W/ EX A-G)(Vu, Hong-An)
April 4, 2014 51 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Trial and Related Date Set in the Court's January 22, 2014 Order for Good Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Patricia Jones Winograd and Mary Ann Nguyen filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc.(Heather, Fred)
January 27, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: granting 48 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian Wesley Cook on behalf of Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated, designating Hong-An Vu as local counsel. (lt)
January 27, 2014 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Brian Wesley Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13281186 paid.) 48 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. See LR 83-2.1.3.4. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
January 24, 2014 48 APPLICATION for attorney Brian Wesley Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13281186 paid.) filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Hong-An)
January 22, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY DATES SET IN THE COURT'S OCTOBER 6, 2013 ORDER FOR GOOD CAUSE by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Continue 46 :NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, good cause having been shown in the Stipulation, the dates and deadlines set forth in the Court's October 6, 2013 Order are modified as follows: Trial, Estimated length: 4-5 days: October 7, 2014, Tuesday; Hearing on Motions in Limine; Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions: September 29, 2014 at 9:30 a.m.; File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law; Hearing on Motions in Limine: September 29, 2014; Pretrial Conference; Motions in Limine to be filed; Proposed Voir Dire Qs Lodged and Agreed-to Statement of Case: September 8, 2014 at 3:30 p.m.; Lodge Pretrial Conf. Order; File Memo of Contentions of Fact and Law; Exhibit and Witness Lists; File Status Report re Settlement; File Agreed Upon Set of Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms; File Joint Statement re Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc.: August 18, 2014; Last date to conduct Settlement Conference: August 11, 2014; Last day for hearing motions: June 30, 2014 at 9:30 a.m.; Discovery cut-off [Note: Expert disclosure no later than 70 days prior to this date.): June 24, 2014. (bm)
January 21, 2014 46 Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Trial and Discovery Dates set in Court's October 6, 2013 Order for Good Cause filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
January 10, 2014 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jui-Ting Anna Hsia counsel for Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Jui-Ting Anna Hsia is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Hsia, Jui-Ting)
October 17, 2013 44 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Gary A. Feess: Plaintiff has failed to prove that no genuine issues of material fact exist as to whether Defendant violated the Lanham Act and California Business and Professions Code. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The hearing presently scheduled for October 21, 2013, is hereby VACATED. (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) RE: denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lw)
October 7, 2013 42 REPLY LEGALZOOM.COM Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patty Chikamagalur, # 2 Declaration of Mary Ann Nguyen, # 3 Response to Evidentiary Objections, # 4 Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 5 Memorandum of Evidentiary Objections)(Heather, Fred)
October 6, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue trial and discovery dates set in the Court's 4/11/13 Scheduling Order 41 (See document for further details). (ir)
October 2, 2013 41 Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Trial and Discovery Dates set in Court's April 11, 2013 Scheduling Order for Good Cause Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order,, 26 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Hong-An)
September 26, 2013 40 DISCLOSURE LEGALZOOM.COM Inc's Amended Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc (Heather, Fred)
September 24, 2013 39 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Stipulation for Protective Order 35 . Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulated Protective Order, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Protective Order be and hereby is entered, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26(c). The Stipulated Protective Order as entered is attached hereto as Exhibit A. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mp)
September 23, 2013 38 DECLARATION of Hong-An Vu with Exhibits 1-33 In Support of Rocket Lawyer's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment 31 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Vu, Hong-An)
September 23, 2013 37 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 31 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Declaration of Paul Hollerbach with Exhibits A-C)(Jones, Michael)
September 20, 2013 36 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Amendment to Disclosure 23 (Vu, Hong-An)
September 16, 2013 35 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Hong-An)
September 12, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO OCTOBER 21, 2013 AND REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Gary A. Feess, re Stipulation to Continue 33 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on LegalZoom's motion for summary judgment is hereby continued to October 21, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' briefing schedule be as follows: Rocket Lawyer shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment on or before September 23, 2013. LegaZoom shall file a reply to the opposition to the motion for summary judgment on or before October 7, 2013. (bp)
September 11, 2013 33 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment from October 7, 2013 to October 21, 2013 filed by the Parties LegalZoom.com Inc, Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Hong-An)
September 5, 2013 32 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc. correcting MOTION for Summary Judgment 31 (Heather, Fred)
September 4, 2013 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
August 27, 2013 30 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, 28 filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Heather, Fred)
August 27, 2013 29 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 7-3 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITS A-B)(Hainline, Forrest)
August 23, 2013 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement, # 2 Exhibit A - L, # 3 Proposed Order)(Heather, Fred)
August 8, 2013 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Thomas Jones counsel for Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Adding Michael T. Jones as attorney as counsel of record for Rocket Lawyer Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2013 26 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess: Trial Estimate: 4-5 days. Last date to Amend Pleadings is 8/29/2013. Discovery cut-off is 12/19/2013. Last date to hear motions is 1/6/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. Proposed Pretrial Order and other trial documents due by 1/21/2014. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/17/2014. Hearing on Motions in Limine set for hearing on 2/24/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 3:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2014 at 8:30 AM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (rfi)
April 11, 2013 25 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The Court, on its own motion, VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for Monday, April 15, 2013 at 1:30 p.m.. No appearances are necessary. Counsel are instructed to fully comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26(a). Scheduling and Case Management Order to follow.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 10, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION AND STAY OF DISCOVERY by Judge Gary A. Feess. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation Regarding Mediation and Stay of Discovery and good cause appearing therefore, the Court ORDERS as indicated in the attached Order. (rfi)
April 8, 2013 23 INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated (Hainline, Forrest)
April 8, 2013 22 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Mediation and Stay of Discovery filed by the Parties LegalZoom.com Inc, Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hainline, Forrest)
April 8, 2013 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated.. (Hainline, Forrest)
April 8, 2013 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc (Heather, Fred)
March 6, 2013 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jui-Ting Anna Hsia on behalf of Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated (Hsia, Jui-Ting)
February 11, 2013 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 14 LegalZoom.com Inc.'s Answer to Rocket Lawyer Incoporated's Amended Counterclaims filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Heather, Fred)
January 23, 2013 17 ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED'S ANSWER To First Amended Complaint 14 And Amended Counterclaims filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
January 11, 2013 16 NOTICE filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. of Unavailability of Counsel for Forrest A. Hainline III (Hainline, Forrest)
January 8, 2013 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, Counter Defendant LegalZoom.com Inc. correcting Amended Complaint 14 (Heather, Fred)
January 7, 2013 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated amending Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc. (bm) (bm).
January 7, 2013 13 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 11 LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s Answer to Rocket Lawyer Incorporated"s Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc.(Heather, Fred)
December 19, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND JOINT REPORT by Judge Gary A. Feess. Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2013 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (rfi)
December 17, 2012 11 ANSWER to Complaint 1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against LegalZoom.com Inc. filed by defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (bm)
December 17, 2012 10 Notice of Withdrawal of Corporate Disclosure Statement 8 filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (Hainline, Forrest)
December 17, 2012 9 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated, (Vu, Hong-An)
December 17, 2012 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT ROCKET LAWYER INCORPORATED filed by Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated (Hainline, Forrest)
December 4, 2012 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. Corrected Proof of Service (Heather, Fred)
December 3, 2012 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, upon Plaintiff All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Heather, Fred)
November 27, 2012 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by LegalZoom.com Inc. (Heather, Fred)
November 20, 2012 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO 120, # 2 AO-121) (ghap)
November 20, 2012 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap)
November 20, 2012 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc, identifying Other Affiliate Institutional Venture Partners XIII L P, Other Affiliate Polaris Venture Partners V L P for LegalZoom.com Inc. (ghap) (mg).
November 20, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated. (ghap)
November 20, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Rocket Lawyer Incorporated.Case assigned to Judge Gary A. Feess for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff LegalZoom.com Inc.(ghap) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LegalZoom.com Inc v. Rocket Lawyer Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LegalZoom.com Inc
Represented By: Patricia L Glaser
Represented By: Fred D Heather
Represented By: Mary Ann Thi Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: LegalZoom.com Inc
Represented By: Patricia L Glaser
Represented By: Mary Ann Thi Nguyen
Represented By: Fred D Heather
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Rocket Lawyer Incorporated
Represented By: Forrest Arthur Hainline, lll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocket Lawyer Incorporated
Represented By: Forrest Arthur Hainline, lll
Represented By: Hong-An Vu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]