Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Sunshine Daydream, LLC et al

Respondent: Armen Abroyan, Lasalle International Holdings Group, Inc., Vega Solutions, LLC and Sunshine Daydream, LLC
Petitioner: Bank of America, N.A. and Comerica Bank
Case Number: 2:2013cv01211
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: David T. Bristow
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than August 12, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant ARMEN ABROYAN, only. (im)
February 7, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff-in-Intervention First Bank's Motion for Service by Publication 44 , and directs First Bank to effectuate service by publication in the Los Angeles and San Francisco Daily Journals, in accordance with the procedures set forth by Cal. Civ. Proc. Code Section 415.50. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
March 11, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 47 , it is ORDERED that the Complaint of Plaintiffs BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., a national banking association and COMERICA BANK, a Texas corporation against Defenda nts LASALLE INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS GROUP, INC. fka LASALLE INTERNATIONAL, INC., a California corporation dba GOLDAMERA and GOLDAMERA INTERNATIONAL shall be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and that each party is to bear his or its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Since all other Defendants were not served, the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Sunshine Daydream, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Armen Abroyan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lasalle International Holdings Group, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Kadin
Represented By: Jerome A Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vega Solutions, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sunshine Daydream, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Casey Zareh Donoyan
Represented By: Andrew K Alper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Comerica Bank
Represented By: Casey Zareh Donoyan
Represented By: Andrew K Alper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]