In re Chang Sup Han

Appellant: Angelina Marquez Juarez, Alma L Castro and Rosa Maria Camacho Fernandez
In Re Debtor: Chang Sup Han
Appellee: Chang Sup Han
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01524
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE ORDER: The judgment of the Bankruptcy Court is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED to the U. S. Bankruptcy Court Case number: 2:11-bk-30025-RK, Adversary number: 2:11-ap-2632-RK., for further proceedings consistent with this order by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.). (lc). Modified on 7/3/2013 (lc).
July 8, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the judgment of the Bankruptcy Court is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED to the U. S. Bankruptcy Court Case number: 2:11-bk-30025-RK, Adversary number: 2:11-ap-2632-RK., for further proceedings consistent with this order by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, re Order to Remand Case to Bankruptcy Court 45 . (lc). Modified on 7/8/2013 (lc).
April 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8006, an appellant must file within 14 days after a notice of appeal, (1) a designation of items to be included in the record on appea l, and (2) a statement of issues to be presented. To the Court's knowledge, Appellant has not done this in this appeal. The Notice of Appeal wasfiled on February 25, 2013. (ECF No. 2 .) Appellant Brewster is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writ ing no later than April 22, 2013, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the applicable rules. No hearing will be held. Failure to timely respond to this order will result in dismissal of this appeal. (jre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re Chang Sup Han
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Angelina Marquez Juarez
Represented By: Christian L Raisner
Represented By: Jordan D Mazur
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alma L Castro
Represented By: Christian L Raisner
Represented By: Jordan D Mazur
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rosa Maria Camacho Fernandez
Represented By: Christian L Raisner
Represented By: Jordan D Mazur
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re debtor: Chang Sup Han
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chang Sup Han
Represented By: Chris Ray Morton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]