Kali A Gordon v. Starbucks Coffee Company et al

Plaintiff: Kali A Gordon
Defendant: Amanda Sturgis Melby, Does and Starbucks Coffee Company
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02660
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Referring Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 19 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than July 5, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant AMANDA STURGIS MELBY, only. SEE ORDER FOR MORE INFORMATION. (im)
October 15, 2013 31 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint 29 . Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
December 5, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 35 , all of Plaintiffs causes of action against Defendants in the matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice, all parties to bear their own fees and costs. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kali A Gordon v. Starbucks Coffee Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kali A Gordon
Represented By: Thomas M Giovacchini
Represented By: Noelle B Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Sturgis Melby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Coffee Company
Represented By: Galit A Knotz
Represented By: Gregory W Knopp
Represented By: Damien Paul DeLaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]