Star Fabrics Inc v. Joyce Leslie Inc et al

Defendant: Ross Stores Inc, Rainbow USA Inc, N Y Invasion Inc, Myletex International Inc, MISS Sportswear Inc, Joyce Leslie Inc and Does
Plaintiff: Star Fabrics Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02771
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Referring Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2014 48 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh re Stipulation for Protective Order 45 ; See order for details. (jy)
June 23, 2014 52 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 50 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) The parties shall comply with the terms of their settlement agreement entere d into on 5/30/2014, the terms of which are incorporated by reference as if fully set forth herein. (2) By consent of the parties, the Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement. (3) Except as provided for in paragraphs 1 and 2 above, this case is dismissed with prejudice. (4) Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
July 18, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than August 19, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendants. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. Refer to document for details of the Court's order. (pso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Star Fabrics Inc v. Joyce Leslie Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Stores Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow USA Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Y Invasion Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myletex International Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISS Sportswear Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Leslie Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Fabrics Inc
Represented By: Troy M Mueller
Represented By: Hootan Troy Farahmand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]