George Borquez v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Jeffry Burkhardt, Allstate Insurance Company and Does
Plaintiff: George Borquez
Case Number: 2:2013cv02807
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Nature of Suit: Insurance

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REMAND by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 5/20/2013, defendants shall show cause in writing why this actionshould not be remanded. (vdr)
September 23, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman re Stipulation for Protective Order 18 (sbu)
February 19, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, re Stipulation 28 . (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Borquez v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffry Burkhardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua N Willis
Represented By: Gregory M MacGregor
Represented By: Deborah A Berthel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Borquez
Represented By: Stuart Libicki
Represented By: Arthur Jeffrey Grebow
Represented By: Julie H Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]