Payam Ahdoot v. Babolat VS North America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Payam Ahdoot
Defendant: Babolat VS North America Inc and Does
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02823
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Gary A. Feess
Referring Judge: Victor B. Kenton
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. The parties in the above-entitled actions have submitted an AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER ("Confidenti ality Stipulation"). The Court, having reviewed the parties' Confidentiality Stipulation, and GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, hereby adopts the Confidentiality Stipulation as its Protective Order for the handling of "Confidential Information" as that term is defined by the parties' Confidentiality Stipulation. (26) (gr)
September 4, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: Order Requesting Further Briefing. Parties are seeking preliminary approval of their Settlement Agreement. The Court has two concerns that must be addressed before the Court will consider preliminari ly approving this settlement as a class action settlement. First, Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees is made without any supporting billing records which prevents the Court from analyzing the reasonableness of the request. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to submit further briefing detailing specific information regarding the number of hours worked, the hourly rate for each attorney charging time to the case, and the reasonable hourly rate. Second, the Court is unable to d iscern if Rust Consulting, Inc., is an appropriate Settlement Administrator absent any information of any sort regarding Rust Consulting, Inc.'s anticipated fees. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Plaintiffs to submit further briefing detailing any agreed-upon fee in the services agreement with Rust Consulting, Inc. and/or any estimates of that fee amount. Plaintiffs are to submit this information by close of business on Thursday, September 18, 2014. See document for details. (smo)
September 3, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Gary A. Feess: Order Vacating Hearing. The Court has received Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement agreement. (Docket No. 43 [Mot. for Preliminary Settlement Approval].) Th e Court takes these matters under submission. Accordingly, the hearing previously scheduled for September 8, 2014, is VACATED. Should the Court determine that argument of counsel is required for the resolution of this motion, a new hearing date will be scheduled. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. (smo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Payam Ahdoot v. Babolat VS North America Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payam Ahdoot
Represented By: Amy Tai Wootton
Represented By: Christopher J Hamner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babolat VS North America Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]