Summit Entertainment LLC v. Preferred Fragrance et al

Plaintiff: Summit Entertainment LLC
Defendant: Preferred Fragrance and Does
Case Number: 2:2013cv04310
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Referring Judge: Andrew J. Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby GRANTS William Thomashower, Schwartz & Thomashower LLP, Thomas H. Edwards, andthe Law Firm of Thomas H. Edwards' motion to be relieved as counsel for defendant Preferred Fragra nce, Inc. 17 . The moving parties are hereby ordered to provide Preferred with notice of the Court's order in accordance with Local Rule 83-2.9.2.3. Since Preferred is a corporate entity, and as such may not appear pro se, the moving parties ar e ordered to inform Preferred that it must retain new counsel within 30 days of the date this order takes effect. The moving parties shall advise Preferred that its failure to retain new counsel or otherwise respond within 30 days may result in the i mposition of sanctions or the entry of default. The Court hereby GRANTS plaintiff's motion for leave to file a first amended complaint, adding Fragrance as a defendant in this action 18 . The First Amended Complaint shall be filed forthwith and deemed filed as of the date of this minute order, and thereafter served on Fragrance. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
December 4, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) 27 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby GRANTS William Thomashower, Schwartz & Thomashower LLP, Thomas H. Edwards, and the Law Firm of Thomas H. Edwards' motion to be relieved as counsel for defendant Pr eferred Fragrance, Inc. ("Preferred") 17 . The moving parties are hereby ordered to provide Preferred with notice of the Court's order in accordance with Local Rule 83-2.3.4. Since Preferred is a corporate entity, and as such may not appear pro se, the moving parties are ordered to inform Preferred that it must retain new counsel within 30 days of the date this order takes effect. The moving parties shall advise Preferred that its failure to retain new counsel or otherwise respon d within 30 days may result in the imposition of sanctions or the entry of default. The Court hereby GRANTS plaintiff's motion for leave to file a first amended complaint 18 , adding Fragrance Acquisitions LLC ("Fragrance") as a defendant in this action. The First Amended Complaint shall be filed forthwith and deemed filed as of the date of this minute order, and thereafter served on Fragrance. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
February 10, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT FRAGRANCE ACQUISITIONS, LLC by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Judgment shall be entered to fully and finally dispose of this action as to Defendant Fragrance Acquisitions, LLC. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS, ADJUDGES, AND DECREES that Defendant Fragrance Acquisitions, LLC and its past and present officers, directors, servants, employees, representatives, successors, assigns, attorneys and agents, and all persons in active concert or participatio n with Fragrance Acquisitions hereby agree to permanently refrain from manufacturing, etc. as to any goods or service under any of the TWILIGHT and NEW MOON Marks, etc. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs arising out of, related to, or incurred in this action, except as provided in the Agreement. See document for details. (gk)
March 19, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Notice of Lodging 56 . See document for details. (yb)
June 4, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANTS PREFERRED FRAGRANCE, INC. AND EZRIEL POLATSEK by Judge Christina A. Snyder: THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS, ADJUDGES, AND DECREES that Defendants Preferred Fragrance, Inc. and Ezriel Polatsek, an d, as applicable, their past and present officers, directors, servants, employees, representatives, successors and assigns (other than Fragrance Acquisitions, LLC), attorneys and agents, and all persons in active concert or participation with Defenda nts or with any of the foregoing, hereby agree to permanently refrain from manufacturing, transporting, promoting, importing, advertising, marketing, publicizing, distributing, displaying, offering for sale or selling any good or service under any of the TWILIGHT and NEW MOON Marks, etc. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs arising out of, related to, or incurred in this action, except as provided herein and in the Agreement. This Judgment shall be a final adjudication of all claims alleged or which, limited to the sales reports disclosed by Defendants to Plaintiff Summit Entertainment, LLC, could have been alleged by Summit in this action against Defendants, and the parties stipulate that this Judgment is not appealable. See document for details. (gk)
October 30, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SUMMIT ENTERTAINMENT, LLC'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND FOR JUDGMENT THEREON by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court finds that Plaintiff Summit Entertainment, LLC's Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement, To Enter Judgment Thereon, and to Recovery Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Costs 68 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that The Settlement Agreement dated 6/2/2014 is a fully binding and enforceable against all parties thereto, and shall be enforced pu rsuant to its terms. Defendants Preferred Fragrance, Inc. and Ezriel Polatsek breached the Settlement Agreement when they failed to pay Summit the second installment within five days of Summit's notice of non-payment. Accordingly, Defendants owe Summit $45,000.00, which is the balance of all remaining, unpaid installments. The Court enters judgment against Defendants in the amount of $45,000.00, which is due within seven days of the date of this order. Defendants are further ordered to pay Summit reasonable attorney's fees and costs of $9,680.00 within seven days of the date of this order. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Entertainment LLC v. Preferred Fragrance et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Paul Alexander Bost
Represented By: Jill M Pietrini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Fragrance
Represented By: Thomas H Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]