Speculative Product Design LLC v. Ulises Martinez et al

Plaintiff: Speculative Product Design LLC
Defendant: Ulises Martinez and Does
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv04312
Filed: June 14, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Referring Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/30/2013. (jloz)
September 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, re Notice of Settlement 13 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (jloz)
August 28, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/6/2013. (jloz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Speculative Product Design LLC v. Ulises Martinez et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speculative Product Design LLC
Represented By: Hung Q Pham
Represented By: Christopher Q Pham
Represented By: Christopher Dain Johnson
Represented By: Marcus F Chaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulises Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]