German Torres v. Airgas USA LLC et al

Defendant: Doe and Airgas USA LLC
Plaintiff: German Torres
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv04735
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Margaret A. Nagle
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Court therefore ORDERS Torres to SHOW CAUSE by Thursday, September 26, 2013, why he has not moved for class certification. Torres shall respond in writing. No hearing will be held. Failure to timely file a class-certification motion will result in denial of the motion. (lc). Modified on 9/16/2013. (lc).
September 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING DEADLINE 11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) Modified on 9/26/2013 .(lc).
March 5, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. SETTLEMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court therefore VACATES all pretrial and trial dates in this case and ORDERS the parties TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by April 16, 2014, why they have not finalized settlement. The Court will discharge this Order upon the filing of astipulated dismissal or written response demonstrating good cause. Failure to timely respond will result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. (lc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: German Torres v. Airgas USA LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas USA LLC
Represented By: Keith A Jacoby
Represented By: Heather M Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Torres
Represented By: Jonathan Ricasa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]