Verdana Pauline Thomas v. Michael J Astrue

Plaintiff: Verdana Pauline Thomas
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 5:2013cv00597
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Gary A. Feess
Referring Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/26/2014. To date, Plaintiff has not filed a motion for summary ju dgment. Accordingly, no later than February 26, 2014, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and to abide by court orders. Filing of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on or before February 26, 2014, shall be deemed compliance with this Order to Show Cause. (See Order for details.) (mp)
September 26, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Having reviewed the entire file, the court reverses the decision of theCommissioner and remands this matter for proceedings consistent with thisopinion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner isreversed and the matter remanded for further proceedings consistent with thisopinion. (mp)
September 26, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, in favor of Verdana Pauline Thomas against Michael J Astrue Related to: Memorandum & Opinion, 32 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that judgment is entered for the Plaintiff and that this action is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent withthe Memorandum Opinion and Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mp)
August 19, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.Pursuant to this Court's Order of April 15, 2013, plaintiff was ordered to file a Proof of Service showing compliance with Paragraph I of the Court's Order within thirty 120 days o f the filing on the complaint, i.e., by August 13, 2013. The Court's Order warned Plaintiff that failure to comply "may result in the dismissal of this case." To date, the Proof of Service has not been filed with the Court. Accordingl y, no later than September 19, 2013, plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Filing of the Proof of Service on or before September 19, 2013, shall be deemed compliance with this Order to Show Cause. (mp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdana Pauline Thomas v. Michael J Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verdana Pauline Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]