Antonio Valladares v. Countrywide Home Loan Inc et al

Defendant: THR California LLC, Reconstruct Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Landsafe Title, Does, Countrywide Home Loan Inc, Corelogic, Bank of America Home Loan, Bank of America NA, THR California LP and US Bank National Assocation
Plaintiff: Antonio Valladares
Case Number: 5:2013cv00720
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Jesus G. Bernal
Referring Judge: David T. Bristow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Related to: Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, Order on Motion to Dismiss, 14 . IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Countrywide Home Loan, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, Reconstruct Company, Bank of America Home Loan, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, and Bank of America, N.A. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from Plaintiff's Complaint. (mrgo)
September 2, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff show cause in writing on or before September 12, 2014, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendants Corelogic, Landsafe Title, THR California, LLC, and THR California, LP. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 18, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (see document image for specifics). Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES Defendants Corelogic, Landsafe Title, THR California LLC, and THR California, LP from Plaintiff's Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Because there are no remaining Defendants in this action, the Clerk shall close the file. The Court orders that such judgment be entered. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Valladares v. Countrywide Home Loan Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THR California LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstruct Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landsafe Title
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loan Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THR California LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Assocation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Valladares
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]