Cindy Dupre v. Mountain West Financial Inc et al

Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mountain West Financial Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Does, Citibank NA and Quality Loan Services Corporation
Plaintiff: Cindy Dupre
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01480
Filed: August 19, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Oswald Parada
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 13 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS LODGED 9/3/2013 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's Proposed Notice of Lis Pendens filed 8/29/2013 7 . Plaintiff has not filed any proof of s ervice of the Proposed Notice of Lis Pendens; accordingly, defendants have not been properly served. Plaintiff's Proposed Notice of Lis Pendens is therefore denied without prejudice to being renewed with the appropriate showing that proper service has been made upon defendants. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
September 17, 2013 18 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: There does not appear to be a basis for the exercise of this Court's subject matter jurisdiction over this case. Due to this lack of subject matter jurisdiction, the court declines to consider plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order 16 . In light of the imminent foreclosure sale, and the fact that this Court does not have a basis for exercising subject matter jurisdiction over this case, it appears that this case could be refiled in San Bernardino County Superior Court. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause on or before 9/30/2013, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
September 19, 2013 21 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Pleadings 20 . In her motion, plaintiff seeks leave to file a supplemental pleading that cures the defects in her complain t and establishes that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Plaintiff's motion to file a supplemental pleading is hereby GRANTED. As stated in this Court's previous order, the Court cannot consider plaintiff's pending Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 16 until plaintiff establishes that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cindy Dupre v. Mountain West Financial Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Financial Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Dupre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]