Guy Hingston v. Google Inc et al Featured Case

Defendant: Does and Google Inc
Plaintiff: Guy Hingston
Case Number: 8:2012cv02202
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Arthur Nakazato
Presiding Judge: Josephine Staton Tucker
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Guy Hingston. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Russo, John)
February 14, 2013 6 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Google Inc answer now due 3/15/2013, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Google Inc.(Reiten, Joshua)
February 6, 2013 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Guy Hingston, upon Defendant Google Inc served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/18/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service, BeckyDeGeorge of CSC Lawyers, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Russo, John)
January 2, 2013 4 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE STATON TUCKER. (Guerrero, Terry)
December 21, 2012 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(dg)
December 21, 2012 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Guy Hingston. (dg) (dg).
December 21, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to defendant Google Inc. (dg)
December 21, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Google Inc. Case assigned to Judge Josephine Staton Tucker for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Guy Hingston.(dg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2012: # 1 Civil cover sheet and CV-18, # 2 Summons Issued) (dg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy Hingston v. Google Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Hingston
Represented By: John Scott Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.