Le Quyen Vu Ngo et al v. City of Santa Ana et al

Defendant: City of Santa Ana, Does, Oliver Grant, Miguel A Pulido, Carlos Rojas and Santa Ana Police Department
Plaintiff: J.T.N., Le Quyen Vu Ngo and P.H.N.
Case Number: 8:2013cv01660
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Robert N. Block
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiffs must file a Third Amended Complaint, if at all, on or before March 3, 2014. (twdb)
January 9, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block (mt)
May 20, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 69 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (dgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le Quyen Vu Ngo et al v. City of Santa Ana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Ana
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Grant
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel A Pulido
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Rojas
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Ana Police Department
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T.N.
Represented By: Michael L Guisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Quyen Vu Ngo
Represented By: Michael L Guisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.H.N.
Represented By: Michael L Guisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.