United States of America v. 2007 BMW Convertible 650i, VIN: WBAEK13577CN80379, License Number 6CBS415

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2007 BMW Convertible 650i, VIN: WBAEK13577CN80379, License Number 6CBS415
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00009
Filed: January 5, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Forfeit/Penalty: Liquor Laws Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT recommending that 1. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment be GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff is entitled to, and the Clerk be directed to enter, a judgment that: (a) The interest/s of Gua dalupe Avina, Jorge Leal, Elisa Leal, Johanna Leal, and Vanessa Leal in the Defendant property are CONDEMNED and FORFEITED to the United States of America; and (b) The right, title, and interest of all potential claimants in the Defendant property, i ncluding but not limited toGuadalupe Avina, Jorge Leal, Elisa Leal, Johanna Leal, and Vanessa Leal, are FORFEITED to the United States of America, and are VESTED in the United States; and, (c) All persons claiming any right, title, or interest in or to the Defendant property have DEFAULTED and no longer have any right, title, or interest in the Defendant property whatsoever; and, 3. The Clerk of Court ENTER final judgment of forfeiture for Plaintiff United States of America. Matter referred to J udge Wanger. Plaintiff directed to serve these findings and recommendations on all potential claimants and file a proof of service. Within thirty (30) days after being served with a copy, any party may file written objections with the court and ser ve a copy on all parties. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judges Findings and Recommendation." Replies to the objections shall be served and filed within ten (10) court days (plus three days if served by mail) after service of the objections. The 10/30/2009 hearing date is VACATED, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/26/2009. (Timken, A)
December 21, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/18/2009. (Bradley, A)
January 14, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Application and ORDER for Publication, signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/13/2009. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 2007 BMW Convertible 650i, VIN: WBAEK13577CN80379, License Number 6CBS415
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deanna Lynne Martinez, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 BMW Convertible 650i, VIN: WBAEK13577CN80379, License Number 6CBS415
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]