Golden Memorial Insurance Services v. Secured Serenity, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Golden Memorial Insurance Services, Inc.
Defendant: Secured Serenity, Inc. and Lauro Herrera
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01058
Filed: June 24, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/21/2011. (Herman, H)
November 17, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint: Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint within 5 days of service of this Order. (Stipulation 15 ). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/2011. (Herman, H)
December 28, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation 24 and ORDER Granting Defendant Leave to File Amended Answer and Granting Plaintiff Additional Time to File Responsive Motion: 1) Defendants, Secured Serenity and Lauro Herrera, have until 1/13/2012 to file an Amended Answer; and 2) Plaintiff have until 1/27/2012 to file a responsive motion. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/23/2011. (Herman, H)
January 12, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Robert Paul "Bo" Clark, Jr. Additional Time to File Answer and Plaintiff Additional Time to File Responsive Motion: Defendant Clark's answer extended to 1/3/2012, and Plaintiff's responsive pleading by 1/27/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/2012. (Herman, H)
May 15, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2012. (Herman, H)
November 27, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to DISMISS Defendant Clark 49 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/27/12: This Court DISMISSES this action with prejudice as to Defendant Robert Paul "Bo" Clark only. The Clerk is directed to close this action. (Hellings, J)
November 29, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING Expert Disclosure Deadline (Doc. 51 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/28/2012. The expert disclosure cutoff of 12/3/2012 is continued until 1/4/2013. (Arellano, S.)
December 14, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Guadalupe "Joe" Gonzalez; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/14/12. Guadalupe "Joe" Gonzalez terminated .(Verduzco, M)
January 2, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT directing the parties to file dismissal documents no later than 1/31/2013. The Court further ORDERS all pending deadlines and hearings, including the pretrial and trial dates, VACATED. Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/2/2013. (Rooney, M)
January 31, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/31/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Golden Memorial Insurance Services v. Secured Serenity, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Memorial Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secured Serenity, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Charles Piontkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauro Herrera
Represented By: Bruce Charles Piontkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]