Gerawan Farming, Inc. v. Rehrig Pacific Company

Defendant: Rehrig Pacific Company
Plaintiff: Gerawan Farming, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01273
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 69 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 8, 2013. (Munoz, I)
April 12, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 96 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/12/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 26, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF GERAWAN FARMING, INC.S REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2013. Pursuant to Local Rule 141(e)(2)(i): Documents approved by the court for filing under seal must be emailed to: ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov.(Munoz, I)
May 6, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 6, 2013. (Munoz, I)
May 9, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 9, 2013. (Munoz, I)
May 13, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 13, 2013. (Docs. 110-112, 114-128) (Munoz, I)
May 20, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: THE PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST RE: DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S DAMAGES EXPERT LARRY GORMAN signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 20, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 11, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 11 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/12: Motion Hearing CONTINUED to January 24, 2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hellings, J)
May 31, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO MODIFY THE FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER 172 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 31, 2013. (Munoz, I)
June 3, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 3, 2013. IMMEDIATE RESPONSE, IF ANY, DUE BY TODAY AT 3:30P.M. (Munoz, I)
June 3, 2013 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED "CORRECTIVE" JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Doc. 188) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 3, 2013. (Munoz, I)
June 4, 2013 210 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/4/2013. The Court DISMISSES plaintiff's claims pursuant to the parties' above stipulation and DIRECTS the clerk to close this action. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
June 4, 2013 211 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 4, 2013. (Munoz, I)
July 30, 2013 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO FILE A SUR-REPLY signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 30, 2013. (Munoz, I)
December 10, 2013 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS 220 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 10, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 13, 2014 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 229 Motion to approve supersedeas bond and stay execution of bill of costs to signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
January 15, 2014 236 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/14/14. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2014 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Approve its Supersedeas Bond and to STAY Execution of the Bill of Costs 237 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/14. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2014 240 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (Doc. 220) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 17, 2014. (Munoz, I)
January 21, 2014 241 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT dated *1/21/2014* signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 13, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 243 Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond and to Stay Execution of Attorney's Fees, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/13/14. (Marrujo, C)
March 2, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/2/2012. (The Court 1. DENIES Rehrigs motion to dismiss with respect to Gerawans claim for correction of inventorship under 35 U.S.C. § 25 6; 2. GRANTS Rehrigs motion to dismiss with respect to Gerawans Lanham Act claim for unfair competition under 15 U.S.C. § 1125(a) without leave to amend; 3. GRANTS Rehrigs motion to dismiss with leave to amend in all other respects; and 4. ORDERS Gerawan to file and serve any amended complaint it elects to submit by no later than 3/23/2012.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 26, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss Claims 27 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/26/12: The Clerk is directed NOT to close this action. (Hellings, J)
December 19, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION Non-Trial Civil Protective ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2012. (Herman, H)
January 31, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/2013. (Herman, H)
February 8, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's and Defendant's Motions to Compel Further Discovery [Docs. 43 & 44], signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/8/2013. (Herman, H)
February 21, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 65 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/2013. (Figueroa, O)
October 21, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. (Herman, H)
March 1, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's request to Seal Certain Documents 79 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/1/2013. (Kusamura, W)
March 7, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Renewed Request To Seal Documents (Docs. 85 & 87 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/6/2013. (Fahrney, E)
March 7, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/2013. (Herman, H)
October 21, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. (Herman, H)
March 8, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 90 Plaintiff's Reconsideration Request, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/2013. This Court vacated the April 4, 2013 hearing and orders defendants to file opposition papers by 3/15/2013. (Jessen, A)
March 20, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/2013. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerawan Farming, Inc. v. Rehrig Pacific Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehrig Pacific Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerawan Farming, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. Pietrini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]