Phillips v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Anna Marie Phillips
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2011cv01928
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/26/2012. (Bradley, A)
July 31, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for defendant's first extension of 30 days for defendant to respond to plaintiff's opening brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/31/2012. (Kusamura, W)
November 20, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/18/11. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Phillips
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynn M. Harada, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]