Dews v. Brown et al

Defendant: Maurice Junious, Edmund G. Brown and Martin D. Biter
Plaintiff: Clarence Leon Dews
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00278
Filed: February 21, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within Forty-Five Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Verduzco, M)
April 16, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER (1) Denying Motions for Free Copies 5 , to Compel 9 , for Summonses, for Discovery, and for a Prison Transfer 8 , (2) Striking Verification 10 , and (3) Disregarding Interrogatories 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/12. (Verduzco, M)
November 19, 2012 19 Featured Case FIRST SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, for Failure to State Any Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2012. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: # 1 1983 Amended Complaint Form) (Marrujo, C)
November 27, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Petition for Writ of Mandamus 20 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/27/12: Petition is DENIED with prejudice. (Hellings, J)
March 13, 2013 26 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/12/13. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Objection Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
March 19, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING Petitions for Writ of Mandamus 23 , 24 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/13. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 26 Findings and Recommendations and Dismissing Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim for Relief; ORDER That Dismissal Is Subject to Three Strikes Provision Under 28 USC 1915(G), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/22/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 8, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER Disregarding 35 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/8/13. (Verduzco, M)
March 5, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within Forty-Five Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/5/2012. (Motion for IFP due by 4/23/2012.) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dews v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Junious
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin D. Biter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Leon Dews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]